MAGARIELLO et al v. SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC
Plaintiff: Clotilda S Magariello, Gerard V Magariello, CLOTILDA S. MAGARIELLO and GERARD V. MAGARIELLO
Defendant: Senior Care of Hamilton LLC and SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv12030
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert Kirsch
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed by no later than 1/30/2024. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/19/2023. (jal, )
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which Defendants may serve a responsive pleading, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, be and hereby is extended to 10/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/19/2023. (kht)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court by no later than 12/18/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/19/2023. (mm)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN DRISCOLL on behalf of SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC (DRISCOLL, ELIZABETH)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Order Extending Time to Answer)(MILLER, MALINDA)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC.(MILLER, MALINDA)
October 11, 2023 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference via Microsoft Teams held on 10/11/2023. (mm)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER granting request for the Rule 16 Conference to be conducted via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/6/2023. (jdg)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Defendant Senior Care of Hamilton, LLC d/b/a Hamilton Continuing Care re Rule 16 Conference. (DRISCOLL, ELIZABETH)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC. (MILLER, MALINDA)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/30/2023. (jal, )
August 29, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal filed by Malinda Miller on 8/28/2023 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jjc, )
August 29, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 29, 2023 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (jjc, )
August 29, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
August 29, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jjc, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Senior Care of Hamilton LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14600274), filed by Senior Care of Hamilton LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 7.1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, MALINDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAGARIELLO et al v. SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clotilda S Magariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard V Magariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLOTILDA S. MAGARIELLO
Represented By: LANCE D. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARD V. MAGARIELLO
Represented By: LANCE D. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Care of Hamilton LLC
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENIOR CARE OF HAMILTON, LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN DRISCOLL
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?