Morrison v. International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams, Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers and Janenne Gonzalez
Defendant: DCM Erectors, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Sorbara Construction Corp., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Skanska USA Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO, Schiavone Construction Co. LLC, Halmar Construction Corp., Turner Construction Company, Skanska Inc., Judlau Contracting, Inc., Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., Gotham Construction Company, LLC, El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., Bay Crane Service Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc. and Solera Construction Inc.
Interested Party: McKissack & McKissack
Case Number: 1:2012cv00301
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2016 Filing 176 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (Giblin, Vincent)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: Electronically endorsing the parties stipulation #176 of dismissal. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/20/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Administratively closing the case without prejudice to being re-opened by any party if the terms of the confidential settlement are not complied with. See minute entry dated 5/9/16. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/9/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michel ONeill, Esq. for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Settlement conference held on 5/9/2016. Counsel report that the case has settled and place it on the record. The individual plaintiffs indicated on the record that they are satisfied with the settlement. The Court will administratively close the case without prejudice to being re-opened if the terms of the confidential settlement agreement are not complied with. (Court Reporter: Linda Marino (718) 613-2484) (Innelli, Michael)
May 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq for defendant Local 14B, all present. Pre-trial conference held on 5/6/16. Pre-trial matters and the 5/9/16 jury selection and trial were discussed. The defendants new offer was not accepted by the plaintiffs and jury selection will begin at 10am on Monday, May 9, 2016. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #171 Motion in Limine Having considered the parties' submissions, the defendant's motions in limine are denied.. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/4/2016. (Horowitz, Daniel)
May 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq for defendant Local 14B, all present. Pre-trial conference held on 5/3/16. Representatives from both sides are present for this conference. Pre-trial matters, settlement, the 5/9/16 jury selection and trial and counsels letter applications #171 , #174 & #175 were all discussed. Settlement is not possible at this time. The Court will issue a written decision before trial as to the issue raised in the parties letters. By the end of the day counsel shall provide hard copies of their exhibits and exhibit lists to the Court so they can be discussed at the conference scheduled for May 6, 2016 @ 3:30PM. Counsel indicate that there are no objections to each others exhibits and consent to have one the Courts law clerks preside over jury selection scheduled for May 9, 2016 @ 10AM. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
May 2, 2016 Filing 175 Letter Responding to Giblin letter by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (O'Neill, Michael)
May 2, 2016 Filing 174 Letter by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (Giblin, Vincent)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A pre trial conference is scheduled for May 3, 2016 @ 11:30AM to discuss settlement, the defendant's letter application #174 dated 5/2/16 and any other pre-trial matters. Representatives from both sides shall be present at this conference so meaningfull settlement discissions can take place. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/2/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Should the parties agree that a settlement conference would further this case towards resolution, the Court will make itself available on May 2, 2016, at 5:00 PM. The parties should notify the Court by 12:00 P.M. on May 2, 2016, if they so agree. In the meantime, the Court is reviewing the pending in limine motions and is continuing to consider whether prophylactic measures need be taken regarding the plaintiffs late presentation of evidence as discussed at yesterdays conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/29/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
April 28, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq for defendant Local 14B, all present. Pre-trial conference held on 4/28/16. Two named plaintiffs are present at this conference. The May 9, 2016 jury selection and trial date are discussed further and counsel report that the case will not settle at this time, but counsel will continue to discuss settlement. The parties exhibit and witness lists were reviewed and discussed by the Court. The defendants pending in limine #171 motion was discussed further. A further conference is set for 5/6/16 @ 3:30pm to discuss pending pre-trial matters. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
April 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq for defendant Local 14B, all present. Pre-trial conference held on 4/22/16. Settlement was discussed with 3 named plaintiffs and in the insurance representative. The parties are still to far apart. The 5/9/16 jury trial will go forward as scheduled. The defendants pending in limine #171 motion was discussed. The parties experts and their reports as well as damages were discussed. The Courts forms for a witness and exhibit lists were given to counsel with instructions to fill them out and exchanged them with each other prior to the next pre-trial conference scheduled on 4/28/16 @ 3PM. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
April 21, 2016 Filing 173 RESPONSE to Motion re #171 Letter MOTION in Limine filed by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (Federici, Benjamin)
April 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq for defendant Local 14B, all present. Pre-trial conference held on 4/21/16. The status of this litigation, settlement and the 5/9/16 jury trial date were all discussed. Counsel report to the court that settlement does not seem possible at this time. The 3 named plaintiffs were present, but the insurance representative was on his way back to Washington, D.C.. Therefore the conference is continued on 4/22/16 @ 11:00am so the insurance representative can appear in person to discuss settlement. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
April 20, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Settlement Conference held on 4/20/2016. Michael ONeill, Esq., present with the plaintiffs and Vincent Giblin, Esq., for defendant Local 14B, all present. Discussion held. Case not settled. (Tape #not recorded.) (Vertus, Miriam)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Parties and/or corporate representative with full settlement authority must appear in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/18/2016. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
April 15, 2016 Filing 172 Letter to Judge Block by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (Giblin, Vincent)
April 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq for defendant Local 14B, all present. Pre-trial conference held on 4/15/16. The status of this litigation, settlement and the 5/9/16 jury trial date were all discussed. Counsel are trial ready and are encouraged to continue to discuss settlement. A further conference before J. Block is scheduled for April 21, 2016 @ 3:30pm to report as to their settlement discussions and a settlement conference is scheduled before MJ Reyes on April 20, 2016 @ 3pm.(Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
