Jacobs et al v. The Journal Publishing Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobs and Ruby Handler Jacobs
Defendant: The Journal Publishing Company doing business as The Albuquerque Journal, William P. Lang, Nicole Perez, James Thompson, Elise Kaplan, Karen Moses and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv00690
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10 and 11 of Plaintiffs' Complaint, to Dismiss Claims for Statutory Damages, Attorney Fees and Costs Made Under Copyright Act, and to Dismiss Certain Claims Against Individuals by Elise Kaplan, William P. Lang, Karen Moses, Nicole Perez, The Journal Publishing Company, James Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Williams, Gregory)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Elise Kaplan, William P. Lang, Karen Moses, Nicole Perez, The Journal Publishing Company, James Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Gregory)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Defendants' RESPONSE re #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs, #20 Objections filed by Elise Kaplan, William P. Lang, Karen Moses, Nicole Perez, The Journal Publishing Company, James Thompson. (Williams, Gregory)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 09/20/2021. (cm)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Elise Kaplan, William P. Lang, Karen Moses, Nicole Perez, The Journal Publishing Company, James Thompson. (Williams, Gregory)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P Williams on behalf of James Thompson (Williams, Gregory)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P Williams on behalf of Elise Kaplan, William P. Lang, Karen Moses, Nicole Perez, The Journal Publishing Company (Williams, Gregory)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Journal Publishing Co. d/b/a Albuquerque Journal, William P. Lang, Nicole Perez, Elise Kaplan and Karen Moses shall 1) answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and 2) respond to Plaintiffs Objection to Findings and Recommended Disposition by September 13, 2021. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Elise Kaplan, William P. Lang, Karen Moses, Nicole Perez, The Journal Publishing Company. (Williams, Gregory)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OBJECTIONS re #8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs (bap)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #14 and #15 Motions for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se parties Michael Jacobs and Ruby Handler Jacobs have permission to file electronically with the Court's CM/ECF system. (kfo) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs. The Journal Publishing Company served William Lang on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (bap)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs. Karen Moses served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (bap)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs. William P. Lang served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (bap)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION (Application) for Permission for Electronic Filing by Michael Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bap)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION (Application) for Permission for Electronic Filing by Ruby Handler Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bap)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO TEMPORARILY SEAL by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION in Support re #1 Complaint by Ruby Handler Jacobs (bap)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Documents (Exhibits) re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bap)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION in Support re #1 Complaint by Michael Jacobs (bap)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs (bap)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2021. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (kfo)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Report re: copyright (jg)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough by District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to The Journal Publishing Company. (jg)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB050428 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INFORMATION SHEET FOR TRO by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Jacobs (jg)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jg)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Jacobs, Ruby Handler Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. The Journal Publishing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Handler Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Journal Publishing Company doing business as The Albuquerque Journal
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Represented By: Gregory P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Lang
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Represented By: Gregory P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Perez
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Represented By: Gregory P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thompson
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Represented By: Gregory P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Kaplan
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Represented By: Gregory P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Moses
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Represented By: Gregory P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?