VAZQUEZ v. THE PEDDLER OF LONG BRANCH NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: LUCINDA M VAZQUEZ
Defendant: THE PEDDLER OF LONG BRANCH NEW JERSEY and SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2023cv22650
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Robert Kirsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Settlement Conference on 2/8/2024 at 11:00 AM via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. An email invite will be sent before the hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/24/2024. (eh, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Kirsch: Telephone Conference held on 1/22/2024. (Court Reporter, Carol Farrell (856-318-6100)) (pdm)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Conference of January 16 has been re-scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Monday, January 22, 2024. Participating parties are directed to dial 888-684-8852 and when prompted, enter access code 1317475. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 01/16/2024. (pdm)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Specialized Bicycle Components, Inc.'s request for a pre-motion conference (ECF No. #9 ) and Plaintiff's response to same (ECF No. #11 ). Parties are advised that a Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 16, 2024. To participate, please dial 888-684-8852 and when prompted, enter access code 1317475. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 01/05/2024. (pdm)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Letter. (ALLEGRA, EDWARD)
January 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD A ALLEGRA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ALLEGRA, EDWARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 29, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Patrick F. Lynott to Hon. Robert Kirsch, U.S.D.J., Requesting Pre-Motion Conference on behalf of Specialized Bicycle Components, Inc. (LYNOTT, PATRICK)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ) filed by Specialized Bicycle Components, Inc. is denied without prejudice for failing to abide by the Courts judicial preferences #Judicial Preferences. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/20/2023. (pdm)
December 18, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Patrick F. Lynott re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (LYNOTT, PATRICK)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from John H. Sanders, II, Esq.. (SANDERS, JOHN)
December 4, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC.. Responses due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification P. Lynott Certification in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to P. Lynott Cert., #4 Exhibit B to P. Lynott Cert., #5 Exhibit C to P. Lynott Cert., #6 Exhibit D to P. Lynott Cert., #7 Exhibit E to P. Lynott Cert., #8 Exhibit F to P. Lynott Cert., #9 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #10 Certificate of Service)(LYNOTT, PATRICK)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC. identifying Specialized Bicycle Components Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (LYNOTT, PATRICK)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC.. (LYNOTT, PATRICK)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to Edward A. Allegra at 426 Navesink Avenue Suite 2 Highlands, New Jersey 07732. (jal, )
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
November 28, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
November 28, 2023 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )
November 28, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC. from MONMOUTH COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, case number MON-L-1339-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14896771), filed by SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification P. Lynott Certification in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A to P. Lynott Cert., #4 Exhibit B to P. Lynott Cert., #5 Exhibit C to P. Lynott Cert., #6 Exhibit D to P. Lynott Cert., #7 Exhibit E to P. Lynott Cert.)(LYNOTT, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAZQUEZ v. THE PEDDLER OF LONG BRANCH NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCINDA M VAZQUEZ
Represented By: EDWARD A ALLEGRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PEDDLER OF LONG BRANCH NEW JERSEY
Represented By: THOMAS F. SHEBELL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED BICYCLE COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK FERRIS LYNOTT
Represented By: PATRICK F. LYNOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?