PORT v. CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Plaintiff: HOWARD PORT
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Petitioner: Scott C. Savett, Sheryl Barnes, Samuel Hans, Ronald Hopkins, Jerry Magana, Seth Martindale, Gregory Mishkin, Andrew Molloy, Jay Nagdimon, Neelima Panchang, Sailesh Panchang, Patrick Perger Jr., Jane Rossetti, Amber Terrell, Angela Uherbelau, Gwendolyn Wright, Elizabeth Zawacki and Ayal Brennan
Case Number: 3:2024cv01006
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Robert Kirsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER that Capital One's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until fourteen days after the entry of any order denying the Proposed Intervenors' motion to stay proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/10/2024. (kht)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 Exhibit to #8 Motion for Joinder - Proposed Order by CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (SCRIVO, THOMAS)
April 4, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Joinder in Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene and Motion for Stay of Action. Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
April 4, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A Text of Proposed Order and other supporting documents required by the rules of this Court, when filing a motion was not submitted with #8 Motion for Joinder submitted by Thomas Scrivo on 4/3/2024. PLEASE SUBMIT THE MISSING DOCUMENT(S) ONLY USING EVENT *Exhibit to Document* and linking it to the Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder in Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene and Motion for Stay of Action by CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (SCRIVO, THOMAS)
April 1, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Intervene and Stay Proceedings. Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 First MOTION to Intervene and Stay Proceedings by Scott C. Savett, Sheryl Barnes, Samuel Hans, Ronald Hopkins, Jerry Magana, Seth Martindale, Gregory Mishkin, Andrew Molloy, Jay Nagdimon, Neelima Panchang, Sailesh Panchang, Patrick Perger Jr., Jane Rossetti, Amber Terrell, Angela Uherbelau, Gwendolyn Wright, Elizabeth Zawacki, Ayal Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Movants' Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Declaration of Timothy D. Brennan, Esq., #3 Exhibit Ex. A - Savett v. Capital One, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Hopkins v. Capital One, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - Port v. Capital One, #6 Exhibit Ex. D - Sim v. Capital One, #7 Exhibit Ex. E - Pitts v. Capital One, #8 Exhibit Ex. F - Bellantoni v. Capital One, #9 Exhibit Ex. G - Motion to Consolidate and Transfer, #10 Text of Proposed Order Movants' Proposed Order)(BRENNAN, TIMOTHY)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER extending Defendant's deadline to answer, move, orotherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 4/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/7/2024. (jdg)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. SCRIVO on behalf of CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (SCRIVO, THOMAS)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HOWARD PORT. CAPITAL ONE, N.A. served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. (KING, BRADLEY)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by HOWARD PORT. (KING, BRADLEY)
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
February 22, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
February 21, 2024 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15107615) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HOWARD PORT. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KING, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORT v. CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD PORT
Represented By: BRADLEY KEITH KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Represented By: THOMAS J. SCRIVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott C. Savett
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheryl Barnes
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Hans
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Hopkins
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Magana
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Seth Martindale
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Mishkin
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Molloy
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay Nagdimon
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neelima Panchang
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sailesh Panchang
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Perger Jr.
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jane Rossetti
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amber Terrell
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela Uherbelau
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gwendolyn Wright
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elizabeth Zawacki
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ayal Brennan
Represented By: TIMOTHY BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?