State Of New York et al v. Donald Trump et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina, State of Washington, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Virginia, State of Massachussetts, District of Columbia, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Hawaii, State of Massachusetts and State of Colorado
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Donald Trump, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Chad Wolf
Amicus Curiae: The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC), Service Employees International Union, African Services Committee, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Vassar College, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), Alianza Americas, Barnard College, Northern Manhattan Improvement Corporation, Asian American Bar Association of New York, United Farm Workers of America, City of Los Angeles, Colgate University, Hispanic Federation, Inc., Harvard University, Government of the United Mexican States, Duke University, Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al, Mount Holyoke College, Cornell University, Bucknell University, CUNY DREAMers, Legal Services for Children (LSC), Dolores Street Community Services, Volunteers of Legal Service, Emerson College, The Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, College Confident, University of Pennsylvania, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, The Hispanic National Bar Association, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., Asian Americans Advancing Justice, National Justice for Our Neighbors, Vanderbilt University, Arab American Institute, The Door, New York University, ASPIRA, Centro Legal de la Raza, HawaiiKidsCAN, Virginia Excels, Communications Workers of America, Dream Action Coalition, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Bowdoin College, Case Western University, Georgetown University, Amherst College, Yale University, New York State Youth Leadership Council, the Anti-Defamation League, Canal Alliance, Pace University, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Brandeis University, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, University of Maryland-College Park, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, The Legal Aid Society, California Institute of Technology, RU Dreamers, Asian Law Alliance, Boston University, Just Neighbors, Council on American-Islamic Relations, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, NewMexicoKidsCAN, San Mateo Community College District, Wendy M Star, Northwestern University, Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials, Stanford University, Los Angeles Community College District, Presente.org, Washington University in St. Louis, Tufts University, University of Chicago, TODEC Legal Center, Columbia University, Emory University, Dartmouth College, National League of Cities, Immigrant Justice Corps, DelawareCAN: The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), South Bronx United, 27 Additional Cities and Counties, Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), OneJustice, League of United Latin American Citizens, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), UnLocal, George Washington University, 114 U.S. - Based Companies, MinKwon Center for Community Action, UnidosUS, Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders, Partnership for Educational Justice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), United We Dream, Colby College, Rice University, Wellesley College, United States Conference of Mayors (USCM), Sosa Law, Brooklyn Defender Services, Brown University, Los Rios Community College District, Northeastern University, The Immigrant and Non-Citizen Rights Clinic at the CUNY School of Law, Safe Horizon, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, The Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Williams College, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Middlebury College, Empire Justice Center, Carnegie Mellon University, Morton Rosenberg, Constitutional Accountability Center and County of Los Angeles
Case Number: 1:2017cv05228
Filed: September 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
2 Judge: James Orenstein
3 Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Dodge on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dodge, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 300 NOTICE by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Second Wolf Ratification) (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 7, 2020 Filing 299 REPLY in Support re #286 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #297 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants respectfully request that they be permitted to file one combined summary-judgment reply brief, not to exceed 25 pages. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/5/2020. (Brown, Marc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 297 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 296 NOTICE by State Of New York re #291 Memorandum in Opposition,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Correction (Colangelo, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #293 Motion for Extension of Time to File Summary-Judgment Reply, and to Re-Align the Schedule in the State of New York Matter with the Schedule in the Batalla Vidal Matter. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/28/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
September 28, 2020 Filing 294 NOTICE by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Order in Bullock v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management)) (Colangelo, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 293 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary-Judgment Reply, and to Re-Align the Schedule in the State of New York Matter with the Schedule in the Batalla Vidal Matter by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 292 NOTICE by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf of Filing of Revised Privilege Log (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Thorp, Galen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #286 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment, and reply in support of Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment filed by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Colangelo, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 290 NOTICE by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Wolf Ratification (Sept. 17, 2020)) (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 289 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Regarding Administrative Record) by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 288 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re #286 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) - Responses to Plaintiffs' Local Civil Rule 56.1 Statement and Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Defs.' Summary Judgment Exhibits) (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM in Support re #286 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 286 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 10, 2020 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of State of Pennsylvania (aty to be noticed) (Thomson, Aimee)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: #281 Request of local governments and the U.S. Conference of Mayors for leave to file an amicus brief is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/4/2020. (Lazarus, Benjamin)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: #280 Request of Morton Rosenberg for leave to file an amicus brief is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/4/2020. (Lazarus, Benjamin)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: #278 Request of Constitutional Accountability Center for leave to file an amicus brief is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/4/2020. (Lazarus, Benjamin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Suvor on behalf of County of Los Angeles (notification declined or already on case) (Suvor, Daniel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Carter on behalf of County of Los Angeles (notification declined or already on case) (Carter, Margaret)
