MACK v. SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DANIELLE MACK
Defendant: SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC and SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2023cv03813
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint - Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In The Alternative, To Compel Arbitration - (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Supplemental Declaration Of Garrett Kennedy, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(KENNEDY, GARRETT)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DANIELLE MACK re #5 MOTION to Remand (SANTILLO, R.)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC re #5 MOTION to Remand - Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand - (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett D. Kennedy, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(KENNEDY, GARRETT)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by DANIELLE MACK re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Thomas J. Durkin)(KOCHER, CHARLES)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 9/18/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg, )
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 9/18/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg, )
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff re #8 Letter. (KOCHER, CHARLES)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Remand . (KENNEDY, GARRETT)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by DANIELLE MACK re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (KOCHER, CHARLES)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Defendants re #7 Letter. (KENNEDY, GARRETT)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KOCHER, CHARLES)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg, )
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Garrett D. Kennedy, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KENNEDY, GARRETT)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg, )
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by DANIELLE MACK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GOTTESFELD, MARK)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The #4 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/7/2023. (jdg)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to all Defendants.. (KENNEDY, GARRETT)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC identifying Six Flags Entertainment Corp. as Corporate Parent.. (KENNEDY, GARRETT)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION identifying Six Flags Entertainment as Corporate Parent.. (KENNEDY, GARRETT)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdg)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-001222-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14461314), filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - CBA, #3 Exhibit C - Summons and Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Superior Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Certification Local Civil Rule 11.2 Certification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(KENNEDY, GARRETT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACK v. SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE MACK
Represented By: CHARLES JOSEPH KOCHER
Represented By: MARK JUSTIN GOTTESFELD
Represented By: R. ANDREW SANTILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC
Represented By: GARRETT D. KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: GARRETT D. KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?