HONE v. LYNN et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD HONE
Defendant: CATHIE GRINNELL LYNN, CATHIE LYNN, JOHN LYNN and JOHN AND JANE DOE(S) 1-5
Case Number: 3:2023cv20383
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Georgette Castner
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Castner from RICHARD HONE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
October 10, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Seal Document. Motion set for 11/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
October 9, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Medical Records by RICHARD HONE. (Received via Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Certification)(mlh)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Castner from RICHARD HONE. (Received via Help Desk) (mlh)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Upon a review of the docket, it appears that personal sensitive information was filed with Plaintiff's Complaint (the Medical Form at Docket Entry Number 1-4). The Court temporarily SEALS that document. Plaintiff shall file a motion to permanently seal that document pursuant to this Court's Local Civil Rule 5.3(c) by no later than October 10, 2023. The Local Civil Rules can be accessed on the Court's website at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/26/2023. (mm)
September 14, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by RICHARD HONE. (jjc, )
September 14, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jjc, )
September 14, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jjc, )
September 14, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 2 CONSENT & REGISTRATION form to Receive Documents Electronically filed by RICHARD HONE (jjc, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 SS Benefits Letter, #4 Medical Form, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HONE v. LYNN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHIE GRINNELL LYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHIE LYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOE(S) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?