CITY OF TRENTON BOARD OF EDUCATION v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF TRENTON BOARD OF EDUCATION
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., UMPQUA BANK, 707 PREMIER SPORTS LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, ABC ENTITIES 1-10 and JOHN DOES, 1-10
Case Number: 3:2024cv05647
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint until 7/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 7/18/2024. (jdg)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CITY OF TRENTON BOARD OF EDUCATION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (SODINI, GREGG)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Caroline E. Oks, Esq. to the Honorable Brendan Day, U.S.M.J. regarding extension of time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(OKS, CAROLINE)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). Motion set for 7/1/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by CITY OF TRENTON BOARD OF EDUCATION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (SODINI, GREGG)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Bank Of America's 30 day extension request to respond to the complaint; The deadline to respond is now 6/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/20/2024. (jal, )
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). Motion set for 6/17/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) by UMPQUA BANK. Responses due by 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph R. McCarthy, Esq., #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Brief in support of Umpqua Bank's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCARTHY, JOSEPH)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from Caroline E. Oks, Esq. to the Honorable J. Brendan Day, U.S.M.J. regarding extension of time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(OKS, CAROLINE)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The #9 Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by UMPQUA BANK on 4/26/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/16/2024. (kht)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MCCARTHY, JOSEPH)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. LEMKIN on behalf of UMPQUA BANK (LEMKIN, JOSEPH)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (OKS, CAROLINE)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL V. CARACAPPA on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (CARACAPPA, MICHAEL)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH RYAN MCCARTHY on behalf of UMPQUA BANK (MCCARTHY, JOSEPH)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/16/2024. (mlh)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (mlh)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (OKS, CAROLINE)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (OKS, CAROLINE)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey Mercer County, case number MER-L-415-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15318337), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Statement 10.1(a), #6 Certification 11.2, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Certificate of Service)(OKS, CAROLINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF TRENTON BOARD OF EDUCATION v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF TRENTON BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: GREGG S. SODINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: CAROLINE E OKS
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: MICHAEL V. CARACAPPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMPQUA BANK
Represented By: JOSEPH H. LEMKIN
Represented By: JOSEPH RYAN MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 707 PREMIER SPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?