TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEYv. AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY
Defendant: AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. and SAFARILAND, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv07182
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert Kirsch
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Heidi M. Silton and Jessica N. Servais: $ 300, receipt number 135172 (jjc, )
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. HABER on behalf of SAFARILAND, LLC (HABER, STEVEN)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Joseph C. Bourne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/6/2023. (kht)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Jessica N. Servais. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/6/2023. (kht)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to Heidi M. Silton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/6/2023. (kht) Modified on 10/10/2023 (kht).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to William V. Reiss and Jonathan Edelman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/6/2023. (kht)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eura Chang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/6/2023. (jdg)
September 27, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kellie Lerner and Heidi Silton as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Michael D. Fitzgerald as Interim Liaison Counsel Co-Lead Attorney: Kellie Lerner and Heidi Silton.. Motion set for 11/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kellie Lerner and Heidi Silton as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Michael D. Fitzgerald as Interim Liaison Counsel Co-Lead Attorney: Kellie Lerner and Heidi Silton. by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Appointing Kellie Lerner and Heidi Silton as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Michael Fitzgerald as Interim Liaison Counsel, #2 Declaration of Heidi Silton In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Time and Expense Reporting Letter, #4 Exhibit 2 - Heidi Silton and LGN's Biographies, #5 Declaration of Kellie Lerner In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order, #6 Exhibit 1 - Robins Kaplan LLP's Firm Resume, #7 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Order)(LERNER, KELLIE)
September 26, 2023 Filing 16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY. (FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William V. Reiss and Jonathan Edelman. Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
September 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William V. Reiss and Jonathan Edelman by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY. (LERNER, KELLIE)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint; The deadline to respond is now 11/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/19/2023. (jal, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFARILAND, LLC identifying Cadre Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Richard B. Harper to the Hon. Rukhsanah L. Singh, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. HARPER on behalf of SAFARILAND, LLC (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER extending the deadline to respond to the Complaint until 11/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/18/2023. (jdg)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Rukhsanah L. Singh, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. PADILLA on behalf of AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. (PADILLA, ERIC)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. (O'REILLY, KATELYN)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 14, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg, )
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY. SAFARILAND, LLC served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (LERNER, KELLIE)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY. AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (LERNER, KELLIE)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AXON ENTERPRISE, INC., SAFARILAND, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, )
August 23, 2023 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (jjc, )
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AXON ENTERPRISE, INC., SAFARILAND, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14560682) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment)(LERNER, KELLIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEYv. AXON ENTERPRISE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, MONMOUTH COUNTY, NEW JERSEY
Represented By: KELLIE LERNER
Represented By: MICHAEL D FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXON ENTERPRISE, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ERIC S. PADILLA
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFARILAND, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD B. HARPER
Represented By: STEVEN A. HABER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?