COPELAND v. WILIMINGTON TRUST et al
Plaintiff: MAVEZ COPELAND and MARCIA COPELAND
Defendant: WILIMINGTON TRUST, PHH MORTAGE, HONORABLE THOMAS D. MECLOSUM, ANDREW KARAD, MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, M&T BANK, STERN & EISENBERG, MARTY ABO, CPA, SALIBA, CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, WEISS, ADAM, DAVID OF STRADLEY RONON. STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP, STRADLEY RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP., THOMAS D. MCCLOSKEY, ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ and CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY SALIBA
Case Number: 3:2024cv04084
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Georgette Castner
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ( Responses due by 5/17/2024.), MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Index, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Correspondence)(KARCICH, ANDREW)
May 14, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by MARCIA COPELAND. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kht)
May 2, 2024 Filing 16 Letter to Ms. Paolilo regarding State placed on Official Notice from MARCIA COPELAND. (kht)
May 1, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WILIMINGTON TRUST has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/21/2024. (jal, )
April 30, 2024 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (BADOLATO, MICHELLE)
April 30, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE H. BADOLATO on behalf of M&T BANK, PHH MORTAGE, STRADLEY RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP., WEISS, ADAM, DAVID OF STRADLEY RONON. STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP (BADOLATO, MICHELLE)
April 30, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE H. BADOLATO on behalf of WILIMINGTON TRUST (BADOLATO, MICHELLE)
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Andrew Karcich, Esq... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KARCICH, ANDREW)
April 29, 2024 Filing 11 Proposed Order Granting Extension to Answer by ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ re #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. (KARCICH, ANDREW)
April 29, 2024 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Andrew Karcich, Esq... (KARCICH, ANDREW)
April 29, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The #12 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/17/2024. (jdg)
April 24, 2024 Filing 9 Letter from MARCIA COPELAND re: Financial fraud reported to CFPB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(wh)
April 23, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The #8 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by THOMAS D. MCCLOSKEY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/20/2024. (jdg)
April 22, 2024 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney DANA LYNN PAOLILLO for THOMAS D. MCCLOSKEY,DANA LYNN PAOLILLO for STATE OF NEW JERSEY added. (Attachments: #1 Statement Cover Letter enclosing clerk's extension)(PAOLILLO, DANA)
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANA LYNN PAOLILLO on behalf of THOMAS D. MCCLOSKEY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Attachments: #1 Statement Cover Letter enclosing NOA)(PAOLILLO, DANA)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 Letter from Andrew J. Karcich, Esq.. (KARCICH, ANDREW)
April 15, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JOSEPH KARCICH on behalf of ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ (KARCICH, ANDREW)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARTY ABO, CPA, ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ, M&T BANK, THOMAS D. MCCLOSKEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, PHH MORTAGE, CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY SALIBA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STERN & EISENBERG, STRADLEY RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP., WEISS, ADAM, DAVID OF STRADLEY RONON. STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP, WILIMINGTON TRUST. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg)
March 22, 2024 COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 (jdg)
March 22, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 137671 (jdg)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (jal, )
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jal, )
March 22, 2024 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jal, )
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COPELAND v. WILIMINGTON TRUST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAVEZ COPELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA COPELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILIMINGTON TRUST
Represented By: MICHELLE H. BADOLATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTAGE
Represented By: MICHELLE H. BADOLATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONORABLE THOMAS D. MECLOSUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW KARAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T BANK
Represented By: MICHELLE H. BADOLATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERN & EISENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY ABO, CPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALIBA, CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: DANA LYNN PAOLILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEISS, ADAM, DAVID OF STRADLEY RONON. STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP
Represented By: MICHELLE H. BADOLATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRADLEY RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP.
Represented By: MICHELLE H. BADOLATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS D. MCCLOSKEY
Represented By: DANA LYNN PAOLILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW KARCICH, ESQ
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH KARCICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY SALIBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?