Aguirre v. Correction Corporation of America et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Aguirre
Defendant: Correction Corporation of America, CorVel Corporation, Transcor America, Chad Miller, FNU Issacs and FNU Fuentes
Case Number: 1:2017cv01267
Filed: December 29, 2017
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Referring Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: William P. Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/14/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at (505) 3 48-2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 11/28/2018 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Conference Rooms 1 (203) and 2 (205), before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 25, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Lifting Stay of Discovery and Setting Scheduling Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/4/2018. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 10/11/2018 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at (505) 348-2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
September 18, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING IN PART 2 Correction Corporation of America and Transcor America's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count I is dismissed with prejudice, as it relates to CoreCivic and Transcor; and Count II is dismissed without prejudice as it relates to all Defendants; and GRANTING 19 Defendant Corvel Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AS FURTHER DESCRIBED HEREIN. (mag)
September 17, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 21, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion for Protective Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 19, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 8/23/2018 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
May 8, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/19/2018 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
February 22, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/8/2018 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
January 9, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 2/15/2018. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/22/2018 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [P arties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguirre v. Correction Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Aguirre
Represented By: Rozan Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Corporation of America
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CorVel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcor America
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Issacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?