KIM et al v. HANLON et al
Plaintiff: ANDY KIM, ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH and CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS
Defendant: CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON, SCOTT M. COLABELLA, PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO, MARY H. MELFI, STEVE PETER, HOLLY MACKEY, NANCY J PINKIN, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, JOHN S HOGAN, JOANNE SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH RIPA, RITA ROTHBERG, CELESTE M. RILEY, CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, JAMES N. HOGAN, E. JUNIOR MALDONADO, ANN GROSSI, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI, MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE, Shirley Maia-Cusick, Albert Harshaw and Hector Castillo
Intervenor: LAURA ALI, JOSE ARANGO, New Jersey Republican Chairs Association, Camden County Democratic Committee and GREGORY MELE
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY, Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, AAPI New Jersey, Asian Americans Advancing Justice, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice, Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle and Ravi Bhalla and New Jersey Law Professors
Interested Party: DALE CROSS, JEFF PARROTT and TAHESHA WAY
Case Number: 3:2024cv01098
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Transcript of Emergency Case Management Conference Via Teams Video conference held on 3/26/2024, before Judge Judge ZAHID N. QURAISHI. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/6/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2024. (jal, )
April 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 3/18/2024, before Judge Judge ZAHID N. QURAISHI. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/6/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2024. (jal, )
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to NUZHAT CHOWDHURY: $ 250, receipt number 137970 (jdg)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER of USCA Because all of the appellants in Nos. 24-1593 and 24-1602 have withdrawn their appeals, those appeals are dismissed with prejudice and without cost to any party. A certified copy of this order is issued in lieu of a formal mandate. (ca3tmm, )
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE by DALE CROSS, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, JAMES N. HOGAN, MARY H. MELFI, CELESTE M. RILEY, RITA ROTHBERG (CARBONE, JOHN)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 227 LETTER ORDER Denying Motions to Intervene (ECF Nos. #221 and #226 ) without prejudice to Movants' rights to renew their applications at a later time with submissions that fully comply with Rule 24. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/3/2024. (kas)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION to Intervene by Hector Castillo, Albert Harshaw, GREGORY MELE, Shirley Maia-Cusick. (Received via Help Desk)(kht)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 225 USCA Case Number 24-1602 for #216 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by SCOTT M. COLABELLA. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, )
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 224 USCA Case Number 24-1601 for #215 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, )
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 223 USCA Case Number 24-1594 for #201 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Camden County Democratic Committee. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, )
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 222 USCA Case Number 24-1593 for #200 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by JOANNE RAJOPPI, CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, )
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #226 MOTION to Intervene. Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #220 Emergency MOTION to Intervene , #221 Amended MOTION to Intervene To Include New Jersey Republican Chairs Association and Chairman Jose Arango to Pending Motion [Dkt. 211] and to Address the Issue of Jurisdiction Raised by the Court's Order of April 1, 2024 [Dkt. 212]. Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Amended MOTION to Intervene To Include New Jersey Republican Chairs Association and Chairman Jose Arango to Pending Motion [Dkt. 211] and to Address the Issue of Jurisdiction Raised by the Court's Order of April 1, 2024 [Dkt. 212] by LAURA ALI, Morris County Republican Committee, JOSE ARANGO, New Jersey Republican Chairs Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief Amended Brief In Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by GREGORY MELE, Shirley Maia-Cusick, Albert Harshaw, Hector Castillo. (KOVIC, ROBERT)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 219 LETTER ORDER DENYING Motions to Stay (ECF Nos. 198, 204, 205, 217). Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/1/2024. (kas)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 218 LETTER ORDER that Mr. Harshaw is a non-party to the lawsuit and therefore has no standing to pursue an appeal of the decision in this matter. Moreover, the deadline to move to intervene as to the motion for preliminary injunction has passed. Therefore, the arguments presented will not be considered by this Court. Mr. Harshaw, and any other candidates now hoping to join the plenary suit, are encouraged to consult with counsel as to the proper means by which to join this case. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/1/2024. (mlh)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION to Stay re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals by NANCY J PINKIN. (WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #194 OPINION and #195 ORDER by SCOTT M. COLABELLA. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-15234831. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 4/1/2024. (THOMPSON, MATHEW) Modified on 4/1/2024 (mlh).
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #195 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 and DENYING Defendants Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. #152 - #158 ) by ALBERT HARSHAW (Received via ECF Help Desk). Notice of Appeal received with no filing fee or ifp application. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: #1 Statement)(mlh, )
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, #204 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, #195 Order on Motion in Limi (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Noah Baron to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SHAH, NIYATI) (Main Document 213 replaced on 4/1/2024) (jdg, ).
