THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC. v. RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.
Defendant: RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 3:2024cv05745
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: J Brendan Day
Referring Judge: Robert Kirsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated. (mlh)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 6/25/2024. (mlh)
June 21, 2024 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER ORDER granting adjournment of the oral argument set for 5/30/2024 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 5/29/2024. (jal, )
May 29, 2024 Filing 31 Letter from Mitchell Edwards. (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 27, 2024 Set Hearing: Oral Argument set for 5/30/2024 at 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Robert Kirsch. (km)
May 23, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC. re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraints (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Ustick, #2 Exhibit Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit Exhibit T)(DAVIS, BRENT)
May 16, 2024 Filing 29 Exhibit to #28 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Bill Connors by RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (MARX, IAN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 16, 2024 Filing 28 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraints (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Connors, #2 Connors Declaration Exhibit 1, #3 Connors Declaration Exhibit 2, #4 Connors Declaration Exhibit 3, #5 Connors Declaration Exhibit 4, #6 Connors Declaration Exhibit 5, #7 Connors Declaration Exhibit 6, #8 Connors Declaration Exhibit 7, #9 Connors Declaration Exhibit 8, #10 Connors Declaration Exhibit 9, #11 Declaration of Scott Mangold, #12 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 1, #13 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 2, #14 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 3, #15 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 4, #16 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 5, #17 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 6, #18 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 7, #19 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 8, #20 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 9, #21 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 10, #22 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 11, #23 Mangold Declaration Exhibit 12)(MARX, IAN)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT ORDER that Defendant shall file its opposition to the Motion on 5/16/2024. Plaintiff shall file its reply to Defendant's opposition on 5/23/2024. The Court will hold oral argument on the Motion in person on 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 5/16/2024. (jdg)
May 14, 2024 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 5/13/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 10, 2024 Filing 25 Proposed Order on Consent by RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon the May 9, 2024 Telephone Conference with the parties. Having conferred with counsel, the Court will hear argument on Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief on Thursday, May 30, 2024 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 4E at the Clarkson S. Fisher Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse in Trenton. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 05/09/2024. (pdm)
May 9, 2024 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Kirsch: Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2024. Order to follow. (Court Reporter, Carol Farrell (856-318-6100)) (pdm)
May 8, 2024 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KYLIE M. HUFF and CHRISTOPHER V. FENLON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg, )
May 7, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher V. Fenlon to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15346677.) (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 7, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kylie M. Huff to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15346510.) (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Parties are advised that a Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 11:15 a.m. on Thursday, May 9, 2024. To participate, parties are directed to dial 888-684-8852 and when prompted, enter access code 1317475. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 05/06/2024. (pdm)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KYLIE M. HUFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/6/2024. (amv)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CHRISTOPHER V. FENLON. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/6/2024. (amv)
May 3, 2024 Filing 17 Letter from Mitchell Edwards to Judge Robert Kirsch re #12 Letter. (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 3, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Fenlon, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kylie Huff. Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg, )
May 2, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kylie Huff by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Mitchell Edwards, #2 Certification Kylie Huff, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 2, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Fenlon by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Mitchell Edwards, #2 Certification Christopher Fenlon, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
May 2, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY GREENE on behalf of RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. (GREENE, JEFFREY)
May 2, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by IAN SCOTT MARX on behalf of RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. (MARX, IAN)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from Ian Marx re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraints. (MARX, IAN)
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON VAN NOSTRAND on behalf of RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN M. KLEIN on behalf of THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC. (KLEIN, JUSTIN)
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (DAVIS, BRENT)
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 Diversity Disclosure Statement by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (DAVIS, BRENT)
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL R. EDWARDS on behalf of THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC. (EDWARDS, MITCHELL)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Motion for Order to Show Cause,, by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(DAVIS, BRENT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraints by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Declaration of CHRISTOPHER V. FENLON, ESQ., #3 Declaration Declaration of CHRISTOPHER USTICK, #4 Exhibit Exhibit H - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit Exhibit J - REDACTED, #7 Exhibit Exhibit K - REDACTED, #8 Exhibit Exhibit L - REDACTED, #9 Exhibit Exhibit M - REDACTED, #10 Exhibit Exhibit N - REDACTED, #11 Exhibit Exhibit O - REDACTED, #12 Exhibit Exhibit P - REDACTED, #13 Exhibit Exhibit Q - REDACTED)(DAVIS, BRENT)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (DAVIS, BRENT)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, EXHIBIT G by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (DAVIS, BRENT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 FILING FEE RECEIPT, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Index Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F)(DAVIS, BRENT)
April 30, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jdg, )
April 30, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brent Davis on 4/30/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a STATEMENT. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT USING Corporate Disclosure Statement found under Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdg)
April 30, 2024 Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (jdg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC. v. RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BEVERAGE WORKS NY, INC.
Represented By: BRENT MERRILL DAVIS
Represented By: JUSTIN M. KLEIN
Represented By: MITCHELL R. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: AARON VAN NOSTRAND
Represented By: IAN SCOTT MARX
Represented By: JEFFREY GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?