McClendon, et al v. Albuquerque, City of, et al
Plaintiff: Peter Sumatkaku, Marc A Gillette, George Chavez, Eliseo Baca, Clint Barras, Francisco Melendez, Samual Herrod, Vincent Padilla, Carl Duckworth, Joseph W Anderson, Paul Johnson, Fred Mall, Hector Lopez, Ricky Rose, Herbert King, Sr, James Parks, Michael A Johnson, Johnny Vallejos, Joe Newberry, Darryl Craft, Albert Willy, William P Jimmy, Augustine Tapia, Richard A Smith, Robert Lovato, Roy Whatley, Marty Begay, Martin Valdivia, Tallie Thomas, Augustine Jackson, Donald Hall, Carl Sur, Steve Esquibel, Lonnie Whatley, James Saiz, Bryon Zamora, Allen M Sawyer, Patrick Benny Romero, Phillip Shumate, Nelson Romero, Steve Johnson, Bennie F Garcia, Louie Chavez, Brian Salazar, Richard Gallegos, Larry Stroud, James Burks, Brad Fischer, Amihon Baca, Jeff Dillow, Pete McQueen and Jimmy McClendon
Defendant: Albuquerque, City of, Martin Chavez, Bernalillo, County of, Michael Sisneros and Bernalillo County Board of Commissioners
Intervenor_plaintiff: EM, RL, WA, DJ, PS and NW
Movant: Dennis F. Barela
Miscellaneous: Alan C. Torgerson
Intervenor: AFSCME Local 2499
Case Number: 6:1995cv00024
Filed: January 10, 1995
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Santa Fe Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Presiding Judge: James A. Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying 1480 MOTION For Finding of Sustained Compliance and for Disengagement of Domain #3 and as further described herein. (bap)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 1435 Joint Motion for Enforcement of the Interim Order Regarding Access to the MDC filed by Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors. (KBM)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting and denying in part 1343 Defendant Bernalillo County Board of Commissioners' Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Depositions of Dr. Kenneth Ray and Ronald Shansky. (bap)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker approving Settlement Agreement re 1320 Order. (bap)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker denying 1247 Joint Motion for Order to Show Cause and for Further Remedial Relief Pursuant to Court Order (bap)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1265 Joint MOTION Interim Order Regarding Access to the MDC re 754 Order by District Judge James A. Parker. (vv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClendon, et al v. Albuquerque, City of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sumatkaku
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc A Gillette
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Chavez
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliseo Baca
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Barras
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Melendez
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samual Herrod
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Padilla
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Duckworth
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W Anderson
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Mall
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Lopez
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Rose
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert King, Sr
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Parks
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Vallejos
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Newberry
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Craft
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Willy
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Jimmy
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustine Tapia
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Smith
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lovato
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Whatley
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Begay
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Valdivia
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tallie Thomas
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustine Jackson
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hall
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Sur
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Esquibel
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Whatley
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Saiz
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon Zamora
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen M Sawyer
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Benny Romero
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Shumate
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Romero
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Johnson
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie F Garcia
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Kirtan K Khalsa
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Chavez
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Salazar
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gallegos
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Stroud
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burks
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Fischer
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amihon Baca
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Dillow
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete McQueen
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Zachary A Ives
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Peter Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albuquerque, City of
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Baker
Represented By: Kathryn Levy
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Chavez
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Baker
Represented By: Kathryn Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernalillo, County of
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Baker
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sisneros
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernalillo County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Baker
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: EM
Represented By: Peter Cubra
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Claire Dickson
Represented By: David Meilleur
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Represented By: Kelly K Waterfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: RL
Represented By: Peter Cubra
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Claire Dickson
Represented By: David Meilleur
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Represented By: Kelly K Waterfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: WA
Represented By: Peter Cubra
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Claire Dickson
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: David Meilleur
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Represented By: Kelly K Waterfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: DJ
Represented By: Peter Cubra
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Claire Dickson
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: David Meilleur
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Represented By: Kelly K Waterfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: PS
Represented By: Peter Cubra
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: Claire Dickson
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: David Meilleur
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Represented By: Kelly K Waterfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: NW
Represented By: Peter Cubra
Represented By: Philip B. Davis
Represented By: David Meilleur
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Represented By: Kelly K Waterfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dennis F. Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Alan C. Torgerson
Represented By: Alan C. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AFSCME Local 2499
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?