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 212 TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed the Motion to Intervene #210 and Emergent Application #211 filed by the Morris County Republican Committee and Laura Ali. Any response to the Motion shall be filed by 04/03/2024, and shall include briefing as to whether, given the appeals filed, this Court continues to have the jurisdiction required to decide the Motion. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/1/2024. (kas)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #210 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, #204 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, #195 Order on Motion in Limi. Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, NOAH BARON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg)
March 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 211 APPLICATION/PETITION for Emergent Determination of Motion to Intervene for Laura Ali and Morris County Republican Committee for by LAURA ALI, Morris County Republican Committee. (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
March 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Intervene by LAURA ALI, Morris County Republican Committee. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MOENCH, MATTHEW)
March 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Letter from Edward J. Florio re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (FLORIO, EDWARD)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Letter from Mark R. Natale, Esq., counsel for Defendant Burlington County Clerk re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals. (NATALE, MARK)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 207 LETTER ORDER clarifying that the Preliminary Injunction Order #195 applies to the 2024 Democratic Primary but NOT the 2024 Republican Primary. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 03/30/2024. (Gonzalez, P)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC H. JASO on behalf of CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON (JASO, ERIC)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Letter from Jason S. Nunnermacker, Esq. re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals. (NUNNERMACKER, JASON)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Camden County Democratic Committee. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER JOSEPH KING on behalf of MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE (KING, PETER)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ANGELO A. STIO, III terminated. Attorney SCOTT D. SALMON for Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle and Ravi Bhalla added.. (SALMON, SCOTT)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #194 Opinion by Camden County Democratic Committee. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-15231520. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 4/29/2024. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #194 Opinion by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, JOANNE RAJOPPI. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number BNJDC-15231414. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 4/29/2024. (GENOVA, ANGELO)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 199 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs have until 4/1/2024 at 12:00pm to respond to Ecf No. #198 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/29/2024. (kas)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Emergency Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals by DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay Injunction)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH on behalf of MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Letter from Matthew C. Moench, Esq., to Hon. Zahid N. Quraishi, U.S.D.J., confirming that the Court's March 29 Order (DKT 195) Is Not Applicable to the Republican Primary re #195 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #194 Opinion. (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 and DENYING Defendants Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. 152-158). Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/29/2024. (kas)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 194 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/29/2024. (kas)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Letter from F. Komuves enclosing list of submissions pertinent to consideration of Plaintiffs' motion re 187 Order on Oral Motion,,. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel explaining no material change to record. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Letter from Defendant County Clerks. (NATALE, MARK)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Letter from William M. Tambussi, Esquire on behalf of Intervenor Camden County Democratic Committee re 185 Order,,. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JENNIFER BOREK terminated. Attorney RAJIV D. PARIKH for DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF added.. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Letter from F. Komuves updating status of bracketing, line, and slogans of plaintiffs. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 187 TEXT ORDER that, with the parties anticipated submissions by 5:00 p.m. today 03/27/2024, the Court views the briefing as complete on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 . Given the size of the record for the Motion and the large number of filings on the docket, the parties are Ordered to confer and file a joint letter by 10:00 p.m. today that identifies all submissions to the Court pertinent to its consideration of the Motion (including amicus curiae briefs). So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 03/27/2024.
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Letter from F. Komuves re status of bracketing, line, and slogans of plaintiffs. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 185 TEXT ORDER that as soon as practicable tomorrow, 3/27/2024, Plaintiffs are to file a letter advising the Court and the other parties as to Plaintiffs' acceptance of any endorsements and/or bracketing by the counties; that by 5:00 p.m. tomorrow, 3/27/2025, the parties (Plaintiff, collective Defendants, and Intervenor CCDC) shall file simultaneous letters no longer than five (5) pages with respect to any effects on the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction caused by the "significant development in the factual record of this case" as articulated by Defendants' letter (ECF No. #174 ). So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/26/2024. (kas)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Case Management Conference via Teams held on 3/26/2024. Text order to be filed. (Court Reporter, Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319) (kas) (Main Document 184 replaced on 3/26/2024) (kas).