April 13, 2016 Filing 171 Letter MOTION in Limine by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #170 : The CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT is SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/8/2016. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
April 7, 2016 Filing 170 STIPULATION of Confidentiality Agreement by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (Federici, Benjamin)
February 26, 2016 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2016. Appearances: Michael G. O'Neill, Esq., for the Plaintiff. Vincent Michael Giblin, Esq., for the Defendant. Discussion held re #167 MOTION to Compel Discovery. The parties have reported that the documents have been produced; finding as moot re #167 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's expert reports are due on March 25, 2018; Defendant's expert reports are April 29, 2016. Plaintiff's expert must appear for a deposition no later than April 8, 2016. Plaintiff must pay for an expedited transcript only. (Tape#3:51:50-3:59:48) (Vertus, Miriam)
February 25, 2016 Filing 169 REPLY in Opposition re #167 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
February 24, 2016 Filing 168 REPLY in Opposition re #167 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #167 : Telephone Conference set for 2/26/2016 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call, then dial in Chambers at (718) 613-2120 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 2/24/2016.(Yasunaga, Adrienne)
February 19, 2016 Filing 167 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiffs letter application #166 dated 12/18/15 is GRANTED. Jury selection and trial is adjourned to May 9, 2016 @ 10AM and a pre-trial conference is scheduled for April 15, 2016 @ 11AM. The status conference scheduled for January 12, 2016 @ 4:30pm is canceled. There will be no further adjournments of this trial date barring exceptional circumstances. MJ Reyes will oversee discovery which shall be completed forthwith and if MJ Reyes reports that any party has delayed the completion of discovery sanctions will be imposed. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of this order. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/21/2015. (mji)
December 18, 2015 Filing 166 MOTION for Reconsideration re Status Conference,,, by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
December 11, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq. for the plaintiff and Vincent Giblin, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Status conference held on 12/11/2015. The status of this litigation and settlement were discussed along with the jury trial date of 1/19/16. Counsels joint application to adjourn the trial date was discussed and denied. A pre-trial conference is set for 1/12/16 @ 4:30PM. Counsel were given copies of the Courts forms for a witness and exhibit list. Counsel shall fill out and exchange their lists prior to the pre-trial conference and note any objections to either a witness or exhibit so their objections can be discussed at the pre-trial conference. Counsel shall also serve and ECF file letter briefs with regards to any anticipated in limine motions which will also be discussed at the pre-trial conference, before any formal in limine motions are served and ECF filed.(Court Reporter: Not Reported) (mji)
December 7, 2015 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.:granting in part and denying in part #161 Motion to Quash. Discovery Hearing held on 12/7/2015. Michael G. O'Neill for plaintiffs; Vincent Michael Giblin and James Michael Steinberg for International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO; Lori A. Jablczynski for McKissack & McKissack. Discussions held regarding motion to quash. Deposition of Aissatou Bey-Grecia to go forward by second week of January. Plaintiffs to narrow document request by providing search terms and identifying custodians by 12/11/15; McKissack & McKissack's opposition to revised request, if any, due 12/18/15. (Tape #12:02:24-12:32:17.) (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
December 4, 2015 Filing 165 RESPONSE in Opposition re #161 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Michael)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER: Discovery Hearing set for 12/7/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. All parties are welcome, but only plaintiffs and movant McKissack & McKissack are required to attend. Plaintiffs to respond to movant's motion to quash by 12/4/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 12/2/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
November 25, 2015 Filing 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKissack & McKissack re #161 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena, #162 Memorandum in Support, #163 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Jablczynski, Lori)
November 25, 2015 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #161 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena (DECARATION OF LORI JABLCZYNSKI, ESQ.) filed by McKissack & McKissack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G) (Jablczynski, Lori)
November 25, 2015 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM in Support re #161 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena filed by McKissack & McKissack. (Jablczynski, Lori)
November 25, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena by McKissack & McKissack. (Jablczynski, Lori)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Referring Third Party Movant Aissatou Bey-Grecia's motion #161 to quash plaintiff's deposition subpeona to MJ REYES to decide. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/25/2015. (mji)
October 28, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 7, 2015, before Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherry Bryant, Telephone number 718-613-2636. Email address: sbryant102@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 11/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2016. (Bryant, Sherry)
October 7, 2015 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.; granting in part and denying in part #154 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #156 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2015. Michael G. O'Neill for plaintiffs; Vincent Michael Giblin for International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO; Marc S. Wenger for Skanska USA Inc. and Skanska Inc. Discussions held. Witness James Mullervy sworn and testimony heard. Court SO ORDERS parties' stipulation to dismiss without prejudice gender discrimination claim and to remove Garfield Danvers as class representative. Other rulings on the record. (Court Reporter Sherry Bryant (718) 613-2636.)(Yasunaga, Adrienne)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference scheduled for November 20, 2015 @ 11AM is canceled due to a conflict with the Court's calendar. The pre-trial conference scheduled for December 11, 2015 @ 11AM will fo forward as scheduled. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other that the conference scheduled on November 20, 2015 is canceled. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/7/2015. (Innelli, Michael)
October 2, 2015 Filing 159 REPLY in Support re #154 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery, #156 MOTION to Compel Skanska to Comply with Court's Order filed by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
September 30, 2015 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #156 MOTION to Compel Skanska to Comply with Court's Order filed by Skanska USA Inc.. (Dobson, Kimberly)