September 4, 2020 Filing 282 NOTICE by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf of Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Certification of Administrative Record, #2 Administrative Record Nos. 1-8, #3 Administrative Record Nos. 9-10, #4 Administrative Record Nos. 11-22, #5 Administrative Record No. 23 (part 1), #6 Administrative Record No. 23 (part 2), #7 Administrative Record No. 23 (part 3), #8 Administrative Record No. 24, #9 Administrative Record Nos. 25-49, #10 Administrative Record Nos. 50-100) (Thorp, Galen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 281 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document the Brief of Amici Curiae 55 Local Governments and the U.S. Conference of Mayors in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment by County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae 55 Local Governments and the U.S. Conference of Mayors in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment) (Carter, Margaret)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #279 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Mark S. Davies, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 11, 2020, Mr. Davies shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Davies shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Davies shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/4/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
September 3, 2020 Filing 280 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document on Consent (Proposed Amicus Brief of Morton Rosenberg) by Morton Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief of Morton Rosenberg) (Bhatti, Upnit)
September 3, 2020 Filing 279 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13311101. by Morton Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Davies, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC) (Davies, Mark)
September 1, 2020 Filing 278 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Document Amicus Brief by Constitutional Accountability Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae) (Gans, David)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #276 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #277 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorneys Daniel R. Suvor, Esq. and Margaret L. Carter, Esq. are permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 8, 2020, Mr. Suvor and Ms. Carter shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Suvor and Ms. Carter shall each file a notice of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Suvor and Ms. Carter shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/31/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
August 31, 2020 Filing 277 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Margaret L. Carter Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13290688. by County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret L. Carter) (Carter, Margaret)
August 31, 2020 Filing 276 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Suvor Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13290403. by County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Suvor) (Suvor, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in Support re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 274 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 273 DECLARATION re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Matthew Colangelo in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 271 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Supplemental Complaint against Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, Chad Wolf, filed by State of Virginia, State of North Carolina, State of Vermont, State of Colorado, State of Massachusetts, State of Rhode Island, State of Illinois, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State Of New York, State of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of Washington, State of Iowa, State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 180, #2 Exhibit 181, #3 Exhibit Redline showing changes from First Amended Complaint to Second Amended Supplemental Complaint) (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SCHEDULING ORDER re: briefing and the production of administrative materials in two related cases: Batalla Vidal, et al. v. Wolf, et al., No. 16-cv-4756 (NGG) (JO), and State of NewYork, etal. v. Trump, etal., No.17-cv-5228 (NGG) (JO). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/24/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 20, 2020 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Wardenski on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Wardenski, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file their amended complaints by Friday, August 28, 2020 at 12:00 pm. The Government is DIRECTED to produce and file the administrative record, along with a privilege log, by Friday, September 4, 2020 at 12:00 pm. The court will consider all other unresolved scheduling questions during the status conference on Thursday, August 20, 2020 at 2:00 pm. Before the conference, each party is DIRECTED to designate one representative to speak on its behalf and to advise the court's Deputy of its representative via email at joseph_reccoppa@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/19/2020. (Lazarus, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 268 Letter Regarding Proposed Schedule by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Pls.' Original Scheduling Proposal, #2 Ex. 2 - Meet and Confer Email Chain) (Pezzi, Stephen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 267 Letter regarding Plaintiffs' joint proposed briefing schedule by State Of New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (In re Nielsen)) (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to submit their joint or individual briefing schedules by noon on August 19, 2020. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/17/2020. (Lazarus, Benjamin)
August 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held by videoconference before Hon. Nicholas G. Garaufis. Counsel for all parties present. The court held a Pre-Motion Conference on August 13, 2020. The court GRANTED leave for Plaintiffs to file amended complaints. The court DIRECTED the parties to meet and confer and to submit, by August 19, 2020, either a joint proposed briefing schedule and schedule for the production of administrative materials, or separate proposed schedules for the same. A status conference is scheduled for August 20, 2020, at 2 pm, at which the court will consider any unresolved scheduling issues. (Court Reporter Rivka Teich.) (Lazarus, Benjamin)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #264 request to treat the August 13, 2020 status conference as a pre-motion conference. Each party is DIRECTED to designate one representative to speak on its behalf and, before the conference, to advise the court's Deputy of its representative via email at joseph_reccoppa@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/13/2020. (Lazarus, Benjamin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 266 Letter in further support of Plaintiffs' request for coordinated status conference in 17-CV-5228 and 16-CV-4756 by State Of New York (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 265 Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' Letters in Advance of August 13 Conference by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Pezzi, Stephen)
August 11, 2020 Filing 264 Letter requesting pre-motion conference by State Of New York (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Galen Thorp on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Thorp, Galen)
July 30, 2020 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Douglas Wright on behalf of State of Delaware (notification declined or already on case) (Wright, Christian)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #261 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Christian D. Wright, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By August 6, 2020, Mr. Wright shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Wright shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Wright shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/30/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