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel responding to DE 174 regarding live controversy for emergent relief. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Letter from Mark Natale. (NATALE, MARK)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Letter from William M. Tambussi, Esquire on behalf of Intervenor Camden County Democratic Committee re 178 Order,,. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 180 LETTER ORDER denying request to join the case management conference. Transcript may be obtained. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/25/2024. (jdg)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Letter from Patricia Campos-Medina. (SALMON, SCOTT)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 178 AMENDED TEXT ORDER that by 5:00 p.m. today, Plaintiffs shall respond to the letter filed by Defendant Clerk for Burlington County #174 regarding the withdrawal of Tammy Murphy from the 2024 Primary. An emergency case management video-conference will be conducted on the record before the undersigned on 03/26/2024 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel will receive teams invite via email. This will be for parties ONLY. A transcript may obtained by contacting Megan McKay-Soule. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/25/2024(kas)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 177 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD re #155 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. SAMUEL S.-H. WANG, #152 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS, #153 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM DR. JULIA SASS RUBIN PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 70, #158 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM MR. RYAN MACIAS, #156 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOSH PASEK, #157 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPLY OF DR. JOSH PASEK, PH.D, #154 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM ANDREW W. APPEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 176 TEXT ORDER that by 5:00 p.m. today, Plaintiffs shall respond to the letter filed by Defendant Clerks for Essex, Passaic, and Union Counties #175 regarding the withdrawal of Tammy Murphy from the 2024 Primary. An emergency case management video-conference will be conducted on the record before the undersigned on 03/26/2024 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel will receive teams invite via email. This will be for parties ONLY. A transcript may obtained by contacting Megan McKay-Soule. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/25/2024. (kas)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Letter from B.Pugach, Esq. re #165 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification in response to Letter regarding cross-examination)(BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Letter from Mark Natale. (NATALE, MARK)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel regarding question of bond re #166 Letter, #167 Letter. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received for Aseem Mulji and Kevin Hancock: $ 500, receipt number 137713 (jjc, )
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to NICHOLAS STEPHANOPOULOS $ 250, receipt number TRE137706 (kht)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel in response to NJAG Letter re #149 Letter. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Certification of Ryan Macias on behalf of ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD Re #152 Motion in Limine, #158 Motion in Limine. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Certification of Dr. Josh Pasek on behalf of ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD Re #152 Motion in Limine, #156 Motion in Limine. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Certification of Dr. Samuel S.-H. Wang on behalf of ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD Re #155 Motion in Limine, #152 Motion in Limine. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Certification of Dr. Julia Sass Rubin on behalf of ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD Re #152 Motion in Limine, #153 Motion in Limine,. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Letter from Christine Giordano Hanlon re Bond Cost. (NELSON, BRIAN)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Letter from Angelo J. Genova, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rajoppi with Exhibits)(GENOVA, ANGELO)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Letter. (GENOVA, ANGELO)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Letter from William M. Tambussi, Esquire on behalf of Intervenor CCDC in response to letter filed by N.J. Attorney General re #149 Letter. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Letter from Gordon J. Golum, Esq.. (GOLUM, GORDON)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Letter from William M. Tambussi, Esquire on behalf of Intervenor CCDC to join in on Motions in Limine re #155 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. SAMUEL S.-H. WANG, #152 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS, #153 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM DR. JULIA SASS RUBIN PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 70, #158 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM MR. RYAN MACIAS, #156 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOSH PASEK, #157 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPLY OF DR. JOSH PASEK, PH.D, #154 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM ANDREW W. APPEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Letter from B. Pugach with list of evidentiary hearing exhibits and attaching exhibits not in docket re 160 Order,. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 160 TEXT ORDER that by 03/20/2024 the parties are to file a joint letter identifying all exhibits introduced at the preliminary injunction hearing and where on the docket they have already been filed. For exhibits not already filed on the docket, copies must be attached. So ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/19/2024. (kas)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Motion for Preliminary Injuction and Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/18/2024. Ordered that Plaintiffs shall file any supplemental certifications from their experts in response to Defendants' Motions in Limine 1-7 by March 22, 2024; Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine 1-7 by 1:00 p.m. on March 25, 2024; and Defendants shall file any response to the #149 Letter filed by the New Jersey Attorney General by March 22, 2024 (Court Reporter, Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319) (kas)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM MR. RYAN MACIAS by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPLY OF DR. JOSH PASEK, PH.D by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOSH PASEK by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. SAMUEL S.-H. WANG by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM ANDREW W. APPEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM DR. JULIA SASS RUBIN PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 70 by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Certification of Benjamin R. Swartz on behalf of JOANNE SCHWARTZ. (NATALE, MARK)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #158 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM MR. RYAN MACIAS. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #152 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #157 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPLY OF DR. JOSH PASEK, PH.D. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #155 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. SAMUEL S.-H. WANG. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #153 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM DR. JULIA SASS RUBIN PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 70. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #154 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM ANDREW W. APPEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #156 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OR USE OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOSH PASEK. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
March 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Certification of Angelo J. Genova, Esq. on behalf of CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (GENOVA, ANGELO)
March 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Letter from New Jersey Attorney General Matthew J. Platkin. (FEIGENBAUM, JEREMY)
March 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER ORDER granting request to amend witness list. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 03/17/2024. (kas)
March 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Letter from Raj Parikh, Esq. requesting amendment to the witness list with Plaintiffs consent re #141 Order, #142 Letter. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT ORDER that, based on the parties' letters #143 , #144 , and #145 , the Court finds that Plaintiffs have substantially complied with the Court's prior discovery Order 126 requiring their production of privilege logs. Defendants' request for further privilege log production is therefore DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 03/16/2024.
