GANNON v. UNITED BANK CARD, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DR. MARC J. GANNON and FATHER & SON TRANSMISSIONS
Defendant: UNITED BANK CARD, INC., HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC and SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv04313
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC, SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC, UNITED BANK CARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Certification of Ethan Hougah, Esq. in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 to Hougah Certification, #4 Exhibit 2 to Hougah Certification, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(HOUGAH, ETHAN)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER granting the time within which Defendants may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is hereby extended to 10/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/21/2023. (jjc, )
September 15, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for a Clerk's Extension filed by Joseph Michelini on 9/14/2023 was submitted incorrectly as an Answer to Complaint. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE application USING Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mg)
September 15, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Quality Control message filed by the Clerk's office on 9/15/2023 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Order by Consent extending time to Answer by HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC, SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC, UNITED BANK CARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HOUGAH, ETHAN)
September 6, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC, SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC, UNITED BANK CARD, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/20/2023. (jal, )
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(HOUGAH, ETHAN)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ETHAN A. HOUGAH on behalf of HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC, SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC, UNITED BANK CARD, INC. (HOUGAH, ETHAN)
August 14, 2023 Filing 6 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by All Plaintiffs. (MEYERS, GARY)
August 14, 2023 Filing 5 Diversity Disclosure Statement by FATHER & SON TRANSMISSIONS, MARC J. GANNON. (MEYERS, GARY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC, SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC, UNITED BANK CARD, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FATHER & SON TRANSMISSIONS INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (MEYERS, GARY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARC J GANNON identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (MEYERS, GARY)
August 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARBOR TOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC, SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC, UNITED BANK CARD, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14519249) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARC J GANNON, FATHER & SON TRANSMISSIONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(MEYERS, GARY)
August 11, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (mg, )
August 11, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mg, )
August 11, 2023 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GANNON v. UNITED BANK CARD, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. MARC J. GANNON
Represented By: GARY MARTIN MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATHER & SON TRANSMISSIONS
Represented By: GARY MARTIN MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BANK CARD, INC.
Represented By: ETHAN A. HOUGAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBORTOUCH FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: ETHAN A. HOUGAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIFT4 PAYMENTS, LLC
Represented By: ETHAN A. HOUGAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?