July 30, 2020 Filing 261 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christian Douglas Wright Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13137623. by State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christian Douglas Wright in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate of Christian Douglas Wright) (Wright, Christian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 260 MANDATE of USCA as to #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America, #210 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump,United States of America. See document #259 USCA Order certified 7/29/20. This Mandate is issued: 7/29/20. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Main Document 260 replaced on 7/29/2020) (McGee, Mary Ann).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER of USCA as to #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America, #210 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America. The appeal in the above captioned case from an Order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York was argued on the District Court's record and the parties' briefs. While the appeal was pending, the Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellants' petition for certiorari before judgment. The Supreme Court issued its Opinion on June 18, 2020, and its judgment was transmitted to this Court on July 20, 2020.Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the District Court's February 13, 2018 order granting a preliminary injunction is VACATED, the District Court's November 9, 2017 Order partially denying Defendants-Appellants' motion to dismiss is AFFIRMED IN PART, and the District Court's March 29, 2018 Order partially denying the balance of Defendants-Appellants' motion to dismiss is REVERSED IN PART. The case is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Court's Opinion. Certified Copy Issued: 7/29/20. USCA #18-488, 18-1525, 18-1987, 18-1988. Order also pertains to case: 16-cv-4756. The USCA #s 18-485, 18-1521, 18-1985, 18-1986. Please Note that the USCA Mandate has not yet been issued. (McGee, Mary Ann) Modified on 7/29/2020 to reflect additional USCA Numbers.(McGee, Mary Ann).
July 28, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Wolf Memorandum) (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #257 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Jennifer B. Sokoler is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/1/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 257 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer B. Sokoler, #2 Proposed Order) (Sokoler, Jennifer)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #256 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Karen W. Lin is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/27/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
February 27, 2020 Filing 256 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Karen Lin by 114 U.S. - Based Companies. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Lin, #2 Proposed Order) (Lin, Karen)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #255 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Ajay Saini is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/17/2020. (Walker, Anna)
January 17, 2020 Filing 255 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State Of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Saini, Ajay)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #254 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Jonathan B. Miller is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/2/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
January 2, 2020 Filing 254 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Jonathan)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Valerie M. Nannery is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/11/2019. (Gutmann, Joseph)
October 11, 2019 Filing 253 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by District of Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Nannery, Valerie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Marie Konopka on behalf of District of Columbia (aty to be noticed) (Konopka, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Kallen on behalf of State of Virginia (notification declined or already on case) (Kallen, Michelle)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #250 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Michelle S. Kallen, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By August 7, 2019, Ms. Kallen shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Kallen shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Kallen shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/31/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 250 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11712787. by State of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Movant, Michelle S. Kallen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from California dated July 12, 2019, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from the District of Columbia dated July 25, 2019, #4 Certificate of Good Standing from Virginia dated July 10, 2019) (Kallen, Michelle)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #249 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Brett Shumate terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/11/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
April 11, 2019 Filing 249 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brett A. Shumate by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Shumate, Brett)
March 22, 2019 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Olson on behalf of State of Colorado (notification declined or already on case) (Olson, Eric)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #247 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Eric R. Olson, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By March 29, 2019, Mr. Olson shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Olson shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Olson shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/22/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
March 21, 2019 Filing 247 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11308647. by State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Olson, Eric)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #246 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Genevieve C. Nadeau terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/5/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 246 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Nadeau, Genevieve)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #245 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Anna P. Crane terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/27/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 245 Notice of MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Anna Crane by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna Crane, #2 Proposed Order) (VanDam, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Jeffrey VanDam, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By March 5, 2019, Mr. VanDam shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. VanDam shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. VanDam shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/26/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
February 25, 2019 Filing 243 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11229005. by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Admission Information) (VanDam, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - The motion is granted; attorney Lourdes Maria Rosado terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/12/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B Colangelo on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Colangelo, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE by State Of New York of Motion to Withdraw Appearance (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Rosado, Lourdes) Modified on 2/12/2019 (Guy, Alicia).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Ari Biernoff terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/6/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn) Modified on 2/7/2019 (Guy, Alicia).