March 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Letter. (WILLE, RICHARD)
March 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Letter from Mark Natale. (NATALE, MARK)
March 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel regarding discovery. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Letter from Raj Parikh, Esq. regarding an anticipated witness issue re #141 Order. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/15/2024. (kas)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE by DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF re #34 Order, Set Hearings, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Joint Proposed Evidentiary Hearing Agenda (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Certification on behalf of HOLLY MACKEY Re #57 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cover Letter)(BELL, JOSEPH)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 138 TEXT ORDER that to the extent clarification is needed, the Court's prior Order instructing Plaintiffs to produce privilege logs is NOT limited to ten communications. By no later than 1:00 p.m. tomorrow 03/16/2024, Plaintiffs are to produce updated privilege log(s). Logs are to include appropriate descriptive subject lines. In the meantime, the parties' request for a discovery conference is denied so that they and the Court can focus their efforts on preparing for the approaching hearing. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/15/2024. (kas)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Letter from F. Komuves re further abusive discovery practices. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 136 BRIEF of Amici Curiae League of Women Voters of New Jersey, Salvation and Social Justice, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, and New Jersey Policy Perspective (PATEL, HENAL)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Letter re #129 Letter, 126 Order,,,,. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 134 BRIEF Amici Curiae of New Jersey Law Professors (ROMBERG, JON)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TEXT ORDER that the joint proposed agenda for the hearing due today must be filed by no later than 1:30 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/15/2024. (kas)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #132 "BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE" submitted by HENAL PATEL on 3/14/2024 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 132 BRIEF of Amici Curiae League of Women Voters of New Jersey, Salvation and Social Justice, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, and New Jersey Policy Perspective (PATEL, HENAL)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by JON ROMBERG on behalf of New Jersey Law Professors (ROMBERG, JON)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 130 LETTER ORDER staying amici discovery. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/14/2024. (kas)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Letter from F. Komuves re abusive discovery demands served on amici. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 128 BRIEF in Support filed by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as Amicus Curiae (CHEN, RONALD)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNE LOCICERO on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed the parties' letters #98 , #101 , #103 , #106 , and #120 regarding their emergent discovery dispute. Defendants seek documents and information "that relate to the timing of Plaintiffs' preliminary injunction filing." (ECF No. 98 at 1.) Plaintiffs counter, inter alia, by asserting attorney-client privilege. (ECF No. 120 at 4.) In light of the impending hearing for the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, rather than conducting a discovery conference the Court addresses the parties' discovery dispute as follows. The Court finds that the timing of Plaintiffs' decision to seek relief may be relevant to their motion for a preliminary injunction. The Court, however, DENIES Defendants' request to compel engagement letters/retainer agreements, and copies of proposed communications between proposed experts. Plaintiffs are instead ordered to 1) immediately produce one or more appropriate privilege logs, and 2) produce one or more witnesses prepared to testify at the hearing scheduled for 03/18/2024 on the topic of the timing of Plaintiffs' decision to seek a preliminary injunction. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/14/2024. (kas)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ASEEM MULJI, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/14/2024. (mlh)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KEVIN HANCOCK, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/14/2023. (mlh)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to NUZHAT CHOWDHURY, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/14/2023. (mlh)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JERRY VATTAMALA, PATRICK STEGEMOELLER, RONAK PATEL, and NOAH BARON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/14/2024. (mlh)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 121 LETTER ORDER granting #41 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/14/2024. (mlh)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel re discovery. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Letter from Angelo J. Genova. (GENOVA, ANGELO)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 118 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle, and Ravi Bhalla (JENKIN, ROBERT)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 117 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae the American Civil Liberties Union of New Jersey (WEISBERG, LIZA)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 116 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae (SHAH, NIYATI)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter from Y.Bromberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ryan Macias Report in rebuttal to defense's contentions and in further support of Ps' motion for a preliminary injunction)(BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to NICHOLAS STEPHANOPOULOS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/13/2024. (amv)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 113 LETTER ORDER granting #96 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (jdg)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 112 TEXT ORDER that the pending Motions for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae #78 , #79 , #84 , #85 , #90 , and #109 are hereby GRANTED. Briefs are to be filed by no later that 03/15/2024. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (kas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 111 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs request to coordinate remote video conferencing. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (jdg)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Letter from Y.Bromberg seeking Court's Advisement on testifying witness's mode of attendance. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TEXT ORDER that the Court has received letters #101 , #103 , and #106 from various defendants joining the letter #98 filed by Defendants Durkin, Ireland- Imhof, and Rajoppi regarding an emergent discovery dispute. To preserve the parties' and the Court's resources, and to manage the Court's docket, the remaining defendants need not write separately to join and/or maintain objections identical to those already raised by letter #98 . So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (kas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TEXT ORDER that upon review the Court finds that the ex parte filing 99 is improper. The Clerk's Office is hereby instructed to STRIKE the filing by removing the document from the Court's docket and modifying the text of the docket entry to read ENTRY STRICKEN AS IMPROPER BY ORDER OF THE COURT ISSUED 03/13/2024. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (kas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Letter from MERCER COUNTY CLERK, PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO re #98 Letter. (TAVARES, MATTHEW)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TEXT ORDER that the prior Order 100 setting a deadline for amicus briefs is hereby VACATED; the Court previously set a deadline of 03/12/2024 for the filing of Motions for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae. That deadline remains in effect and has expired. See Transcript #39 of Case Management Conference conducted 02/29/2024. Accordingly, no further Motions will be considered. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (kas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELO A. STIO, III on behalf of Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle and Ravi Bhalla (STIO, ANGELO)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Letter re #101 Letter. (FLORIO, EDWARD)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TEXT ORDER that in light of the emergent nature of the preliminary junction proceedings, the undersigned will address the Letter #98 raising certain discovery disputes filed by Defendants Durkin, Ireland-Imhof, and Rajoppi, and any opposition to Defendants' letter shall be filed by 03/14/2024 at 1:00 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (kas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Letter from Mark R. Natale. (NATALE, MARK)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 100 VACATED TEXT ORDER that in light of the expedited nature of the proceedings related to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 , any motion to appear amicus curiae for the purposes of the preliminary injunction shall be filed by no later than 03/15/2024. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/13/2024. (kas)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ENTRY STRICKEN AS IMPROPER BY ORDER OF THE COURT ISSUED 03/13/2024. Modified on 3/13/2024 (gxh).
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter from Raj Parikh, Esq. regarding emergent discovery dispute. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 97 BRIEF Letter accompanying Ps' Reply Brief (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Exhibit C of Plaintiffs' contemporaneously filed Reply Brief in Support of PI Motion)(BROMBERG, YAEL)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added RYAN HAYGOOD as representing League of Women Voters of New Jersey, Salvation and Social Justice, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice and New Jersey Policy Perspective in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (kht)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #109 MOTION for Leave to File. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #96 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' reply brief (DE95), #79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae , #84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae , #78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae and File Brief, #85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae , #90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order #109 MOTION for Leave to File, #79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae , #78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae and File Brief, #85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae , #96 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' reply brief (DE95), #84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae , #90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (eh, )
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION of New Jersey Law Professors seeking Leave to File an Amici Curiae Brief in support of neither party by JON ROMBERG. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification)(mlh)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' reply brief (DE95) by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Komuves w Exhibits)(KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of H. Patel in Support of A. Mulji Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Certification Certification of A. Mulji in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of H. Patel in Support of KPH Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Certification Certification of K. Hancock in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of H. Patel in Support of NJC Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Certification Certification of N. Chowdhury in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT AUSTIN JENKIN, II on behalf of Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle and Ravi Bhalla (JENKIN, ROBERT)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle and Ravi Bhalla. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law ISO of Leave to File Amicus Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae, #3 Brief Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, #4 Declaration Declaration of Joe Cohn, #5 Declaration Declaration of Staci Berger, #6 Declaration Declaration of James Solomon, #7 Declaration Declaration of Valerie Vainieri Huttle, #8 Declaration Declaration of Ravi Bhalla, #9 Certificate of Service)(JENKIN, ROBERT)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD K. CHEN on behalf of Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School (CHEN, RONALD)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by MICAURI VARGAS on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, Salvation and Social Justice (VARGAS, MICAURI)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by MICAURI VARGAS on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, Salvation and Social Justice (VARGAS, MICAURI)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by HENAL PATEL on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, Salvation and Social Justice (PATEL, HENAL)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE, New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief Motion and Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by AAPI New Jersey, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Asian Americans Advancing Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Declaration of Niyati Shah, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Niyati Shah, #4 Exhibit 1 to Motion- Proposed Amicus Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAH, NIYATI)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, AAPI New Jersey, Asian Americans Advancing Justice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Niyati Shah, #2 Declaration of Ronak Patel (moving for pro hac admission), #3 Declaration of Jerry Vattamala (moving for pro hac admission), #4 Declaration of Patrick Stegemoeller (moving for pro hac admission), #5 Declaration of Noah Baron (moving for pro hac admission), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAH, NIYATI)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Camden County Democratic Committee re #41 MOTION to Intervene (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Letter from William M. Tambussi, Esquire seeking leave to file a Reply Brief. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Ronald Chen in support of PHV of N Stephanopoulos, #2 Certification Cert of N Stephanopoulos in support of PHV for Nicholas Stephanopoulos, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting PHV admission to Nicholas Stephanopolous, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for PHV motion)(CHEN, RONALD)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law ISO Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae, #3 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School)(CHEN, RONALD)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae and File Brief by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Certification of Liza Weisberg in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WEISBERG, LIZA)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD re #41 MOTION to Intervene (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER ORDER Granting #70 County Clerk's request for leave to file an overlength brief. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/8/2024. (amv)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting #62 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/8/2024. (amv)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER that, as the Court advised the parties during the case management conference on 02/29/2024, the undersigned will not be considering dispositive motions at this time. It remains the Court's intent to first address the pending emergent Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #5 . Accordingly, the Cross Motion to Dismiss #71 filed by Defendants Durkin, Ireland-Imhof, and Rajoppi is hereby STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. In the meantime, to maintain the parties' focus on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the deadlines for ALL Defendants to respond to the Verified Complaint is hereby STAYED. So Ordered this So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/8/2024. (kas)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Exhibit to #68 Response to Motion, #69 Response to Motion CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE - CORRECTED by SCOTT M. COLABELLA. (THOMPSON, MATHEW)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON on behalf of SCOTT M. COLABELLA (THOMPSON, MATHEW)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7) and 19 by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. Responses due by 3/12/2024. (BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SCOTT M. COLABELLA re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE - CORRECTED (THOMPSON, MATHEW)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SCOTT M. COLABELLA re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, MATHEW)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSSA LOTT on behalf of Camden County Democratic Committee (LOTT, ALYSSA)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by JAIME RICHARD PLACEK on behalf of JOHN S HOGAN (PLACEK, JAIME)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOANNE SCHWARTZ re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(NATALE, MARK)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's preliminary injunction and in support of their Cross-Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #53 RESPONSE in Opposition submitted by Mark Natale on 3/6/2024 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdg)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #64 Letter filed by Rajiv Parikh on 3/7/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a MOTION. