HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HARTFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY and HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, ABC CORPORATION(S) A-Z AND 1-10 and BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP.
3Rd Party Defendant: GURU MANAGEMENT D/B/A BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP. and ARIV REALTY COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01243
Filed: March 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
2 Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BROAN-NUTONE LLC. (FROST, JACK)
April 21, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARIV REALTY COMPANY, LLC, GURU MANAGEMENT D/B/A BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg)
April 21, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Summons to be Issued by BROAN-NUTONE LLC as to GURU MANAGEMENT D/B/A BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP.. (FROST, JACK)
April 21, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by BROAN-NUTONE LLC as to ARIV REALTY COMPANY, LLC. (FROST, JACK)
April 21, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (corrective) against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs., filed by HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(MEYER, JAN)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER correcting spelling of Plaintiff to HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/21/2023. (mg)
April 20, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff's counsel. (MEYER, JAN)
April 13, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION To Dismiss Broan-Nurton, LLC's Third-Party Complaint . Motion set for 5/15/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
April 12, 2023 Filing 10 First MOTION Tp Dismiss Broan-Nurton, LLC's Third-Party Complaint by ARIV REALTY COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(BARR, BRIAN)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties will coordinate for purposes of discovery. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Any Motion to Amend the Pleadings or Join New Parties due by 4/27/2023. Fact Discovery due by 11/13/2023. Dispositve Motions due by 8/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/28/2023. (mg)
March 27, 2023 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/27/2023. (mm)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The in-person rule 16 conference set for 5/15/2023, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 3/27/2023 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/24/2023. (mm)
March 23, 2023 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against GURU MANAGEMENT D/B/A BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP., ARIV REALTY COMPANY, LLC, filed by BROAN-NUTONE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Guru Management d/b/a Buy-Rite Liquor Corp., #2 Summons Ariv Realty Company, LLC)(FROST, JACK)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The rule 16 conference set before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert is cancelled. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, a scheduling conference will be held before the Honorable Rukhsanah L. Singh, on 5/15/2023 at 2:30 p.m. in person at the Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Trenton, NJ. The parties are advised that they must comply with any and all COVID protocols and orders available for review on the Court's website, https://www.njd.uscourts.gov. Upon request and consent of all parties, the Court may convert the scheduling conference to take place virtually over Zoom. No later than fourteen (14) business days prior to the rule 16 conference, the parties shall submit a joint discovery plan to the Court via CM/ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/16/2023. (mm)
March 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 4/13/2023 at 2:30pm before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/13/2023. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) (eh, )
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(FROST, JACK)
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 Letter from All Parties Regarding Coordination of Discovery in Related Matters. (FROST, JACK)
March 3, 2023 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mlh)
March 3, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw)
March 3, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC identifying Nortek, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FROST, JACK)
March 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-002823-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14131847), filed by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process, Summons, and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Maryland Business Entity Information, Harford Mutual Insurance Company Citizenship Information, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Buy-Rite))(FROST, JACK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARTFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAN MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAN MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Represented By: JACK N. FROST, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) A-Z AND 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GURU MANAGEMENT D/B/A BUY-RITE LIQUOR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ARIV REALTY COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: BRIAN D. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?