LEONARD v. BAYUK et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR.
Defendant: EDWARD BAYUK and MAXTMAX LLC
In Re: PAUL A. MORABITO
Case Number: 3:2023cv21314
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANTS SUMMATION AND EXHIBITS. Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANTS SUMMATION AND EXHIBITS by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tod S. Chasin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CHASIN, TOD)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Edward Bayuk's letter dated 11/22/23 (Dkt. #9 ) requesting an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendant Bayuk's letter was filed the same day that the Clerk entered default against defendants. In light of the potential retention of counsel to represent defendants in this action, the Court hereby grants defendants until 1/12/2024 to have counsel enter an appearance on their behalf and file a motion to vacate default by that date. If counsel for defendant Bayuk does not enter an appearance, Bayuk may file a pro se motion to vacate the entry of default no later than 1/12/2024. The Court reminds defendants that defendant MAXTMAX may not represent itself pro se. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/8/2023. (cry)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from EDWARD BAYUK requesting an extension of time. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Banckruptcy Summation, #3 Exhibits 1-6, #4 Exhibits 7-11, #5 Exhibits 12-18, #6 Exhibits 19-27, #7 Exhibits 28-44)(amv)
November 22, 2023 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EDWARD BAYUK and MAXTMAX LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (amv)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR against EDWARD BAYUK AND MAXTMAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tod S. Chasin with Exhibits A and B attached, #2 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Certificate of Default of Defendant MaxTMax LLC, #3 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Certificate of Default of Defendant Bayuk)(CHASIN, TOD)
November 20, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Request for Entry of Default #7 filed by TOD CHASIN on 11/17/23 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. The Clerk's Office has terminated the Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE REQUEST USING *REQUEST FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants EDWARD BAYUK AND MAXTMAX LLC by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tod Chasin with Exhibits A and B, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHASIN, TOD)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR. (CHASIN, TOD)
November 10, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR. EDWARD BAYUK served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (CHASIN, TOD)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR. MAXTMAX LLC served on 10/24/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (CHASIN, TOD)
October 24, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS filed by TOD CHASIN on 10/23/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (mlh)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR (CHASIN, TOD) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/24/2023) (mlh, ).
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EDWARD BAYUK, MAXTMAX LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, )
October 20, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
October 20, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The PROPOSED SUMMONS was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Please email a flattened version to ecfhelp@njd.uscourts.gov for replacement on the docket. (jjc, )
October 20, 2023 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (jjc, )
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edward Bayuk, MAXTMAX LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14807274), filed by WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR., as Chapter 7 Trustee in the Chapter 7 bankruptcy case captioned In re: Paul A. Morabito, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, District of Nevada, Case No. 13-51237-GWZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(CHASIN, TOD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEONARD v. BAYUK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PAUL A. MORABITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. LEONARD, JR.
Represented By: TOD S. CHASIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD BAYUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXTMAX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?