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE LETTER USING LETTER, found under Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdg)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 63 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOANNE RAJOPPI re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Notice of Cross Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification Certification of Nicole Nollette)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON. (SPIRO, JASON)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit on behalf of ES&S, #2 Certification of Christine Giordan Hanlon, #3 Certification of Counsel re: Unpub. Opinions, #4 Exhibit A to Certification of Counsel, #5 Exhibit B to Certification of Counsel, #6 Exhibit C to Certification of Counsel, #7 Index D to Certification of Counsel, #8 Attorney Affirmation)(SPIRO, JASON)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 60 BRIEF in Opposition filed by STEVE PETER re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certification of Somerset County Clerk Steve Peter)(WILLE, RICHARD)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 BRIEF in Opposition filed by E. JUNIOR MALDONADO re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certification)(FLORIO, EDWARD)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq.. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion filed by HOLLY MACKEY re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of County Clerk, #2 Certification Cert of County Counsel, #3 Exhibit County Counsel Cert Ex A)(BELL, JOSEPH)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. BELL, JR on behalf of HOLLY MACKEY (BELL, JOSEPH)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SCOTT WILLIAMS on behalf of NANCY J PINKIN (WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 BRIEF in Opposition filed by NANCY J PINKIN re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CERT. OF Deborah Braga, #2 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JOANNE SCHWARTZ re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(NATALE, MARK)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON STEWART NUNNERMACKER on behalf of JOHN S HOGAN (NUNNERMACKER, JASON)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (TAVARES, MATTHEW)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JOHN S HOGAN. (NUNNERMACKER, JASON)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by ANN GROSSI re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (BOHN, KIRSTIN)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JOSEPH RIPA re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (GOLDBERG, HOWARD)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. CARBONE on behalf of DALE CROSS, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, JAMES N. HOGAN, MARY H. MELFI, CELESTE M. RILEY, RITA ROTHBERG (CARBONE, JOHN)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by DALE CROSS, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, JAMES N. HOGAN, MARY H. MELFI, CELESTE M. RILEY, RITA ROTHBERG re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CARBONE, JOHN)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by DALE CROSS, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, JAMES N. HOGAN, MARY H. MELFI, CELESTE M. RILEY, RITA ROTHBERG re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CARBONE, JOHN)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOSEPH J. GIRALO, JAMES N. HOGAN, MARY H. MELFI, CELESTE M. RILEY, RITA ROTHBERG re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CARBONE, JOHN)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SCOTT M. COLABELLA, CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, ANN GROSSI, JAMES N. HOGAN, JOHN S HOGAN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, HOLLY MACKEY, E. JUNIOR MALDONADO, MARY H. MELFI, STEVE PETER, NANCY J PINKIN, JOANNE RAJOPPI, CELESTE M. RILEY, JOSEPH RIPA, RITA ROTHBERG, JOANNE SCHWARTZ, PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order #41 MOTION to Intervene no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (eh, )
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Request for Summons to be Issued by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, SARAH SCHOENGOOD, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH as to SCOTT M. COLABELLA, DALE CROSS, CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON, JOSEPH J. GIRALO, ANN GROSSI, JAMES N. HOGAN, JOHN S HOGAN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, HOLLY MACKEY, E. JUNIOR MALDONADO, MARY H. MELFI, JEFF PARROTT, STEVE PETER, NANCY J PINKIN, JOANNE RAJOPPI, CELESTE M. RILEY, JOSEPH RIPA, RITA ROTHBERG, JOANNE SCHWARTZ, PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO, TAHESHA WAY. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Intervene by Camden County Democratic Committee. (Attachments: #1 Brief On Behalf of Intervenor, Camden County Democratic Committee, #2 Certification Of Counsel in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit Certification of Counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW VINCENT WHITE on behalf of JOSEPH RIPA (WHITE, MATTHEW)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Transcript of Case Management Conference held via Telephone on 2/29/2024, before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Court Reporter/Transcriber John Kurz (856-576-7094). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 3/25/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2024. (jdg, )
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER D. ZINGARO on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (ZINGARO, CHRISTOPHER)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW R. TAVARES on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (TAVARES, MATTHEW)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. MINCHELLO on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (MINCHELLO, DAVID)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney PAUL RICHARD ADEZIO terminated. Attorney LOUIS N. RAINONE for PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO added.. (RAINONE, LOUIS)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER for Motion for Preliminary Injunction; in-person evidentiary hearing to be conducted on 03/18/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4W before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 02/29/2024. (Gonzalez, P)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/29/2024. (amv)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD LANE GOLDBERG on behalf of JOSEPH RIPA (GOLDBERG, HOWARD)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Case Management Conference held on 2/29/2024. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter, John Kurz (856-576-7094) (kas)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER ORDER Denying request at ecf #28 to join conference call on 2/29/2024. Motion to Intervene shall be filed by 3/4/2024 as proposed by CCDC . Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/29/2024. (kas) Modified on 2/29/2024.
