CHITESTER v. US BANK et al
Plaintiff: DEBORAH CHITESTER
Defendant: US BANK and FAY SERVICING
Case Number: 3:2023cv22554
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 27 Letter requesting clarity of case from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via Help Desk)(kht)
January 18, 2024 Filing 26 Letter from DEBORAH CHITESTER regarding re submission of the IFP. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
January 18, 2024 Filing 25 Letter requesting an IFP Application from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (kht)
January 15, 2024 Filing 24 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jjc, )
January 13, 2024 Filing 23 Letter from DEBORAH CHITESTER requesting 21 days to resubmit IFP and amended complaint. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Denying #1 -2 APPLICATION IFP without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to Close the file. Plaintiff may submit an amended application for in forma pauperis status or submit payment in the amount of $402 within 14 days toreopen the case without further action from the Court. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/11/2024. (jdg)
January 11, 2024 Filing 21 Letter from DEBORAH CHITESTER requesting relief. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
January 11, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdg)
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 Letter from DEBORAH CHITESTER regarding processing complaint and in forma pauperis. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
December 31, 2023 Filing 19 Submission Received requesting status of IFP application and service of defendants from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (mlh)
December 26, 2023 Filing 18 SUBMISSION received from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(amv)
December 26, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
December 24, 2023 Filing 16 Additional information to #13 pleading by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 Submission Received from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Received by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
December 16, 2023 Filing 13 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Received by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via Help Desk)(kht)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Received by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Submission)(mlh)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 Submission to the Court requesting time frame regarding IFP Application approval from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlh)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via Help Desk)(kht)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Deborah Chitester. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jdg)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 Letter requesting a status update from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (A courtesy copy of the docket sheet was sent to Plaintiff via regular mail on 11/30/2023) (jdg)
November 24, 2023 Filing 7 BRIEF by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Exhibit)(mlh)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Letter to the Court from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Tracking Info)(jal, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Submission Received from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(mlh)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jdg, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Letter from DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jdg)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent to Receive Electronic Notifications by DEBORAH CHITESTER. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jdg)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Attachment regarding Exhibits)(jdg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHITESTER v. US BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH CHITESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?