September 30, 2015 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER re #154 and #156 : Defendant International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO and non-parties Skanska Civil Northeast and Skanska Koch must respond to plaintiffs' letter motions by 9/30/2015. The Court will hold oral argument and an evidentiary hearing in connection with these motions on October 7, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North. All persons who worked on or were otherwise responsible for the discovery productions that are the subject of plaintiffs' motions must attend this hearing. These individuals should be prepared to give sworn testimony regarding actions taken to comply with this Court's prior discovery orders. No exceptions to this in-person requirement will be permitted. The parties and non-parties are to confirm with one another that all necessary participants are aware of this Order and the October 7, 2015 hearing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/25/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
September 24, 2015 Filing 156 MOTION to Compel Skanska to Comply with Court's Order by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
September 23, 2015 Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #154 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
September 23, 2015 Filing 154 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery by Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #152 Motion to Compel: The parties' Consent Protective Order, which is attached to plaintiffs' letter motion dated September 16, 2015 #152 is SO ORDERED. In addition, defendant shall provide supplemental discovery responses by 9/21/2015, as indicated in its response dated September 17, 2015 #153 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/21/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
September 17, 2015 Filing 153 RESPONSE to Motion re #152 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
September 16, 2015 Filing 152 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Delroy Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Order of Confidentiality) (O'Neill, Michael)
September 11, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill for the plaintiffs and Vincent Giblin, Esq & James Steinberg, Esq. for defendants Local 14, all present. Status conference held on 9/11/2015. The status of this litigation and settlement were discussed. All discovery shall be completed by the next conference which is set for 11/20/15 @ 11AM. A further pre-trial conference is set for 12/11/15 @ 11am and jury selection and trial is set for 1/19/16 @ 10am.(Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
August 14, 2015 Filing 151 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Magistrate Judge Reyes, re: Status Report by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (Federici, Benjamin)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application #150 dated 8/13/15, with the consent of the defendants is GRANTED. The status conference scheduled for August 19, 2015 is adjourned to September 11, 2015 at 11:00 A.M. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/14/2015. (Innelli, Michael)
August 13, 2015 Filing 150 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (Federici, Benjamin)
August 7, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lewis Federici on behalf of Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (aty to be noticed) (Federici, Benjamin)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for August 19, 2015 @ 11AM before J. Block in Courtroom 10c, 10th Fl. to discuss the status of this litigation. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/6/2015. (Innelli, Michael)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report on discovery due 8/14/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/27/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
May 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.:Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2015. Michael G. O'Neill for plaintiff; Vincent Michael Giblin for defendant. Non-parties still producing documents from 3/25/15 hearing. Parties to agree to protocol for confidentiality of Union's documents by 6/3/15.Depositions to start in September. Written discovery to continue through August. Status Report on discovery due 8/14/15. Further proceedings will be scheduled after receipt of 8/14 Status Report. (Tape #3:18:28-3:32:07 (208N).) (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
May 15, 2015 Filing 148 Letter MOTION for Protective Order by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zackin, Richard)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #148 Motion for Protective Order. The Consent Protective Order is SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/15/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/27/2015 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call, then dial-in Chambers at (718) 613-2120 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/13/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
April 27, 2015 Filing 147 Joint MOTION for Protective Order to be so ordered by The Annuity, Pension, Welfare and Training Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Magistrate Judge Reyes) (Steinberg, James)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #147 Motion for Protective Order. The Stipulation and Order of Confidentiality #147 is SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/27/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
April 3, 2015 Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/25/15, before Judge Reyes. Court Reporter/Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2015. (Hong, Loan)
March 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Status Conference held on 3/25/2015. Appearances: Michael O'Neill, Esq., for Plaintiff. Vincent Giblin, Esq., James Steinberg, Esq.,and Aislinn S. McGuire, Esq.,for Defendant International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. Daniel J. Kaiser, Esq.,for Defendant Bay Crane Service, Inc. Richard S. Zackin, Esq.,for Defendant Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc. Jeremy M. Brown, Esq.,for Defendant Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc. Cameron A. Smith, Esq., for Defendant Dragados Construction USA, Inc. Marc S. Wenger, Esq., and Kimberly N. Dobson, Esq.,for Defendants Skanska USA Inc., and Skanska Inc. Discussions held re #144 Letter Regarding Conference, and #145 Letter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter dated March 21, 2015 re: Discovery Disputes to be Addressed at March 25, 2015 Court Conference. Rulings on the record. (Tape#5:34:08 - 6:46:19 ) Contact the E.S.R. Dept., at (718) 613-2590 to order the transcript. (Vertus, Miriam)
March 24, 2015 Filing 145 Letter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter dated March 21, 2015 re: Discovery Disputes to be Addressed at March 25, 2015 Court Conference; ECF Filed by Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (Kesselman, Dov)
March 21, 2015 Filing 144 Letter Regarding Conference by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (O'Neill, Michael)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #142 Motion to Adjourn Conference; Status Conference is adjourned to 3/25/2015 at 5:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/2/2015. (Vertus, Miriam)
February 27, 2015 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION to Adjourn Conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Michael)
February 27, 2015 Filing 142 Letter seeking adjournment of status conference by Turner Construction Company (McGuire, Aislinn) ADDED EVENT TYPE: Motion to Adjourn Conference on 2/27/2015 (Vertus, Miriam).
