Tafoya v. City of Clovis et al
Plaintiff: Tatiana Tafoya
Defendant: City of Clovis, Antonio Orozco, Roman Romero, Doug Ford, Jordan Lee Riddle and Louis T. Riddle
Case Number: 2:2022cv00492
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by City of Clovis re #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Clovis (Evans, Bryan)
August 26, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Clovis. (Evans, Bryan)
August 25, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 12, 13, 14, 15 and 16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 24, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Louis T. Riddle. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Tatiana Tafoya.(Soto Hall, Denise)
August 24, 2022 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Louis T. Riddle (Soto Hall, Denise)
August 24, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Suzanne Soto Hall on behalf of Louis T. Riddle (Soto Hall, Denise)
August 23, 2022 Filing 19 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 22, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Clovis for Offer of Judgment (Evans, Bryan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by City of Clovis Defendants filed by Tatiana Tafoya. (Carpenter, Frances)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. In light of the pending dispositive motion, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by August 22, 2022. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by City of Clovis. (Evans, Bryan)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Tafoya. Roman Romero served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Tafoya. Jordan Lee Riddle served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Tafoya. Doug Ford served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Tafoya. Louis T. Riddle served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Tafoya. City of Clovis served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatiana Tafoya. Antonio Orozco served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 7, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8352983 re #1 Complaint filed by Tatiana Tafoya (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Tatiana Tafoya (Carpenter, Frances)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Tatiana Tafoya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Frances)
July 6, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)
July 6, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tafoya v. City of Clovis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Tafoya
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clovis
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Represented By: Jacqueline L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Orozco
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Represented By: Jacqueline L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Romero
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Represented By: Jacqueline L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Ford
Represented By: Jacqueline L Miller
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Lee Riddle
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Represented By: Jacqueline L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis T. Riddle
Represented By: Denise Suzanne Soto Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?