Barrera v. McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Alvaro Barrera and Alejandra Barrera
Respondent: Dean King, Chad Miller, Director Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Floyd Sam Farmer and Matthew T. Albence
Case Number: 1:2019cv00653
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kevin McAleenan. (Walters, Tiffany)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Walters on behalf of All Defendants (Walters, Tiffany)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Delivery Confirmation)(Linares Garcia, Tania)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (jg)
July 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, William P Barr, Floyd Sam Farmer, Dean King, Kevin McAleenan, Chad Miller. (jg)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND RESPONSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Petitioner must serve Respondents no later than August 28, 2019. Respondents must respond within 20 days of service. Petitioner may, if desired, reply within 14 days of the filing of the response. (am)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Defects by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Petitioner must cure defects no later than August 21, 2019. (am)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Writ of Habeas Corpus Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ALB044249 (ar)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2019 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Text for Order to Show Cause) (Linares Garcia, Tania)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 , filed by Alvaro Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Petitioner's Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Medical Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Order Granting Stay of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Request for Release, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Denial of Request for Release, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Maniar v. Pine Prairie)(Linares Garcia, Tania)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alvaro Barrera
Represented By: Tania P Linares Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alejandra Barrera
Represented By: Tania P Linares Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean King
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Miller
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Floyd Sam Farmer
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?