February 20, 2015 Filing 141 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on March 25, 2015 by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #141 Motion to Adjourn Conference.Status Conference is adjourned to 3/16/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. "Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to provide notice of this revised scheduling Order to such non-parties and advise them that their failure to attend the status conference will result in orders being issued compelling responses to subpoenas and assessing fees and costs against those non-parties". Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/20/2015. (Vertus, Miriam)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #139 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference previously set for 2/17/2015 is adjourned until 2/25/2015 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Parties and non-parties to confirm with each other that all necessary participants are aware of this scheduling change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 2/11/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
February 10, 2015 Filing 140 Letter from Dov Kesselman, Esq., advising The Court as to Tishman Entities' scheduling availability with respect to the upcoming Conference; eFiled by Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (Kesselman, Dov)
February 9, 2015 Filing 139 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams. (O'Neill, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 138 Letter Regarding Discovery by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (O'Neill, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/17/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/17/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The parties and non-parties who have objected to plaintiffs' subpoenas must attend this in-person status conference. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to provide notice of this Revised scheduling Order to such non-parties and advise them that their failure to attend the status conference will result in orders being issued compelling responses to subpoenas and assessing fees and costs against those non-parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 1/30/2015. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: By January 30, 2015 counsel shall ECF a joint status report letter as to all discovery and whether a conference with MJ Reyes is needed. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/21/2015. (Innelli, Michael)
August 6, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Change of address by Michael Bauman (Bauman, Michael)
July 30, 2014 Filing 136 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bay Crane Service Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Schiavone Construction Co. LLC, Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc., Sorbara Construction Corp., Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Turner Construction Company, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. (Zackin, Richard)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: Defendants Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Schiavone Construction Co. LLC, Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc., Sorbara Construction Corp., Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Turner Construction Company, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., Bay Crane Service Inc. and DCM Erectors, Inc. from the first amended complaint. See entry #136 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/30/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
July 28, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE of Change of Address and phone number by Jennifer Papas (Papas, Jennifer)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Local 14 does not dispute that plaintiffs have stated claims for intentional race discrimination under Title VII and 1981; as a result, those claims will proceed. Since the Court has rejected, for the reasons in this decision, Local 14s preemption argument, plaintiffs claims under the NYCHRL also survive. Local 14s motion #115 for judgment on the pleadings is denied. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/21/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant Lend Lease Construction LMB, Inc.'s letter application (entry #114) dated 5/31/14 requesting a pre-motion conference is now moot, based upon plaintiff's letter ( entry #132) dated 6/30/14 in which they dismiss certain claims. The Court confirmed defendant Lend Lease Construction LMB, Inc.'s decision to withdraw their pre-motion conference request after speaking to their counsel Richard Zackin, Esq. today by telephone. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/21/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's pending motions #111 ; #118 & #120 are denied as moot, based on plaintiff's letter #132 dated 6/30/14 dismissing certain claims which was the subject of the motions. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/21/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
July 8, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc S. Wenger (Wenger, Marc)
June 30, 2014 Filing 132 Letter Regarding Claims by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (O'Neill, Michael)
June 10, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: All counsel present. Oral argument held on 6/10/2014. Defendants motions #111 dismiss; #115 judgment on the pleadings; #118 dismiss and #120 dismiss were all discussed. The Court reserves decision. The plaintiff shall notify the Court by ECF letter as to whether he will ECF file and serve a amended complaint or dismiss the case as to certain defendants. The current complaint is deemed amended as to defendant Local 14 as to the plaintiffs being union members. (Court Reporter: Anthony Frisolone (718) 613-2487) (Innelli, Michael)
May 27, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Yuval David Bar-kokhba on behalf of DCM Erectors, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bar-kokhba, Yuval)
May 16, 2014 Filing 130 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference / Oral Argument (presently scheduled for May 30, 2014 at 11:00 A.M.), filed by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Kesselman, Dov)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant Dragodos USA Inc., El Sol Contracting, Construction Corp., Gotham Construction Co, Tishman Construction Corp., and Tishman Contruction Corp. of New York's letter application #130 dated 5/16/14, with the consent of all the other parties is GRANTED. The oral argument scheduled for May 30, 2014 is adjourned to June 10, 2014 at 3:00 P.M. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this oral argument. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/16/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is scheduling oral argument for May 30, 2014 at 11:00 A.M. as to all the pending #111 ; #115 ; #118 & #120 motions. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this oral argument. If this date presents any conflicts counsel shall obtain the consent of all the parties and then ECF file a letter application at least 48 hours in advance of the oral argument requesting an adjournment. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/7/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant Lend Lease Construction LMB's application for a pre-motion #114 conference is GRANTED and will be scheduled once the Court issues a decision on the pending #111 , #115 , #118 & #120 motions. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/14/2014. (Innelli, Michael)
December 5, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Marc S. Wenger (Wenger, Marc)
May 31, 2013 Filing 128 REPLY in Support re #120 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sorbara Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Jeremy)
May 31, 2013 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on 5/31/13, filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
May 31, 2013 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company re #125 Reply in Support, (Frank, Erica)
May 31, 2013 Filing 125 REPLY in Support re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company. (McGuire, Raymond)
May 31, 2013 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim . Declaration of Michael G. O'Neill. filed by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McGuire, Raymond)
May 31, 2013 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim . Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Group Three Movants Motion To Dismiss filed by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company. (McGuire, Raymond)
May 31, 2013 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #120 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. O'Neill, Esq. with Exhibit A) (Brown, Jeremy)
May 31, 2013 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company re #119 Memorandum in Support, #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Frank, Erica)
May 31, 2013 Filing 120 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sorbara Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jeremy M. Brown, Esq. with Exhibits A and B) (Brown, Jeremy)
May 31, 2013 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM in Support re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company. (McGuire, Raymond)
May 31, 2013 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Turner Construction Company. (McGuire, Raymond)
