Hatten-Gonzales v. Earnest
Plaintiff: Debra Hatten-Gonzales
Defendant: Brent Earnest
Miscellaneous: Lawrence M Parker
Case Number: 1:1988cv00385
Filed: March 31, 1988
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 985 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 984 Unopposed Motion for Order. (tah)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 981 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales adopting 973 Special Master's Report as clarified in this order. Amended to correct the date the parties will complete system access logistics activities to NOVEMBER 2, 2020. (tah)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales staying briefing until further order of the Court of 965 Defendant's Motion Seeking Termination of Consent Decree and Memorandum in Support, and of 966 Defendant's Expedited Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending a Decision on Motion to Terminate Consent Decree. (tah)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 957 ORDER EXTENDING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 953 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part 893 Defendant's Rule 60(b) Motion to Modify Second Revised Modified Settlement Agreement and Order Sections II, III and IV(F)(1); and denying in part and holding in abeyance in part 930 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Enforce (Doc. 926) and Plaintiffs' Amended Response to Defendants Motion [to Modify] (Doc. 927). (tah)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting deadline of 5:00 p.m. on April 10, 2020,for the parties to file their respective documents and affidavits, narrowing each set of documents and affidavits to 50 pages. (tah)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 1, 2020, MOTIONS HEARING by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 943 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 3/26/2020 at 03:15 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 3/26/2020 at 03:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 937 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 928 Plaintiff's Request for Hearing on Two Pending Motions. Hearing is set on 4/1/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in the 3rd Floor Pecos Courtroom, Albuquerque, NM. [Amended only to correct typos in paragraph 5(e) and paragraph 5(i).] (tah)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 928 Plaintiff's Request for Hearing on Two Pending Motions. Hearing is set on 4/1/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in the 3rd Floor Pecos Courtroom, Albuquerque, NM. (tah)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 914 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Rule 60(B)(5) Motion. Reply is due 1/16/2020. (tah)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 901 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 892 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Response due by 12/17/2019. (tah)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 899 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 12/18/2019. (tah)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 898 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 889 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. Attorneys Maria T. Griego and Adrianne R. Turner terminated. Attorneys Teague Gonzalez and Tim Davis added. (tah)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a status conference for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 881 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 878 Joint Motion to Approve Two Corrective Action Plans. (tah)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 876 AGREED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 875 Unopposed Motion to Approve Special Master's Budget and Extend Appointment. (tah)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting an in-person status conference for 5/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 867 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Added attorneys John Robert Emery and Constance Grace Tatham for Brent Earnest. Attorneys Christopher P Collins and George F Heidke, Jr. terminated (tah)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 865 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance. Attorneys Jessica M Hernandez and Paul J. Kennedy terminated. (tah)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 864 SECOND ORDER EXTENDING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Special Master's appointment is extended to 6/30/2019. (tah)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting an in-person status conference for 12/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 847 Joint Motion to Approve and Adopt Revised Modified Consent Decree. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (tah)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 838 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Natalie A Campbell terminated. (tah)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 836 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 814 Motion to Modify the Special Master's Report; and adopting to the extent provided in this Memorandum Opinion and Order 810 Special Master's Report. (tah)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 832 Joint Motion to Amend Doc. 500. (tah)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying without prejudice 781 Request for Sanctions. (tah)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 825 Motion to Strike. Doc. 22 is not stricken; supplements to Doc. 814 due from Plaintiffs on 3/9/2018 and from Defendant on 3/16/2018. (tah)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER REGARDING MARCH 1, 2018, HEARING by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER SETTING OBJECTIONS DEADLINE AND HEARING by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Hearing on the Special Master's Report and any objections to the Report set for 3/1/2018 at 9:00 AM in Albuquerque before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER EXTENDING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 806 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider Location of Meeting of the Parties. (tah)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales approving Special Master budget. (tah)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting In-Person Meetings on Present Scope of Consent Decree for 12/19/2017 & 12/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - 380 Animas Courtroom (South Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER REQUIRING MEETINGS ON PRESENT SCOPE OF CONSENT DECREE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 801 SECOND AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting status conference for 12/7/2017 at 01:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Correcting date from January to December only. (tah)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 759 Motion to Appoint the Honorable Alan C. Torgerson as Mediator. (tah)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a status conference for 6/29/2017 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatten-Gonzales v. Earnest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hatten-Gonzales
Represented By: Gail J. Evans
Represented By: Sovereign Hager
Represented By: Adrianne R. Turner
Represented By: Daniel Yohalem
Represented By: Jane Yohalem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Earnest
Represented By: Natalie A Bruce
Represented By: Christopher P Collins
Represented By: George F Heidke, Jr
Represented By: Paul J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Lawrence M Parker
Represented By: Lawrence M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?