BANK OF AMERICA, N.A v. ARSENIS
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A
Defendant: CHRYSSOULA ARSENIS
Case Number: 3:2024cv04511
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 BRIEF in opposition to the notice of remand filed by CHRYSSOULA ARSENIS. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, )
April 22, 2024 Filing 6 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Somerset County Courthouse20 North Bridge StreetSomerville, NJ 08876-1262 State No: 1310-20. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jdb)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of Defendant's Notice of Removal. (ECF No. #1 ; see also Civ. No. 22-1595, ECF No. 1; Civ. No. 23-879, ECF No. 1.) As the Court noted in its opinion and order remanding Defendant's first improperly removed action to state court (Civ. No. 22-1595, ECF No. 8) and also in the Court's opinion and order remanding Defendant's second improperly removed action to state court (Civ. No. 23-879, ECF No. 8), there is no diversity of citizenship or federal cause of action plead in the complaint underlying this matter. (See ECF No. 1.) Therefore, for the same reasons stated previously, this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Accordingly, this case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Somerset County. Plaintiff need not file any further briefing responsive to future removals of this case unless the Court orders otherwise. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/22/2024. (jdb)
April 22, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb)
April 14, 2024 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Chryssoula Arsenis. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jdg)
April 8, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John J Sheerin, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 State action complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Order of Michael A Shipp USDJ dated 8/18/2022, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Order of Michael A Shipp USDJ dated 5/12/23, #5 Brief Brief in support, #6 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, #7 Certificate of Service certification of service, #8 Corporate Disclosure)(SHEERIN, JOHN)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (amv,n.m.)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHRYSSOULA ARSENIS from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, SOMERSET COUNTY, case number 001310-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number NWK49973), filed by CHRYSSOULA ARSENIS. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(amv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A v. ARSENIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A
Represented By: JOHN J. SHEERIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSSOULA ARSENIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?