May 31, 2013 Filing 117 REPLY in Support of Defendant Local 14's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
May 31, 2013 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. O'Neill with Exhibit "A") (Giblin, Vincent)
May 31, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent M. Giblin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Memorandum in Support) (Giblin, Vincent)
May 31, 2013 Filing 114 MOTION for pre motion conference by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc.. (Zackin, Richard)
May 31, 2013 Filing 113 REPLY in Support re #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint joined by Defendants Bay Crane Service, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Judlau Contracting Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Schiavone Constr Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss joined by Defendants Bay Crane Service Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Judlau Contracting, Inc. Judlau Enterprises LLC, Schaivone Construction Co. LLC, Skanska USA Inc., Skanska Inc. and Yonkers Contracting Company filed by Dragados Construction USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kesselman, Dov)
May 31, 2013 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint joined by Defendants Bay Crane Service, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Judlau Contracting Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Schiavone Constr Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to the Group One Movants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Dragados Construction USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. O'Neill with Ex A) (Kesselman, Dov)
May 31, 2013 Filing 111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint joined by Defendants Bay Crane Service, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Judlau Contracting Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Schiavone Construction Co., LLC, Skanska USA Inc. and Skanska Inc. by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Of Dov Kesselman, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A and B) (Kesselman, Dov)
May 1, 2013 Filing 110 Letter Regarding Motion Opposition by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (O'Neill, Michael)
March 25, 2013 Filing 109 Letter Regarding Change in Briefing Schedule by Delroy Danvers, Garfield Danvers, Janenne Gonzalez, Averil C. Morrison, Delisa Williams (O'Neill, Michael)
March 1, 2013 Filing 108 Letter Regarding Service of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (Giblin, Vincent)
March 1, 2013 Filing 107 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Skanska Inc.. (Wenger, Marc)
March 1, 2013 Filing 106 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Skanska USA Inc.. (Wenger, Marc)
March 1, 2013 Filing 105 Letter to Counsel for Plaintiff, in accordance with Rule 2.D. of the Individual Motion Practices of Senior Judge Frederic Block, regarding Defendants Turner Construction Company, Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., and Monadnock Construction, Inc.'s MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Turner Construction Company (Frank, Erica)
March 1, 2013 Filing 104 Letter to Counsel for Plaintiff, in accordance with Rule 2.D. of the Individual Motion Practices of Senior Judge Frederic Block, regarding Defendant Sorbara Construction Corp.s MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sorbara Construction Corp. (Brown, Jeremy)
March 1, 2013 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sorbara Construction Corp. (Brown, Jeremy)
February 27, 2013 Filing 102 Letter to Counsel for Plaintiff, in accordance with Rule 2.D. of the Individual Motion Practices of Senior Judge Frederic Block, regarding Defendants: Dragados USA Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation, Bay Crane Service Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Schiavone Construction Co. LLC, Skanska USA Inc., Skanska Inc. and Yonkers Contracting Co., Inc.'s MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT, submitted by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (Kesselman, Dov)
January 31, 2013 Filing 101 STIPULATION of Dismissal by and between Plaintiffs and the undesigned parties by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan (Kesselman, Dov)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER: Electronically endorsing the stipulation #101 of the parties as to plaintiff's claim 8 in their amended compliant. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/31/2013. (Innelli, Michael)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: By April 15, 2013 counsel shall serve and ECF file their fully briefed motions with a hard courtesy copy to chambers. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/22/2013. (Innelli, Michael) Modified on 1/22/2013 (Innelli, Michael).
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Letter - Contractor Defendants' Joint Letter, Filed as Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/14/12, submitted by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (Kesselman, Dov)
January 14, 2013 Filing 99 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC (Brown, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: Defendants Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC, Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc. and Forest City Enterprises, Inc., only. See entry #99 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/14/2013. (Innelli, Michael)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter - Defendants' Joint Letter Filed as Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 11/30/12, submitted by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (Kesselman, Dov)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: The law firm of Proskauer Rose LLP, is hereby substituted as attorneys of record for defendant Sorbara Construction Corp., in place and stead of Rivkin Radler, LLP. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/13/2012. (Chee, Alvin)
December 14, 2012 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Michael ONeill, Esq. for the plaintiff and see attached list for all the defendants, all present. Pre-motion conference held on 12/14/2012. All the defendants anticipated motion to dismiss is discussed. The Union defendants will move with respect to a preemption issue. By January 18, 2013 counsel shall ECF a letter with a proposed plan for the defendants to submit consolidated briefs on similar motions & issues to limit the amount of briefs the Court will need to read.(Court Reporter: Not Reported ) (Innelli, Michael)
December 14, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Epstein on behalf of Monadnock Construction, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Epstein, Richard)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION and Order for Substitution of Counsel by Sorbara Construction Corp. (Brown, Jeremy)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER: The deadline to file the joint letter, see 10/22/12 Order, is further extended to 12/21/12. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 11/30/12. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for November 28, 2012 is being adjourned by the Court to December 14, 2012 @ 11AM due to an ongoing criminal jury trial. There will not be a formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/26/2012. (Innelli, Michael)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER: The deadline to file the joint letter, see 10/22/12 Order, is extended to 12/05/12. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 11/5/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SCHEDULING ORDER: The premotion conference scheduled for 10/31/12 at 11 a.m. is being postponed. Counsel will be advised of a new date once circumstances allow. In the meantime, they are directed to confer with each other to confirm the postponement. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/31/2012. (Cone, Charles)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for October 31, 2012 is being adjourned by the Court to November 28, 2005 @ 11AM, due to the storm. There will not be a formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/31/2012. (Innelli, Michael)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for November 2, 2012 is being advanced by the Court to October 31, 2012 @ 11AM. There will not be a formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/24/2012. (Innelli, Michael)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ELECTRONIC ORDER: All of the defendants letter applications are GRANTED. A pre motion conference is scheduled for November 2, 2012 @ 11AM as to all the applications. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference, and then ECF a letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/22/2012. (Innelli, Michael)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the pending pre-motion conference before Judge Block, the 10/23/12 Status Conference is canceled. By November 9, 2012, the parties are directed to file a joint letter advising whether a Status Conference before Judge Reyes would be helpful. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 10/22/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
October 12, 2012 Filing 91 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,,, by Bay Crane Service Inc.. (Kaiser, Daniel)
October 9, 2012 Filing 90 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC. (Brown, Jeremy)