February 5, 2019 Filing 240 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Biernoff, Ari)
December 27, 2018 Filing 239 MOTION to Join/Intervene by David Andrew Christenson. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 12, 2018 Filing 238 Friend of the Court/Amicus Brief submitted by David Andrew Christenson. (Lee, Tiffeny)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #237 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The application is granted; attorney Deirdre Marie-Iha terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/11/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
September 10, 2018 Filing 237 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marie-Iha, #2 Proposed Order Terminating Appearance) (Nakatsuji, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Nakatsuji on behalf of State of Hawaii (notification declined or already on case) (Nakatsuji, Robert)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #235 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Robert Nakatsuji, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By August 30, 2018, Mr. Nakatsuji shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Nakatsuji shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Nakatsuji shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/23/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
August 22, 2018 Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10676049. by State of Hawaii. (Nakatsuji, Robert)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #233 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The application is granted; attorney Shiloh Rainwater terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/20/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE by New York University for Shiloh A. Rainwater to withdraw as attorney. (Rainwater, Shiloh)
August 20, 2018 Filing 233 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by New York University. (Rainwater, Shiloh)
July 20, 2018 Filing 232 MANDATE of USCA as to #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America, #199 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America, #210 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America. Petitioners move, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), for leave to appeal November 9, 2017, and March 29, 2018, Orders of the District Court denying their motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petitions are GRANTED. See Klinghoffer v. S.N.C. Achille Lauro, 921 F.2d 21, 23-25 (2d Cir. 1990). It is further ORDERED that these appeals, as well as the appeals docketed under 2d Cir. 18-1521 and 18-1525, be heard in tandem with Petitioners appeals of the District Court's February 13, 2018, preliminary injunction, 2d Cir. 18-485 and 18-488. Petitioners are directed to file a scheduling notification within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order pursuant to Second Circuit Local Rule 31.2. USCA #18-123 and #18-1314. Mandate also reflects 16-cv-4756 with USCA #18-122 and 18-1313. Issued as Mandate: 7/19/18. (McGee, Mary Ann) (McGee, Mary Ann).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #231 Notice(Other) filed by State Of New York -- The application is granted; attorney Diane O. Lucas terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/13/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
July 13, 2018 Filing 231 NOTICE by State Of New York Withdrawal of Diane Lucas as counsel for the State of New York. New York State continues to serve as counsel in this matter. (Lucas, Diane)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER of USCA as to #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America, #199 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America, #210 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America. Petitioners move, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), for leave to appeal November 9, 2017, and March 29, 2018, Orders of the District Court denying their motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petitions are GRANTED. See Klinghoffer v. S.N.C. Achille Lauro, 921 F.2d 21, 23-25 (2d Cir. 1990). It is further ORDERED that these appeals, as well as the appeals docketed under 2d Cir. 18-1521 and 18-1525, be heard in tandem with Petitioners appeals of the District Courts February 13, 2018, preliminary injunction, 2d Cir. 18-485 and 18-488. Petitioners are directed to file a scheduling notification within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order pursuant to Second Circuit Local Rule 31.2. Certified Copy Issued: 7/5/18.. USCA #18-123 and #18-1314. (McGee, Mary Ann)
June 13, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline C. Melmed on behalf of State of Colorado (notification declined or already on case) (Melmed, Jacqueline)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #228 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Jacqueline C. Melmed, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By June 20, 2018, Ms. Melmed shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Melmed shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Melmed shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/13/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
June 12, 2018 Filing 228 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff State of Colorado Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10504709. by State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Admission Information Notice of Motion) (Melmed, Jacqueline)
May 29, 2018 Filing 227 ANSWER to #54 Amended Complaint, by All Defendants. (Pezzi, Stephen)
May 29, 2018 Filing 226 NOTICE by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feb. 26, 2018 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mar. 20, 2018 Order) (Pezzi, Stephen)
May 21, 2018 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
May 21, 2018 Filing 225 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #215 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #224 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The application is granted; attorney Donna H. Kalama terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/21/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
May 18, 2018 Filing 224 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna H. Kalama in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance, #2 Proposed Order Terminating Appearance) (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
May 14, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre Marie-Iha on behalf of State of Hawaii (notification declined or already on case) (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #222 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Deirdre Marie-Iha, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By May 21, 2018, Ms. Marie-Iha shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Marie-Iha shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Marie-Iha shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/14/2018. (Salvador, Anjali)
