Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc. et al v. New Mexico Department of Game and Fish et al
Plaintiff: River Bend Ranch LLC, Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc. and Chama III, LLC
Defendant: Jimmy Bates, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, Sharon Salazar Hickey, Michael Sloane, New Mexico Game Commission, Jeremy Vesbach, Tirzio Lopez, David Soules, Gail Cramer and Roberta Salazar-Henry
Case Number: 1:2020cv00427
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The portion of Defendants New Mexico Department of Game and Fish and Director Michael Sloane's Motion to Stay (Doc. 9) seeking a stay of discovery pending resolution of Defendant Sloane's motion to dismiss based on qualified immunity is granted. Discovery in this matter is stayed pending resolution of Defendant Sloane's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Docs. 7, 8) insofar as that motion is based on his assertion of the defense of qualified immunity. (kmt)
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish re #9 MOTION to Stay filed by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish (Goldberg, Joseph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish (Goldberg, Joseph)
June 23, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay filed by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AG Opinion, #2 Exhibit AG Opinion Letter to Varela, #3 Exhibit Sloane Letter to AG, #4 Exhibit Grubesic Memorandum) (Goldberg, Joseph)
June 23, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss #7 by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph) Modified text and linkage on 6/23/2020 (bap).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (cm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph) Modified docket text on 6/23/2020 (aek).
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph)
June 8, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chama III, LLC, Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc., River Bend Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Harrison, Jeremy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings, #9 MOTION to Stay filed by Chama III, LLC, Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc., River Bend Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Harrison, Jeremy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Chama III, LLC, Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc., River Bend Ranch LLC re #17 Order, #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings, #9 MOTION to Stay , #7 MOTION to Dismiss of Extension to File Reply Brief (Harrison, Jeremy)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiffs shall file a Local Rule 7.4(a) notice no later than 06/05/2020 regarding the pending motions #6 , #7 & #9 . Absent such a notice, the Court will assume there are no agreed to extensions and the motions are ripe for consideration. (cm)
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 15 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Sharon Salazar Hickey, Jimmy Bates, Roberta Salazar-Henry, David Soules, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, New Mexico Game Commission, Gail Cramer, Jeremy Vesbach, Tirzio Lopez, Michael Sloane, 14 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc., Chama III, LLC, River Bend Ranch LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jimmy Bates, Gail Cramer, Tirzio Lopez, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, New Mexico Game Commission, Sharon Salazar Hickey, Roberta Salazar-Henry, Michael Sloane, David Soules, Jeremy Vesbach voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ward, Vincent)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Chama III, LLC, Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc., River Bend Ranch LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Harrison, Jeremy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Court will consider the portion of Defendants New Mexico Department of Game and Fish and Sloane's Motion to Stay (Doc. 9) requesting a stay of discovery pending the Court's determination of whether these Defendants are entitled to qualified immunity once briefing on the Motion to Stay is complete. (kmt)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish Filing of Record Before the First Judicial District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Ward, Vincent)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay re #9 MOTION to Stay Supporting Memorandum by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Supporting Memorandum by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by New Mexico Game Commission. (Maestas, Tania)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 5, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7109082 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, Michael Sloane (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ward, Vincent)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish (Ward, Vincent)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Ish on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ish, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 5, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Sloane, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish from 1st Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-00939. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Michael Sloane, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ward, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc. et al v. New Mexico Department of Game and Fish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Game and Fish
Represented By: Vincent J Ward
Represented By: Michael L. Goldberg
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Salazar Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sloane
Represented By: Vincent J Ward
Represented By: Michael L. Goldberg
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Game Commission
Represented By: Matthew R. Baca
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Vesbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tirzio Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Soules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Salazar-Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Bend Ranch LLC
Represented By: Marco Estevan Gonzales
Represented By: Jeremy K. Harrison
Represented By: Mark L. Ish
Represented By: William D. Winter
Represented By: Gregory Smithkier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rancho del Oso Pardo, Inc.
Represented By: Marco Estevan Gonzales
Represented By: Jeremy K. Harrison
Represented By: Mark L. Ish
Represented By: William D. Winter
Represented By: Gregory Smithkier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chama III, LLC
Represented By: Marco Estevan Gonzales
Represented By: Jeremy K. Harrison
Represented By: Mark L. Ish
Represented By: William D. Winter
Represented By: Gregory Smithkier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?