October 4, 2012 Filing 89 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Sorbara Construction Corp.. (Novikoff, Kenneth)
October 2, 2012 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 17, 2012, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber: Transcriptions Plus II, Telephone number 718-987-4285. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2012. (Rocco, Christine)
October 2, 2012 Filing 87 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by DCM Erectors, Inc.. (Scher, William)
October 1, 2012 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schiavone Construction Co. LLC (Wallach, Tracy)
September 28, 2012 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO re #84 Answer to Amended Complaint served on Michael O'Neill, Esq. on September 28, 2012 via U.S. Mail (Steinberg, James)
September 28, 2012 Filing 84 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,,, by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
September 28, 2012 Filing 83 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
September 28, 2012 Filing 82 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Turner Construction Company. (Frank, Erica)
September 28, 2012 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Turner Construction Company identifying Corporate Parent Turner Corporation, Corporate Parent Hochtief, USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hochtief A.G. for Turner Construction Company. (Frank, Erica)
September 28, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint until October 4, 2012 by Sorbara Construction Corp.. (Novikoff, Kenneth)
September 28, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Novikoff on behalf of Sorbara Construction Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Novikoff, Kenneth)
September 28, 2012 Filing 78 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Skanska USA Inc.. (Wenger, Marc)
September 28, 2012 Filing 77 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Skanska Inc.. (Wenger, Marc)
September 28, 2012 Filing 76 Letter MOTION for premotion conference TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc.. (Wenger, Marc) Modified on 10/1/2012 (Chee, Alvin).
September 28, 2012 Filing 75 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Schiavone Construction Co. LLC. (Wallach, Tracy)
September 28, 2012 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monadnock Construction, Inc. (Bauman, Michael)
September 28, 2012 Filing 73 Letter seeking premotion conference by Monadnock Construction, Inc. (Bauman, Michael)
September 28, 2012 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , #64 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , filed, #70 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Michael)
September 28, 2012 Filing 71 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for 10/10/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., filed by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Kesselman, Dov)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #57 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answers are due on 10/12/12; granting #71 Motion to Adjourn 10/10/12 Conference; (Status Conference set for 10/23/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr.). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/28/2012. (Vertus, Miriam) Modified on 9/28/2012 (Vertus, Miriam).
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #80 First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Sorbara Construction Corp. answer is due 10/4/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/28/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 27, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION for pre motion conference by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc.. (Amalfe, Christine)
September 27, 2012 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc. (Zackin, Richard)
September 27, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Eden Frank on behalf of Turner Construction Company (aty to be noticed) (Frank, Erica)
September 27, 2012 Filing 67 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC (Sestack, Ryan)
September 26, 2012 Filing 66 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc.. (Kozak, Jonathan)
September 26, 2012 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. (Kozak, Jonathan)
September 25, 2012 Filing 64 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , filed by Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Kesselman, Dov)
September 25, 2012 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dragados USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ACS Actividades de Construccion y Servicios, S.A., Other Affiliate Dragados, S.A. for Dragados USA, Inc.. (Kesselman, Dov)
September 25, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Kozak on behalf of Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kozak, Jonathan)
September 25, 2012 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York identifying Corporate Parent AECOM Technology Corporation, Other Affiliate AECOM Technical Services, Inc, Other Affiliate The Earth Technology Corporation (USA) for Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Kesselman, Dov)
September 25, 2012 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation (Kesselman, Dov)
September 25, 2012 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gotham Construction Company, LLC (Kesselman, Dov)
September 25, 2012 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan (Kesselman, Dov)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: Defendant's Dragados Construction USA, Inc. and Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, see entry #58 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/25/2012. (Innelli, Michael)
September 24, 2012 Filing 57 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, by Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC. (Brown, Jeremy)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #56 First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Monadnock Construction, Inc. answer is due on 9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/14/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 13, 2012 Filing 56 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Monadnock Construction, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Set/reset hearing: Due to a change in the Court's calendar the 10/4/12 Status Conference is adjourned to 10/10/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/13/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 11, 2012 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service for FRCP 7.1 Disclosure served on All parties on 09/13/2012, filed by DCM Erectors, Inc.. (Scher, William)
September 11, 2012 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCM Erectors, Inc. (Scher, William)
September 11, 2012 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer served on All Parties on 09/13/2012, filed by DCM Erectors, Inc.. (Scher, William)
September 11, 2012 Filing 52 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,,, by DCM Erectors, Inc.. (Scher, William)
September 11, 2012 Reminder to Counsel:re #51 .Please comply with Judge Ramon E, Reyes, Jr's Individual Rules of Practice. "All letters to Magistrate Judge Reyes requesting Court intervention, including those sent pursuant to Local Civil Rules 37.1 and 37.3, or requesting an adjournment or extension of discovery deadlines, must be electronically filed under Motions and not "Letter" under "Other" Documents. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 6, 2012 Filing 51 STIPULATION extending time to answer by Monadnock Construction, Inc. (Bauman, Michael)
September 6, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bauman on behalf of Monadnock Construction, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bauman, Michael)
September 4, 2012 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, by Turner Construction Company. (McGuire, Aislinn)
September 4, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Aislinn Sydney McGuire on behalf of Turner Construction Company (aty to be noticed) (McGuire, Aislinn)
September 4, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond G. McGuire on behalf of Turner Construction Company (aty to be noticed) (McGuire, Raymond)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Turner Construction Company answer due 9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/4/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc. answer due 9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/4/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
September 1, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, by Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc.. (Amalfe, Christine)
August 30, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, by Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC. (Brown, Jeremy)
August 30, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence R. Sandak on behalf of Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sandak, Lawrence)
August 30, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M. Brown on behalf of Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Jeremy)
August 30, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Zackin on behalf of Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Zackin, Richard)
