Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC v. S&J Auto1 LCC et al
Plaintiff: Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC
Defendant: S&J Auto1 LLC, S&J Auto2 LLC, S&J Holdings Inc., Jeffrey Schultz and Stephanie Schultz
Case Number: 1:2021cv00739
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to S&J Auto1 LLC, S&J Auto2 LLC, S&J Holdings Inc., Jeffrey Schultz, Stephanie Schultz. (arp)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants of Non-Military Service by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Thompson, Rufus)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. (Thompson, Rufus) Modified on 9/20/2021 (arp).
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. S&J Auto2 LLC served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Thompson, Rufus)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. Stephanie Schultz served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Thompson, Rufus)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. Jeffrey Schultz served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Thompson, Rufus)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. S&J Holdings Inc. served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Thompson, Rufus)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. S&J Auto1 LLC served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Thompson, Rufus)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC identifying Corporate Parent Driven Brands, Inc., Corporate Parent Driven Brands Holding Inc for Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC. (Thompson, Rufus)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC re #1 Complaint, Second Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Thompson, Rufus)
August 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC re #1 Complaint, Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Thompson, Rufus)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S&J AUTO1 LCC, S&J AUTO2 LLC, S&J HOLDINGS, INC., JEFFREY SCHULTZ, STEPHANIE SCHULTZ ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV LLC, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MAACO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Thompson, Rufus)
August 6, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7825268 re #1 Complaint, filed by SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MAACO, MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thompson, Rufus)
August 6, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC v. S&J Auto1 LCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&J Auto1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&J Auto2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&J Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?