ROBERTS v. EZRICARE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Roberts
Defendant: EZRICARE, LLC and EZRIRX, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv22827
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Georgette Castner
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Defendants' pre-motion conference letters (ECF Nos. #13 & #14 ) and Plaintiff's responses (ECF Nos. #18 & #19 ). Based on the Court's review, the pre-motion conference requirement is hereby waived. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the entry of this order. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 1/18/24. (adi)
January 18, 2024 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BLAKE G. ABBOTT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (amv)
January 17, 2024 Filing 19 Letter from Blake G. Abbott re #13 Letter. (FURIA, PHILIP)
January 17, 2024 Filing 18 Letter from Blake G. Abbott re #14 Letter. (FURIA, PHILIP)
January 17, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Blake G. Abbott to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FURIA, PHILIP)
January 17, 2024 Pro Hac Vice fee for Blake G. Abbott: $ 150, receipt number 136598 (jjc, )
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to BLAKE G. ABBOTT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/12/2024. (kht)
January 11, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Blake G. Abbott by CRYSTAL ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(FURIA, PHILIP)
January 11, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Blake G. Abbott. Motion set for 2/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
January 10, 2024 Filing 14 Letter from Defendant EzriCare, LLC. (FOGEL, MAUREEN)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 Letter from Defendant EzriRx, LLC. (FOGEL, MAUREEN)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendant EzriRx, LLC an extension of time until 1/10/2023 to respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 12/29/2023. (kht)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant EzriCare, LLC an extension of time until 1/10/2023 to respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 12/29/2023. (kht)
December 29, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The #9 and #10 Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by EZRIRX, LLC, EZRICARE, LLC on 12/28/2023 has been DENIED as it is beyond the scope of what the Clerk can grant. This request has been forwarded to Chambers. (kht)
December 29, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added MAUREEN FOGEL as representing EZRICARE, LLC and EZRIRX, LLC in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (kht)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant EzriRx, LLC.. (FOGEL, MAUREEN)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant EzriCare, LLC.. (FOGEL, MAUREEN)
December 22, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, PAUL DOOLITTLE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (kht)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Paul Doolittle to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FURIA, PHILIP)
December 19, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Paul Doolittle: $ 150, receipt number 136169 (jjc, )
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul Doolittle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 12/15/2023. (jal, )
December 15, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul Doolittle. Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul Doolittle by CRYSTAL ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FURIA, PHILIP)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRYSTAL ROBERTS. EZRIRX, LLC served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FURIA, PHILIP)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRYSTAL ROBERTS. EZRICARE, LLC served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FURIA, PHILIP)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by CRYSTAL ROBERTS. (FURIA, PHILIP)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EZRICARE, LLC, EZRIRX, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
December 5, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (amv)
December 5, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (amv)
December 4, 2023 Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (amv)
December 4, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EZRICARE, LLC, EZRIRX, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-14912021) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Crystal Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(FURIA, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS v. EZRICARE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Roberts
Represented By: PHILIP FURIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZRICARE, LLC
Represented By: MAUREEN DOERNER FOGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZRIRX, LLC
Represented By: MAUREEN DOERNER FOGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?