August 30, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Amalfe on behalf of Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Amalfe, Christine)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDER TO ANSWER Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc. answer due 9/28/12; Forest City Enterprises, Inc. answer due 9/28/12; Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC answer due 9/28/12. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/30/12. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
August 29, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, Stipulation to answer, move or respond to First Amended Complaint by Gotham Construction Company, LLC. (Kesselman, Dov)
August 29, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Dov Kesselman on behalf of Gotham Construction Company, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kesselman, Dov)
August 29, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Alexander Smith on behalf of Gotham Construction Company, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Cameron)
August 29, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Ross on behalf of Gotham Construction Company, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ross, David)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gotham Construction Company, LLC answer due 9/28/12. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/29/12. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
August 28, 2012 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, Extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond by Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York. (Kesselman, Dov)
August 28, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Dov Kesselman on behalf of Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (aty to be noticed) (Kesselman, Dov)
August 28, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Alexander Smith on behalf of Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Cameron)
August 28, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Ross on behalf of Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York (aty to be noticed) (Ross, David)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, and Tishman Construction, Corporation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended up to and including September 28, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/28/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Stipulation & #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Judlau Contracting, Inc. and Judlau Enterprises, LLC answers are due on9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/21/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 20, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, by Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC. (Vollbrecht, Michael)
August 20, 2012 Filing 31 STIPULATION re #14 Amended Complaint,,, Extending Time to Answer the Amended Complaint by Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC (Vollbrecht, Michael)
August 20, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Vollbrecht on behalf of Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Vollbrecht, Michael)
August 20, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James Sestack on behalf of Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sestack, Ryan)
August 20, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes Colwin on behalf of Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Colwin, Mercedes)
August 17, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Ross on behalf of Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Ross, David)
August 17, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Alexander Smith on behalf of Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Cameron)
August 17, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Dov Kesselman on behalf of Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Kesselman, Dov)
August 17, 2012 Reminder to Counsel: re #23 & #24 . Please comply with Judge Ramon E, Reyes, Jr's Individual Rules of Practice. "I. A. 4. All letters to Magistrate Judge Reyes requesting Court intervention, including those sent pursuant to Local Civil Rules 37.1 and 37.3, or requesting an adjournment or extension of discovery deadlines, must be electronically filed under Motions and not "Letter" under "Other " Documents. (Vertus, Miriam) Modified on 8/17/2012 (Vertus, Miriam).
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting re #23 Stipulation, filed by Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, and #24 Stipulation filed by Schiavone Construction Co. LLC. All Defendants answers are due on 9/28/12. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/17/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 15, 2012 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Defendant Schiavone Construction Co. LLC's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Schiavone Construction Co. LLC (Wallach, Tracy)
August 15, 2012 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #14 Amended Complaint,,, and [proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond, filed by Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation (Kesselman, Dov)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Skanska Inc., and Skanska USA Inc. answers are due on 9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/14/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 10, 2012 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Stipulation filed by Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc.. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 10, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Natalie Dobson on behalf of Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Dobson, Kimberly)
August 10, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc S. Wenger on behalf of Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wenger, Marc)
August 10, 2012 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #14 Amended Complaint,,, extending time to answer or move by Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc. (Wenger, Marc)
August 7, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tracy on behalf of Schiavone Construction Co. LLC (aty to be noticed) (Tracy, Matthew)
August 7, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Morgan Wallach on behalf of Schiavone Construction Co. LLC (aty to be noticed) (Wallach, Tracy)
August 2, 2012 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #14 Amended Complaint,,, To Extend time to answer, move or otherwise respond by Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. (Papas, Jennifer)
August 2, 2012 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Stipulation filed by Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc.. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Defendant Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. answer is due 9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/2/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO; ORDER TO ANSWER International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO answer due 9/28/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 7/31/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
July 25, 2012 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to be So Ordered) (Steinberg, James)
July 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Status Conference held on 7/17/2012. Michael O'Neil, Esq for Plaintiffs. Vincent Giblin,Esq and Joseph Green,Esq for Defendants. Discussions held. Status Conference set for 10/4/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Proposed Case Management Plan due by 9/28/2012., (Tape #11:20:38 - 11:28:47.) (Vertus, Miriam)
July 17, 2012 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 19, 2012, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber: Transcriptions Plus II, Telephone number 718-987-4285. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2012. (Rocco, Christine)
July 6, 2012 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bay Crane Service Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Dragados Construction USA, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Halmar Construction Corp., Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Schiavone Construction Co. LLC, Skanska USA Inc., Skanska Inc., Solera Construction Inc., Sorbara Construction Corp., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation, Turner Construction Company, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., filed by Averil C. Morrison. (O'Neill, Michael)
July 6, 2012 Amended Summons Issued as to Bay Crane Service Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Dragados USA, Inc., El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation, Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc., Forest City Enterprises, Inc., Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC, Gotham Construction Company, LLC, Halmar Construction Corp., Judlau Contracting, Inc., Judlau Enterprises, LLC, Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc., Monadnock Construction, Inc., Schiavone Construction Co. LLC, Skanska Inc., Skanska USA Inc., Solera Construction Inc., Sorbara Construction Corp., Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc.. (Gross, Desiree)
July 2, 2012 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: This is not a motion #13 but Defendant's counsel reply to #12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Vertus, Miriam) Modified on 7/16/2012 (Vertus, Miriam).
