Marker v. New Mexico House of Representatives et al
Petitioner: Larry Marker
Respondent: New Mexico House of Representatives, Eliseo Alcon, Anthony Allison, Janelle Anyanonu, Gail Armstrong, Brian Baca, John Block, Cynthia Borrego, Cathrynn Brown, Micaela Cadena, Ambrose Castellano, Kathleen Cates, Christine Chandler, Gail Chasey, Jack Chatfiled, Eleanor Chavez, Art De La Cruz, Meredith Dixon, Mark Duncan, Candy Ezzell, Joanne Ferrary, Natalie Figueroa, Doreen Gallegos, Harry Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Joy Garratt, Yanira Gurrola, Jason Harper, Joshua Hernandez, Pamelya Herndon, Susan Herrera, Dayan Hochman-Vigil, Tara Jaramillo, D Wonda Johnson, Jenifer Jones, T Ryan Lane, Raymundo Lara, Derrick Lente, Charlotte Little, Stefani Lord, Tara Lujan, Patricia Lundstrom, Willie Madrid, Alan Martinez, Javier Martinez, Jimmy Mason, Marian Matthews, Matthew McQueen, Tanya Mirabal Moya, Rod Montoya, Kristina Ortez, Cristina Parajon, Randall Pettigrew, Andrea Reeb, William Rehm, Andrea Romero, G Andres Romero, Patricia Roybal Caballero, Angelica Rubio, Joseph Sanchez, Debra Sarinana, Larry Scott, Linda Serrato, Nathan Small, Reena Szczepanski, Luis Terrazas, Elizabeth Thomson, James Townsend, Harlan Vincent and Martin Zamora
Case Number: 1:2024cv00118
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Filing 69 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #66 by Larry Marker (fs)
April 2, 2024 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Raymundo Lara served on 3/29/2024, answer due 4/19/2024. (fs)
April 2, 2024 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Jason Harper served on 3/29/2024, answer due 4/19/2024. (fs)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
March 18, 2024 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Janelle Anyanonu served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Nathan Small served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. D Wonda Johnson served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Andrea Romero served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Susan Herrera served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Yanira Gurrola served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 59 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Janelle Anyanonu served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs) Modified on 3/20/2024 - FIE, incorrect name of person served (cmm).
March 18, 2024 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Cristina Parajon served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Natalie Figueroa served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Patricia Lundstrom served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Matthew McQueen served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Meredith Dixon served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Kathleen Cates served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (fs)
March 18, 2024 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Doreen Gallegos served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Linda Serrato served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Tara Lujan served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Miguel Garcia served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Eleanor Chavez served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Tara Jaramillo served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Marian Matthews served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Anthony Allison served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Debra Sarinana served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Martin Zamora served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Candy Ezzell served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Larry Scott served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Harlan Vincent served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Jack Chatfield served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp) Modified last name on 3/20/2024 (cmm).
March 18, 2024 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Stefani Lord served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. John Block served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Willie Madrid served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Ambrose Castellano served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Art De La Cruz served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Dayan Hochman-Vigil served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Kristina Ortez served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Harry Garcia served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Joseph Sanchez served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. G Andres Romero served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Jimmy Mason served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Charlotte Little served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Rod Montoya served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Luis Terrazas served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Derrick Lente served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Patricia Roybal Caballero served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Pamelya Herndon served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Micaela Cadena served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Joy Garratt served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Cathrynn Brown served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Joshua Hernandez served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. William Rehm served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Andrea Reeb served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Brian Baca served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Gail Armstrong served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Jenifer Jones served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Randall Pettigrew served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Alan Martinez served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Tanya Mirabal Moya served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Angelica Rubio served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Cynthia Borrego served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp)
March 18, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Marker. Mark Duncan served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (arp) Modified on 3/19/2024 (cmm).
February 27, 2024 United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia assigned. (eh)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED Emergency Petition for Writ of Quo Warrant and Emergency Request for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction against all defendants, filed by Larry Marker. (dr)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Larry Marker (dr)
February 9, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 1004150 (da)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
February 7, 2024 Summons Issued as to All Respondents. (gr)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (bc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 Emergency Petition for Writ of Quo Warrant and Emergency Request for Preliminary Injunction against All Respondents, filed by Larry Marker. (bc) Modified on 2/6/2024 (bc).
February 6, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marker v. New Mexico House of Representatives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New Mexico House of Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eliseo Alcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janelle Anyanonu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gail Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Borrego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cathrynn Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Micaela Cadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ambrose Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gail Chasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jack Chatfiled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eleanor Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Art De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Meredith Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Candy Ezzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joanne Ferrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Natalie Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doreen Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harry Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Miguel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joy Garratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yanira Gurrola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joshua Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pamelya Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dayan Hochman-Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tara Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D Wonda Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jenifer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T Ryan Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymundo Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derrick Lente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charlotte Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stefani Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tara Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Lundstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Willie Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Javier Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marian Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tanya Mirabal Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rod Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristina Ortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cristina Parajon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randall Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Rehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G Andres Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Roybal Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angelica Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debra Sarinana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Serrato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathan Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reena Szczepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luis Terrazas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elizabeth Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harlan Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?