May 11, 2018 Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10427244. by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Deirdre Marie-Iha, #2 Certificate of Standing) (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #221 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is denied without prejudice to the movant's right to seek reconsideration in conformity with this court's local rules, which require that an application for admission pro hac vice include a properly sworn and notarized affidavit stating (a) whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony, (b) whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court, (c) whether there are any disciplinary proceedings presently against the applicant, and (d) the facts and circumstances surrounding any affirmative responses to (a) through (c). See Loc. Civ. R. 1.3(c). If the applicant seeks reconsideration, she must do so no later than May 21, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/7/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
May 4, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10407681. by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Deirdre-Marie-Iha, #2 Certificate of Standing) (Marie-Iha, Deirdre)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER, Defendants' motion to certify the court's March 29 M&O for interlocutory appeal (Dkt. 264 in No. 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 217 in No. I7-CV-5228) is granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/30/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 24, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lourdes Maria Rosado (Rosado, Lourdes)
April 19, 2018 Filing 218 Letter Regarding Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Pezzi, Stephen)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendants' Motion for Certification of the Court's March 29, 2018, Memorandum and Order for Interlocutory Appeal (No. 264 in No. 16-CV-4756; No. 217 in No. 17-CV-5228): Plaintiffs shall file their responses to the Motion, if any, by no later than April 18, 2018. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/13/2018. (Scott, Conrad)
April 13, 2018 Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to Appeal , Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), the Court's March 29, 2018 Order by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Pezzi, Stephen)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #216 Motion to Stay -- I agree with the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs that the defendants' proposal to stay the deadline for answering pending the resolution of appeals currently before the circuit court is inefficient and unnecessary. In the absence of such relief, the parties will be ready to resume discovery as soon as the appeals are resolved, while granting the motion will cause additional delay. It is reasonable to require the defendants to take the steps necessary to avoid exacerbating the needless delays they have already caused. However, that result can be achieved by granting the alternative relief the defendants propose of a 45-day extension of the time to answer. There is no reasonable prospect of the appeals being resolved by the deadline the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs suggest (April 20, 2018). Accordingly, I deny the defendants' request for an indefinite stay, but grant their alternative request of a 45-day extension. The defendants' shall file their amended answers by May 29, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/12/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #216 MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline Pending Appeal -- Any party seeking to be heard on the instant motion shall submit its response by April 11, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/10/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
April 10, 2018 Filing 216 MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline Pending Appeal by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' third amended complaint and the State Plaintiffs' amended complaint (Dkt. #207 in No. 16-CV-4756; No. #71 in No. 17-CV-5228) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' first, third, and fourth claims for relief are dismissed, and the second claim for relief is dismissed to the extent it alleges that Defendants weakened DHS's information-use policy. The sixth claim for relief is dismissed in part, as stated above. The State Plaintiffs' fifth and sixth claims for relief are dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/29/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #214 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion is granted; Attorney Danielle Carim Gray terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/19/2018. (Salvador, Anjali)
March 19, 2018 Filing 214 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle Gray in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance, #2 Proposed Order) (Gray, Danielle)
February 26, 2018 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie M. Nannery on behalf of District of Columbia (notification declined or already on case) (Nannery, Valerie)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #212 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Valerie Nannery, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By March 5, 2018, Ms. Nannery shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Nannery shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Nannery shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/26/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
February 23, 2018 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Valerie M. Nannery Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10225637. by District of Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Nannery, Valerie)
February 21, 2018 Filing 211 USCA MANDATE - Petitioner Kirstjen M. Nielsen, the Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, seeks a writ of mandamus to stay discovery orders entered by the District Court that required the Government (1) to supplement the administrative record it filed with the District Court and (2) to file a privilege log, in litigation challenging the decision to rescind the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals(DACA) program. We have considered Petitioner's additional arguments and find no basis for the extraordinary remedy of mandamus relief. Accordingly, the petition is DENIED, and the stay of the District Court's discovery orders is LIFTED. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Issued as Mandate: 2/21/18. USCA #17-3345. Document also reflects 16-cv-4756. (McGee, Mary Ann)
February 20, 2018 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #210 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
