MELONE et al v. SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Kara MELONE and Paul MELONE
Defendant: SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, CRYOPORT INC, CRYOPORT SYSTEMS INC., MD ALLEN MORGAN, MD MEIR OLCHA, MD PHILIP LESORGEN, LPN KELLY HUGHES, LPN KERRI KING-HURLEY, JOHN DOES, JANE DOES, ABC CORPORATION, SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, P.C., CRYOPORT SYSTEMS, LLC, KELLY HYNES, MD JOHN DOES 1-10, RN/NP/PA JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 and RON AND JANE DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2023cv03243
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Georgette Castner
Referring Judge: J Brendan Day
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (EMMONS, JENNIFER)
August 11, 2023 Filing 22 Letter from Jennifer Emmons. (EMMONS, JENNIFER)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of correspondence from the parties (ECF No.s #16 , #17 & #20 regarding a pre-motion conference. The Court has set a pre-motion conference for 8/22/2023 at 2:00 PM via telephone. Dial in information will be provided to the parties via email prior to the telephone conference. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 8/7/23. (adi)
August 4, 2023 Filing 20 Letter from Jessica L. Brennan Seeking a Pre-Motion Conference. (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
August 4, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by KAITLYN E. STONE on behalf of CRYOPORT INC, CRYOPORT SYSTEMS, LLC (STONE, KAITLYN)
August 4, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of CRYOPORT INC, CRYOPORT SYSTEMS, LLC (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
August 2, 2023 Filing 17 Letter from Christopher Placitella. (PLACITELLA, CHRISTOPHER)
July 26, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Sarah M. Baker. (BAKER, SARAH)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants Shore Institute for Reproductive Medicine, P.C., and Allen Morgan, MD's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #14 ). Pursuant to the Court's individual preferences, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #14 ) is hereby administratively terminated. Defendants are instructed to submit a letter requesting a pre-motion conference in accordance with the Court's individual preferences, which may be found at # https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/georgette-castner . So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 7/13/23. (adi)
July 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by ALLEN MORGAN, SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, P.C.. (BAKER, SARAH)
July 12, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Meir Olcha M.D on 07/07/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (COHEN, STEWART)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint until 8/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 7/7/2023. (jdg)
July 6, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [JOINT] by CRYOPORT INC, CRYOPORT SYSTEMS, LLC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
June 30, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Allen Morgan, M.D. on 06/21/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (COHEN, STEWART)
June 30, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kelly Hynes, LPN on 06/21/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (COHEN, STEWART)
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Philip Lesorgen M.D. on 06/21/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (COHEN, STEWART)
June 30, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Shore Institute for Reproductive Medicine, P.C. on 06/21/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (COHEN, STEWART)
June 30, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kerri King-Hurley on 06/23/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (EMMONS, JENNIFER)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cryoport Systems, Inc. on 06/21/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (EMMONS, JENNIFER)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cryoport, Inc. on 06/21/2023, filed by KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE. (EMMONS, JENNIFER)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. EMMONS on behalf of KARA MELONE, PAUL MELONE (EMMONS, JENNIFER)
June 14, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRYOPORT INC, CRYOPORT SYSTEMS, LLC, KELLY HYNES, KERRI KING-HURLEY, PHILIP LESORGEN, ALLEN MORGAN, MEIR OLCHA, SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, P.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
June 14, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
June 14, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (jal, )
June 14, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jal, )
June 14, 2023 Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (jal, )
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATION, CRYOPORT INC, CRYOPORT SYSTEMS INC., JANE DOES, JOHN DOES, KELLY HUGHES, KERRI KING-HURLEY, PHILIP LESORGEN, ALLEN MORGAN, MEIR OLCHA, SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14387034) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Paul MELONE, Kara MELONE.(PLACITELLA, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MELONE et al v. SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara MELONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL PLACITELLA
Represented By: JENNIFER L. EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul MELONE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL PLACITELLA
Represented By: JENNIFER L. EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYOPORT INC
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Represented By: KAITLYN E. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYOPORT SYSTEMS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD ALLEN MORGAN
Represented By: SARAH MILLS BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD MEIR OLCHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD PHILIP LESORGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN KELLY HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN KERRI KING-HURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHORE INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, P.C.
Represented By: SARAH MILLS BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYOPORT SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Represented By: KAITLYN E. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY HYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN/NP/PA JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?