Vigil v. Walgreens
Plaintiff: Georgia Vigil
Defendant: Walgreens, Walgreens Boots Aliance and Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00883
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 **FILED IN ERROR**MOTION for Issuance of Summons to Torrent Pharma, Inc. by Georgia Vigil. (Lawless, Stephen) Modified to add error text, they are to email summons on 10/29/2020 (jjs).
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. adding Torrent Pharma, Inc.., filed by Georgia Vigil. (Lawless, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walgreens Defendant Walgreen Co.s 1st Set of ROGs, RFPs and RFAs to Georgia Vigil (Walker, Alex)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Status Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 02:45 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Motions due by 8/30/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2021. (cda)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Georgia Vigil for Initial Disclosures (Lawless, Stephen)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walgreens Walgreen Co.'s Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's 1st Set of ROGs and RFPs (Walker, Alex)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walgreens Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Walker, Alex)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Walgreens (Walker, Alex)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 10/7/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/23/2020. (ccp)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Incorporated, Walgreen Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-03745. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Incorporated, Walgreen Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Alex)
August 31, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
August 31, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7284638 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. Walgreens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens
Represented By: Haley B. Adams
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Aliance
Represented By: Haley B. Adams
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Vigil
Represented By: Stephen F. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?