S.O. et al v. FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOLS
Plaintiff: SEAN OCONNELL, KELLY O'CONNELL, S.O. and K.O.
Defendant: FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 3:2023cv22762
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Robert Kirsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording #18 Transcript,,, . Motion set for 2/5/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording #18 Transcript,,, by FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anne R. Myers, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
January 8, 2024 Filing 18 Transcript of IN-PERSON CONFERENCE held on 1/3/2024, before Judge KIRSCH. Court Reporter Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/29/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2024. (jjc, )
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER withdrawing the Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 1/4/2024. (jdg)
January 5, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdg)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 Letter from Michael I Inzelbuch, Esq. (INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Kirsch: Status Conference held on 1/3/2024. (Court Reporter, Carol Farrell (856-318-6100)) (pdm)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 Transcript of TELECONFERENCE held on 12/7/2023, before Judge Judge Robert Kirsch. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/17/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2024. (jal, ) Modified on 12/29/2023 (jal, ).
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite (ECF No. #2 ) in person on Wednesday, January 3, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4E at the Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse in Trenton. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/19/2023. (pdm)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Michael I Inzelbuch, Esq. (INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KELLY O'CONNELL, SEAN OCONNELL re #2 First MOTION to Expedite (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of M Inzelbuch, #2 Certification Certification of Service)(INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold oral argument in person on Plaintiff's "Motion to Expedite" (ECF No. #2 ) on Wednesday, December 20, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4E at the Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse in Trenton. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/11/2023. (pdm)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE ROBBINS MYERS on behalf of FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION (MYERS, ANNE)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION re #2 First MOTION to Expedite (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anne R. Myers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Kirsch: Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2023. (Court Reporter, Carol Farrell (856-318-6100))(pdm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/11/2023) (pdm, ).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Test of electronic notification. Plaintiff is to confirm receipt. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/07/2023. (pdm)
December 6, 2023 #2 First MOTION to Expedite no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (cry)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite seeking emergent relief (ECF No. #2 ). The Court will hold a teleconference with counsel for the parties on Thursday, December 7, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. To participate, please dial 888-684-8852 and when prompted, enter access code 1317475. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of their Motion to Expedite along with a copy of this Text Order on Defendant by no later than Tuesday, December 5, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/01/2023. (pdm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Flemington-Raritan Regional Schools. Flemington-Raritan Regional Schools waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (MYERS, ANNE)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION to Expedite by KELLY O'CONNELL, SEAN OCONNELL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Certification Certification of MII, #8 Certification Certification of Service, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flemington-Raritan Regional Schools ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14906796), filed by SEAN OCONNELL, KELLY O'CONNELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certification Certification of MII, #8 Certification Certification of Service)(INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
November 30, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
November 30, 2023 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (jdg)
November 30, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION to Expedite . Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.O. et al v. FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN OCONNELL
Represented By: MICHAEL I. INZELBUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY O'CONNELL
Represented By: MICHAEL I. INZELBUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.O.
Represented By: MICHAEL I. INZELBUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.O.
Represented By: MICHAEL I. INZELBUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEMINGTON-RARITAN REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ANNE ROBBINS MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?