SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
Plaintiff: SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND and ROBERT STERN
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, GINA RAIMONDO, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE and JANET COIT
Intervenor Defendant: Orsted North America Inc. and Atlantic Shores Offshore Wind, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01886
Filed: April 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JANICE M. SCHNEIDER and STACEY L. VANBELLEGHEM, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg)
May 25, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stacey L. VanBelleghem to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14343114.) (BROWN, KEGAN)
May 25, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Janice M. Schneider to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14343071.) (BROWN, KEGAN)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JANICE M. SCHNEIDER and STACEY L. VANBELLEGHEM. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/22/2023. (mlh)
May 22, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The #17 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by JANET COIT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, GINA RAIMONDO, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/27/2023. (jdg)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Intervene. Intervenor shall file it's Answer or other responsive pleading by the same deadline as Federal Defendants or three days after the entry of this Order, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/19/2023. (kht)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Intervenor shall file it's Answer or other responsive pleading by the same deadline as Federal Defendants or three days after the entry of this Order, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/19/2023. (kht)
May 19, 2023 Filing 17 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Federal Defendants.. (SPATZ, MICHELLE)
May 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA E. COSTELLO on behalf of JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA RAIMONDO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (COSTELLO, SARA)
May 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Atlantic Shores Offshore Wind, LLC re #13 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer Request to Advance Motion Day (TAYLOR, COURTNEY)
May 15, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
May 13, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND, ROBERT STERN re #13 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer (STAVOLA, THOMAS)
May 12, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer by Atlantic Shores Offshore Wind, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certification, #5 Certificate of Service)(TAYLOR, COURTNEY)
May 12, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Shores Offshore Wind, LLC. (TAYLOR, COURTNEY)
May 12, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY DEVON TAYLOR on behalf of Atlantic Shores Offshore Wind, LLC (TAYLOR, COURTNEY)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND, ROBERT STERN re #9 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer (STAVOLA, THOMAS)
April 24, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/15/2023 before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
April 24, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer. Motion set for 5/15/2023 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
April 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer by Orsted North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Proposed Intervenor-Defendant's Motion to Intervene and to Defer Filing Answer, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth Gowell in Support of Motion to Intervene and to Defer Answer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, #5 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KEGAN)
April 21, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orsted North America Inc. identifying Orsted A/S as Corporate Parent.. (BROWN, KEGAN)
April 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orsted North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kegan A. Brown in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Janice M. Schneider in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Stacey L. VanBelleghem in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KEGAN)
April 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KEGAN ANDREW BROWN on behalf of Orsted North America Inc. (BROWN, KEGAN)
April 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE SPATZ on behalf of All Defendants (SPATZ, MICHELLE)
April 15, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND, ROBERT STERN. JANET COIT served on 4/13/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE served on 4/13/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; GINA RAIMONDO served on 4/13/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 4/13/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Affidavit Certified Mail Receipts, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit)(STAVOLA, THOMAS)
April 4, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANET COIT, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA RAIMONDO, and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERT STERN, Save Long Beach Island. (STAVOLA, THOMAS)
April 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANET COIT, National Marine Fisheries Service, GINA RAIMONDO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14221420), filed by Save Long Beach Island, ROBERT STERN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(STAVOLA, THOMAS)
April 4, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The "COMPLAINT" #1 submitted by THOMAS WILLIAM STAVOLA, JR on 4/4/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (mlh)
April 4, 2023 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVE LONG BEACH ISLAND
Represented By: THOMAS WILLIAM STAVOLA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STERN
Represented By: THOMAS WILLIAM STAVOLA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: MICHELLE SPATZ
Represented By: SARA E. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA RAIMONDO
Represented By: MICHELLE SPATZ
Represented By: SARA E. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: MICHELLE SPATZ
Represented By: SARA E. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET COIT
Represented By: MICHELLE SPATZ
Represented By: SARA E. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Orsted North America Inc.
Represented By: KEGAN ANDREW BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Atlantic Shores Offshore Wind, LLC
Represented By: COURTNEY DEVON TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?