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by KIRSTIN BOHN on behalf of ANN GROSSI (BOHN, KIRSTIN)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by GORDON JEFFREY GOLUM on behalf of STEVE PETER (GOLUM, GORDON)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Letter from Brian M. Nelson, Esq. on behalf of Christine Giordano Hanlon. (NELSON, BRIAN)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by RAJIV D. PARIKH on behalf of DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF (PARIKH, RAJIV)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM S. MALAMUT on behalf of JOANNE SCHWARTZ (MALAMUT, ADAM)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL RICHARD ADEZIO on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (ADEZIO, PAUL)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD WILLE, II on behalf of STEVE PETER (WILLE, RICHARD)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER stating that the Court will conduct tomorrow's telephonic case management conference on the record. Copies of the transcript may be obtained by contacting the official court reporter Megan McKay-Soule at 609-815-2319. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/28/2024. (jal, )
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK ROBERT NATALE on behalf of JOANNE SCHWARTZ (NATALE, MARK)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER BOREK on behalf of CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, JOANNE RAJOPPI (BOREK, JENNIFER)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA on behalf of CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN, JOANNE RAJOPPI (GENOVA, ANGELO)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter from New Jersey Globe. (kas)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMES N. HOGAN, MARY H. MELFI, CELESTE M. RILEY, RITA ROTHBERG re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CARBONE, JOHN)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MARISSA DEANNA on behalf of CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON (DEANNA, MARISSA)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CHARLES SPIRO on behalf of CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON (SPIRO, JASON)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN M. NELSON on behalf of CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON (NELSON, BRIAN)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Flavio Komuves re service of 2/27 text order and other documents re #11 Exhibit (to Document), 9 Order,,, Set Hearings,, #7 Application/Petition by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Plaintiffs' Local Rule 11.2 Statement by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. FLORIO on behalf of E. JUNIOR MALDONADO (FLORIO, EDWARD)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER that the Court will conduct a telephonic case management conference on 02/29/2024 at 10:30 a.m. to address the briefing schedule and set a hearing date for the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 . Counsel for the Plaintiffs shall coordinate the call to our chambers line: 609-989-2105. Counsel for Plaintiffs are ordered to immediately serve a copy of this text order on opposing counsel and file proof thereof on the docket. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/27/2024. (kas)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Service re #6 Application/Petition, #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit (to Document), #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, SARAH SCHOENGOOD. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION/PETITION for Leave to file overlength brief [DE5-1] for by All Plaintiffs. (PUGACH, BRETT)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION/PETITION for Emergency Application for Entry of Order to Show Cause for by All Plaintiffs. (PUGACH, BRETT)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause)(PUGACH, BRETT)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by YAEL BROMBERG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BROMBERG, YAEL)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT M. PUGACH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PUGACH, BRETT)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15117856), filed by ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY, ANDY KIM, CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS, SARAH SCHOENGOOD, SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY, CAROLYN RUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIM et al v. HANLON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY KIM
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY KIM FOR NEW JERSEY
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH SCHOENGOOD
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH FOR NEW JERSEY
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN RUSH
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN RUSH FOR CONGRESS
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON
Represented By: BRIAN M. NELSON
Represented By: ERIC H. JASO
Represented By: JASON CHARLES SPIRO
Represented By: MARISSA DEANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT M. COLABELLA
Represented By: MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO
Represented By: LOUIS N. RAINONE
Represented By: PAUL RICHARD ADEZIO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. ZINGARO
Represented By: DAVID L. MINCHELLO
Represented By: MATTHEW R. TAVARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY H. MELFI
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE PETER
Represented By: GORDON JEFFREY GOLUM
Represented By: RICHARD WILLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY MACKEY
Represented By: JOSEPH J. BELL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY J PINKIN
Represented By: MICHAEL SCOTT WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH J. GIRALO
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN S HOGAN
Represented By: JAIME RICHARD PLACEK
Represented By: JASON STEWART NUNNERMACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE SCHWARTZ
Represented By: MARK ROBERT NATALE
Represented By: ADAM S. MALAMUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH RIPA
Represented By: HOWARD LANE GOLDBERG
Represented By: MATTHEW VINCENT WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA ROTHBERG
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELESTE M. RILEY
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J DURKIN
Represented By: ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES N. HOGAN
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. JUNIOR MALDONADO
Represented By: EDWARD J. FLORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN GROSSI
Represented By: KIRSTIN BOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Represented By: RAJIV D. PARIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE RAJOPPI
Represented By: ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Represented By: PETER JOSEPH KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Maia-Cusick
Represented By: ROBERT D. KOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Harshaw
Represented By: ROBERT D. KOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Castillo
Represented By: ROBERT D. KOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LAURA ALI
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JOSE ARANGO
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: New Jersey Republican Chairs Association
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Camden County Democratic Committee
Represented By: ALYSSA LOTT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GREGORY MELE
Represented By: ROBERT D. KOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: JEANNE LOCICERO
Represented By: LIZA FREEDMAN WEISBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School
Represented By: RONALD K. CHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: NIYATI SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AAPI New Jersey
Represented By: NIYATI SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice
Represented By: NIYATI SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW JERSEY POLICY PERSPECTIVE
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: MICAURI VARGAS
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey Alliance for Immigrant Justice
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: MICAURI VARGAS
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: MICAURI VARGAS
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Salvation and Social Justice
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: MICAURI VARGAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joe Cohn, Staci Berger, James Solomon, Valerie Vainieri Huttle and Ravi Bhalla
Represented By: ANGELO A. STIO, III
Represented By: ROBERT AUSTIN JENKIN, II
Represented By: SCOTT D. SALMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey Law Professors
Represented By: JON ROMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DALE CROSS
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JEFF PARROTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TAHESHA WAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?