McMahon v. Napolitano et al

Defendant: W. Daniel Baldwin, Cynthia Covell, Teresa Halpin, Rachelle Lewis, James T. Madden, Geraldine Munsayac and Janet Napolitano
Plaintiff: Joyce A. McMahon
Case Number: 1:2013cv01404
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Referring Judge: Robert M. Levy
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, plaintiff's motions for reconsideration are denied. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/1/2016. (Gong, LiJia)
January 20, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, plaintiff's motions to recuse Judge Matsumoto and Judge Levy are denied. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/20/2016. (Gong, LiJia)
April 8, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing certain individual defendants. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Also as set for th in the within Order, plaintiff's claims against defendants W. Daniel Baldwin, Cynthia Covell, Teresa Halpin, James T. Madden, Rachelle Lewis, and Geraldine Munsayac are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). No summons sha ll issue as to these defendants. Plaintiff's complaint against the remaining defendant, Secretary Janet Napolitano, may proceed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue a summons for this defendant and the United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the complaint and this Order on this defendant without prepayment of fees. The case is also respectfully referred to the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge, for pretrial supervision. The Court certifies pursua nt to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The clerk of court is also respectfully requested to serve a copy of the within Order on the pro se plaintiff and to note service of the same on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/8/2013. (Kelley, Jamuna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMahon v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Daniel Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Covell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Halpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Munsayac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?