AUTREY v. KENVUE INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT JAMES AUTREY
Defendant: KENVUE INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH and HEATHER HOWLETT
Case Number: 3:2023cv22435
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER consolidating cases, appointing lead Plaintiff, and appointing lead and liaison counsel. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/28/2023. (kht)
December 28, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (kht)
December 20, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, TAKAYUKI ONO, ESQ. and CHRISTOPHER Y. LEE, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mlh)
December 20, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KRISTEN R. SEEGER and JOHN M. SHAKUN III, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Takayuki Ono, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher Y. Lee, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John M. Skakun III, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kristen R. Seeger, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 18, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Kristen R. Seeger, Christopher Y. Lee, John M. Skakun III and Takayuki Ono: $ 600, receipt number 136132 (jjc, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENVUE INC.. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to Takayuki Ono. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/8/2023. (kht)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to John M. Skakun III. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/8/2023. (kht)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to Christopher Y. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/8/2023. (kht)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to Kristen R. Seeger. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/8/2023. (kht)
December 8, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David R. Kott, Esq. iso Motion for the Admission of T. Ono, Esq. PHV, #2 Certification of T. Ono, Esq. iso Motion for Admission PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order for the Admission of T. Ono, Esq. PHV, #4 Certificate of Service)(KOTT, DAVID)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David R. Kott, Esq. iso Motion for the Admission of J. Skakun, III, Esq., Esq. PHV, #2 Certification of J. Skakun, III, Esq. iso of Motion for Admission PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order for the Admission of J. Skakun, III, Esq. PHV, #4 Certificate of Service)(KOTT, DAVID)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David R. Kott, Esq. iso Motion for the Admission of C. Lee, Esq. PHV, #2 Certification of C. Lee iso of Motion for Admission PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order for the Admission of C. Lee, Esq. PHV, #4 Certificate of Service)(KOTT, DAVID)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David R. Kott, Esq. iso Motion for the Admission of K. Seeger, Esq. PHV, #2 Certification of K. Seeger iso of Motion for Admission PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order for the Admission of K. Seeger, Esq. PHV, #4 Certificate of Service)(KOTT, DAVID)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. KOTT on behalf of HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH (KOTT, DAVID)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg, )
November 17, 2023 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (jdg)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEATHER HOWLETT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KENVUE INC., THIBAUT MONGON, PAUL RUH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14879040) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERT JAMES AUTREY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTREY v. KENVUE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JAMES AUTREY
Represented By: THOMAS HENRY PRZYBYLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENVUE INC.
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THIBAUT MONGON
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL RUH
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER HOWLETT
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?