February 20, 2018 Filing 210 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #209 Order by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 AMENDED MEMORANDUM & ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Memorandum & Order filed earlier today is withdrawn. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/13/2018. (Scott, Conrad)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary injunction (Dkt. 123 in No. 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 96 in No. 17-CV-5228) are GRANTED. The Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (Dkt. 124) is DENIED as moot. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/13/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 1, 2018 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al (aty to be noticed) (Shebaya, Sirine)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER of USCA as to #199 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald Trump, United States of America. Petitioners move, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), for leave to appeal an order of the District Court denying their motion to dismiss these two District Court actions for lack of jurisdiction. The parties request that the petitions for leave to appeal be held in abeyance until the District Court rules on pending motions for injunctive relief and dismissal. It is ORDERED that the petitions for leave to file are held in abeyance pending the District Court's adjudication of the parties' pending motions. Once the District Court has decided the parties' pending motions, the Clerk of Court is directed to place the motion for leave to appeal the District Court's orders on the calendar for the next available panel. Certified Copy Issued: 1/31/18. USCA #18-123. Document also reflects USCA #18-122 (16-cv-4756) (McGee, Mary Ann) (McGee, Mary Ann)
January 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Argument held on 1/30/2018 on Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary injunction (Dkt. 123 in No. 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 96 in No. 17-CV-5228); Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. 207 in No. 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 71 in No. 17-CV-5228); and the Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (Dkt. 124 in No. 16-CV-4756). Counsel for all parties present. The court reserved decision on the motions. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll) (Scott, Conrad)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re: the State Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification Regarding Logistics for Oral Argument (Dkt. 185 in No. 17-CV-5228). The court sets the following schedule for oral argument: (1) on Plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction, Plaintiffs shall have 15 minutes, to divide as they see fit, and Defendants shall have 15 minutes; (2) on Defendants' motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs shall have 15 minutes, to divide as they see fit, and Defendants shall have 15 minutes; and (3) on the Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' motion for class certification, Plaintiffs shall have five minutes, and Defendants shall have five minutes. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/26/2018. (Scott, Conrad)
January 25, 2018 Filing 205 Letter by State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Rosado, Lourdes)
January 13, 2018 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 12, 2018 Filing 203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re #202 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Lucas, Diane)
January 12, 2018 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lucas, Diane)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER. The oral argument previously scheduled for January 18, 2018, at 11 a.m. is ADJOURNED until January 30, 2018, at 11 a.m. At a later date, the court will issue an order regarding the State Plaintiffs' letter requesting clarification of the format and timing of oral argument (Dkt. 185 in No. 17-CV-5228). Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/12/2018. (Scott, Conrad)
January 12, 2018 Filing 201 Letter in response to ECF 198 by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Saini, Ajay)
January 11, 2018 Filing 200 Letter in Response to the Court's Jan. 11, 2018 Order by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER. The parties are DIRECTED, by no later than January 12, 2018, to submit letters to the court addressing whether the oral argument currently scheduled for January 18, 2018, should be adjourned in light of Defendants' pending interlocutory appeal from the court's November 9, 2017, Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/11/2018. (Scott, Conrad)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendants' unopposed Application for Leave to File Excess Pages (Dkt. 232 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 197 in 17-CV-5228): The Application is GRANTED. Defendants' anticipated brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction shall not exceed 50 pages in length. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/10/2018. (Scott, Conrad)
January 9, 2018 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #199 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
January 8, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion for the court to certify its November 9th M&O for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) (Dkt. 219 in No. 16-CV-4756; Dkt 184 in No. 17-CV-5228) is GRANTED. Discovery and record supplementation in these cases are stayed pending the Second Circuit's decision on Defendants' anticipated interlocutory appeal. (See Dec. 27, 2017, USCA Order at 4.) So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/8/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
January 8, 2018 Filing 197 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 5, 2018 Filing 196 REPLY in Support re #184 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by All Defendants. (Westmoreland, Rachael)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #195 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The conference previously scheduled for January 8, 2018, is adjourned pending decision on Defendants motion for certification of the courts November 9, 2017 order for interlocutory appeal, Docket Entry #184 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/5/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
January 5, 2018 Filing 195 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for Jan. 8, 2018 by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 4, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Sameer Parvez Sheikh on behalf of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (notification declined or already on case) (Sheikh, Sameer)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #189 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Sameer Sheikh, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 11, 2018, Mr. Sheikh shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Sheikh shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Sheikh shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/4/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