June 29, 2012 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Green, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Amended Complaint due 7/6/12. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/29/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
June 28, 2012 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Averil C. Morrison. (O'Neill, Michael)
June 14, 2012 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2012. All parties present by telephone. Discussions held re #8 Motion to Compel. #8 Motion to Compel is granted. List to be produced by 6/18/12.(Tape #9:44:50 - 10:01:03.(N208))(Vertus, Miriam)
June 5, 2012 Filing 11 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference for June 6, 2012 (Telephone) by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Giblin, Vincent)
June 5, 2012 Filing 10 REPLY in Support re #8 Letter MOTION to Compel Indispensible Party Discovery filed by Averil C. Morrison. (O'Neill, Michael)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #8 Letter MOTION to Compel Indispensible Party Discovery filed by Averil C. Morrison. Telephone Conference set for 6/6/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the conference call once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/5/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference previously set for 6/6/12 is adjourned to 6/14/2012 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/5/2012. (Yasunaga, Adrienne)
June 4, 2012 Filing 9 Letter to MJ Reyes as a response in opposition to plaintiff's pre-motion letter dated 6/1/12 by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B.) (Giblin, Vincent) Modified on 6/5/2012 to add description of document (Chee, Alvin).
June 1, 2012 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Compel Indispensible Party Discovery by Averil C. Morrison. (O'Neill, Michael)
April 19, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/19/2012. Michael O'Neil, Esq for Plaintiff. Vincent Giblin,Esq and James Steinberg,Esq for Defendants.Discovery on indispensable parties to be completed by 6/1/2012., Complaint to be amended by 6/29/12. Status Conference set for 7/17/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr.(Tape #10:38:43 -11:06:15.) (Vertus, Miriam)
March 30, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Michael Giblin on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (aty to be noticed) (Giblin, Vincent)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Plaintiff's counsel to confirm with defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. The attached case management plan must be completed and brought to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 3/29/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
March 26, 2012 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO re #3 Answer to Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Steinberg, James)
March 26, 2012 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (Steinberg, James)
March 26, 2012 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
January 31, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Steinberg on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO (aty to be noticed) (Steinberg, James)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Averil C. Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 23, 2012 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653038940 (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 23, 2012 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCM Erectors, Inc.
Represented By: William Goldman Scher
Represented By: Yuval David Bar-kokhba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judlau Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Represented By: Michael J. Vollbrecht
Represented By: Ryan James Sestack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorbara Construction Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Adam Novikoff
Represented By: Jeremy Miller Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monadnock Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Epstein
Represented By: Michael Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragados Construction USA, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest City Commercial Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Miller Brown
Represented By: Lawrence R. Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska USA Inc.
Represented By: Marc S. Wenger
Represented By: Kimberly Natalie Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Construction Corporation of New York
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Construction Corporation
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 14-14B, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Represented By: Joseph H. Green
Represented By: Vincent Michael Giblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiavone Construction Co. LLC
Represented By: Matthew Tracy
Represented By: Tracy Morgan Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halmar Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Construction Company
Represented By: Erica Eden Frank
Represented By: Aislinn Sydney McGuire
Represented By: Raymond G. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska Inc.
Represented By: Marc S. Wenger
Represented By: Kimberly Natalie Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judlau Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Represented By: Michael J. Vollbrecht
Represented By: Ryan James Sestack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lend Lease (US) Construction LMB Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Zackin
Represented By: Christine A. Amalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragados USA, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Sol Contracting and Construction Corporation
Represented By: David B. Ross
Represented By: Dov Kesselman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest City Ratner Companies, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Miller Brown
Represented By: Lawrence R. Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Papas
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Crane Service Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest City Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Miller Brown
Represented By: Lawrence R. Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solera Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: McKissack & McKissack
Represented By: Lori A. Jablczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Averil C. Morrison
Represented By: Michael G. O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin Lewis Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delisa Williams
Represented By: Michael G. O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin Lewis Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy Danvers
Represented By: Michael G. O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin Lewis Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garfield Danvers
Represented By: Michael G. O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin Lewis Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janenne Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael G. O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin Lewis Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?