Ratcliff v. Walgreens
Plaintiff: Derek Ratcliff
Defendant: Walgreens
Case Number: 2:2021cv00948
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by Walgreens Notice of Subpoenas (Willis, Amelia)
November 18, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walgreens Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Willis, Amelia)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walgreens Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Willis, Amelia)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for April 14, 2022 at 09:00 AM. Telephonic Status Conference set for March 15, 2022 at 09:30 AM. Consult Order for associated deadlines. (atc)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by May 9, 2022. Dispositive Motions due by June 10, 2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by August 9, 2022. (atc)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2021. (atc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Derek Ratcliff Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Gilpin, Donald)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walgreens of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Willis, Amelia)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Walgreens (Willis, Amelia)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Walgreens re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Letter) (Willis, Amelia)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by November 2, 2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 9, 2021 at 09:00 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than October 27, 2021. (atc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Walgreens by Alfred Jonathan Jackson (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Jackson, Alfred)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 29, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7914873 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Willis, Amelia)
September 29, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7914901 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Walgreens (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jackson, Alfred)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Walgreens (Willis, Amelia)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co.. (Willis, Amelia)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walgreen Co.. (Willis, Amelia)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Co. from Sixth Judicial District Court, Grant County, case number D-608-CV-2021-00174. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a A (Complaint and Summons) and B (Notice of Filing Notice of Removal))(Willis, Amelia)
September 28, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff v. Walgreens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Ratcliff
Represented By: Christopher P. Machin
Represented By: Donald G Gilpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens
Represented By: Amelia M Willis
Represented By: Alfred Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?