FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC, OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC, SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT LLC doing business as SAGE HEALTHCARE PARTNERS, ABC COMPANIES 1-100 and JOHN DOES 1-100
Receiver: MICAHEL F. FLANAGAN
Case Number: 3:2023cv03554
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Georgette Castner
2 Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT by MICAHEL F. FLANAGAN. (PATANIA, THOMAS)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to London England. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/25/2023. (mg)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Jason S. Brookner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/25/2023. (mg)
August 24, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS PATANIA on behalf of MICAHEL F. FLANAGAN (PATANIA, THOMAS)
August 24, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW B. CHARKOW on behalf of MICAHEL F. FLANAGAN (CHARKOW, ANDREW)
August 24, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY P. DUGGAN on behalf of OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC, SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT LLC (DUGGAN, TIMOTHY)
August 14, 2023 Filing 29 RECEIVER'S BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by MICAHEL F. FLANAGAN. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/14/2023. (mg)
August 11, 2023 Filing 28 Letter from Plaintiff re #27 Order, Util - Finance NEF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receiver's Bond, #2 Exhibit Receiver's Oath)(FARKAS, BRIAN)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER appointing Michael F. Flanagan as receiver of the Receivership Estate for all purposes (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/10/2023. (kht)
August 10, 2023 Filing 26 Letter from Plaintiff. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
August 10, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION on OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC (FARKAS, BRIAN)
August 10, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION on SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT (FARKAS, BRIAN)
August 10, 2023 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Status Conference held on 8/10/2023. (kas)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER that a telephonic case management conference regarding the Order to Show Cause 11 will be conducted before the undersigned on 08/10/2023 at 11:00 a.m. All parties shall dial into 888-398-2342 access code 3570932. Plaintiff shall also immediately serve a copy of this Order on Defendants who have not yet appeared and file proof of service on the docket. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 08/09/2023. (Gonzalez, P)
August 4, 2023 Filing 22 Letter from Defendant, Ocean Grove NJ, LLC in Regards to the Order to Show Cause. (HURLEY, LEO)
August 2, 2023 Filing 21 Letter from Plaintiff re 11 Order to Show Cause,, #3 Proposed Pretrial Order. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
August 2, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/17/2023. (mlh)
August 1, 2023 Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Application of Ocean Grove NJ LLC for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply.. (HURLEY, LEO)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Georgette Castner no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/31/2023. (gxh)
July 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LEO J. HURLEY, JR on behalf of OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC (HURLEY, LEO)
July 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON HENRY GOULD on behalf of OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC (GOULD, AARON)
July 27, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION re 11 Order to Show Cause,, (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 27, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The "CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE" #15 submitted by BRIAN FARKAS on 7/26/2023 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION re 11 Order to Show Cause,, (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 26, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Text Order to Show Cause upon Ocean Grove NJ LLC served on Kathleen Malaver, Managing Agent on July 24, 2023, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 26, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Text Order to Show Cause upon Ocean Grove Operating LLC served on Kathleen Malaver, Managing Agent on July 24, 2023, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 26, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Text Order to Show Cause served on Scott Kuntz, Managing Agent on July 24, 2023, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter comes before the Court upon a review of its docket as well as recent correspondence from Plaintiff. (See, e.g., ECF No. #10 .) Defendants must show cause in writing by no later than July 28, 2023, why a receiver should not be appointed over the ground leased mortgaged premises at 70 Stockton Avenue, Ocean Grove, NJ 07756. Plaintiff shall file a reply by no later than August 2, 2023. The Court will hold a status conference following receipt of the parties' submissions. Plaintiff shall serve each of the Defendants with a copy of this Order and file a certification of service. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 7/21/23. (adi)
July 18, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff on Order to Show Cause. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 18, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
July 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT LLC served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 6 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Exhibits A- M and Civil Cover Sheet by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(FARKAS, BRIAN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 Exhibit to #3 Proposed Pretrial Order MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC, OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC, SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Order To Show Cause for Appointment of a Receiver by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FARKAS, BRIAN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (FARKAS, BRIAN)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC COMPANIES 1-100 (FICTITIOUS ENTITIES), JOHN DOES 1-100 (FICTITIOUS PERSONS), OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC, OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC, SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT LLC d/b/a SAGE HEALTHCARE PARTNERS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14428455), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(FARKAS, BRIAN)
June 30, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (mg, )
June 30, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (mg)
June 30, 2023 Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: BRIAN DANIEL FARKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN GROVE NJ LLC
Represented By: LEO J. HURLEY, JR.
Represented By: AARON HENRY GOULD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN GROVE OPERATING LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY P. DUGGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGE HOME MANAGEMENT LLC doing business as SAGE HEALTHCARE PARTNERS
Represented By: TIMOTHY P. DUGGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: MICAHEL F. FLANAGAN
Represented By: ANDREW B. CHARKOW
Represented By: THOMAS PATANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?