v. ISA
Respondent: ULYSSES ISA
Case Number: 8:2019cv13701
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Copy of Order M-988-18 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey temporarily suspending respondent, ULYSSES ISA, from the practice of law, effective immediately, and until the further Order of the Court; and further ordering respondent continue to be restrained and enjoined from practicing law pursuant to the Orders of that Court, etc. (Ti)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Copy of Order D-68-18 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey imposing no additional discipline for respondent's unethical conduct; and further ordering respondent to remain suspended from the practice of law pending further Order of that Court, etc. (Ti)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/5/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (cds)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why respondent, ULYSSES ISA, should not be suspended from the practice of law for a period of three months, effective immediately, and until further Order of the Court. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/15/2019. (Ti)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Copy of Order D-190-17 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending respondent, ULYSSES ISA, from the practice of law for a period of three months, effective immediately, and until the further Order of the Court, etc. (Ti)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. ISA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ULYSSES ISA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?