Corona v. City of Clovis et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Ray Corona
Defendant: City of Clovis, Clovis Police Department, Travis Loomis and Brent Aguilar
Case Number: 2:2017cv00805
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Curry
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Vacating 115 Zoom Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2020, and to Submit Closing Documents by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Closing documents are due to the Court no later than 11/23/2020. (crc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Resetting Zoom Settlement Conference for 11/18/2020 at 9:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Zoom instructions are attached to the Order. The Court will send counsel and all participating parties a link to the Zoom conference via email a few days prior to the conference. (crc)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Setting Zoom Settlement Conference for 9/4/2020 at 9:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Zoom instructions are attached to the Order. The Court will send counsel and all participating parties a link to the Zoom conference via email a few days prior to the conference. (ag)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Vacating 110 Zoom Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The settlement conference will be reset at a later date. (ag)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Settlement Conference will now be conducted via Zoom. (ag)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 8/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/4/2020 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Counsel shall call Judge Garza's AT&T line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, for the pre-settlement telephonic status conference]. (ag)
May 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting Defendant Travis Loomis' Motion for Summary Judgment and for Qualified Immunity on Plaintiff's Excessive Force Claims and Memorandum in Support Thereof 88 . (baw)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 6/23/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Continue Partial Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Qualified Immunity Appeal by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ead)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 8/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/11/2019 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Order is amended only as to the time. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/11/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera denying without prejudice [55-1] Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Amend First Amended Complaint, with leave to file a revised Motion to Amend his First Amended Complaint no later than March 19, 2019. (baw)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Attorney Mark D. Standridge terminated as counsel for Defendants. (atc)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines and to Vacate Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The August 21, 2018, status conference, and August 28, 2018, settlement conference are hereby vacated. (atc)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Setting Expedited Briefing on 44 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Vacate Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's response due 8/7/18; Defendants' reply due 8/9/18. (atc)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/21/2018 at 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza.[Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2 693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 8/28/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo DENYING 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (kg)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Stipulated Confidentiality Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Jarmie & Associates (Cody R. Rogers) is substituted as attorney of record for Defendants City of Clovis, Aguilar, and Loomis. (atc)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/3/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made (atc)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 2/20/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference 12/5/17 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report due by 9/26/2017. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/3/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Th e parties shall call Judge Garzas Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Courts; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/7/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona v. City of Clovis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Ray Corona
Represented By: Daniel R. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clovis
Represented By: Cody R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis Police Department
Represented By: Cody R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Loomis
Represented By: Cody R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Aguilar
Represented By: Cody R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?