January 3, 2018 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #184 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability And Motion for Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lucas, Diane)
January 3, 2018 Filing 192 Letter Notifying the Court of Defendants' Intent to File a Reply Brief by Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 3, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B. Sokoler on behalf of Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (notification declined or already on case) (Sokoler, Jennifer)
January 3, 2018 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Carim Gray on behalf of Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (notification declined or already on case) (Gray, Danielle)
January 3, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10089761. by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sameer P. Sheikh in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia)) (Sheikh, Sameer)
January 2, 2018 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Deepak Gupta on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Communications Workers of America, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Service Employees International Union, United Farm Workers of America (notification declined or already on case) (Gupta, Deepak)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #181 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Jennifer Sokoler, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 9, 2018, Ms. Sokoler shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Sokoler shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Sokoler shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 01/02/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #180 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Danielle Gray, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 9, 2018, Ms. Gray shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Gray shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Gray shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 01/02/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
December 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Order re: Defendants' Motion for an Administrative Stay (Dkts. 219, 220 in 16-CV-4756; Dkts. 184, 186 in 17-CV-5228): The Motion is GRANTED. Record supplementation and discovery are stayed pending consideration of Defendants' motion for certification of the court's November 9, 2017, order for interlocutory appeal. (See USCA Dec. 27, 2017, Order (Dkt. 210 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 177 in 17-CV-5228) at 4 ("While we decline to reserve decision on this petition while the Government pursues an interlocutory appeal, it may be prudent for the District Court to stay discovery pending the resolution of such proceedings.").) Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/30/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 30, 2017 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re #186 Letter MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Khan, Sania)
December 29, 2017 Filing 186 Letter MOTION to Stay by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Pezzi, Stephen)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendants' Motion for Certification of This Court's Order of November 9, 2017, for Interlocutory Appeal and for a Stay of Record Supplementation and Discovery (Dkt. 219 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 184 in 17-CV-5228): Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to respond to the Motion by no later than January 3, 2018. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/29/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 29, 2017 Filing 185 Letter Request for Clarification of Logistics for Oral Argument on January 18, 2018 by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Khan, Sania)
December 28, 2017 Filing 184 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Donald Trump, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 28, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SCHEDULING ORDER -- A status conference is scheduled for January 8, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/28/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 28, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10079443. by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Sokoler, Jennifer)
December 28, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10079402. by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Gray, Danielle)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Order re: the unopposed Applications to File Amicus Briefs, filed by Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials (No. 198 in 16-CV-4756; No. 167 in 17-CV-5228) and Amherst College et al. (No. 203 in 16-CV-4756; No. 169 in 17-CV-5228): the Applications are GRANTED. The proposed amicus briefs attached to those applications are deemed to have been filed. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/28/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 27, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin L. Saad on behalf of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (notification declined or already on case) (Saad, Martin)
December 27, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Coston on behalf of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (notification declined or already on case) (Coston, William)
December 27, 2017 Filing 177 USCA ORDER - Petitioner Kirstjen M. Nielsen, the Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, seeks a writ of mandamus to stay discovery orders entered by the District Court that required the Government (1) to supplement the administrative record it filed with the District Court and (2) to file a privilege log, in litigation challenging the decision to rescind the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) program. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the mandamus petition is DENIED, and the stay of the District Courts discovery orders is LIFTED. See document for further details. Certified Copy Issued: 12/27/17. USCA #17-3345. See also 16-cv-4756. (McGee, Mary Ann)
December 27, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Leon Fresco on behalf of Government of the United Mexican States (notification declined or already on case) (Fresco, Leon)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #157 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Deepak Gupta, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 2, 2018, Mr. Gupta shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Gupta shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Gupta shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Samuel Kolodner on behalf of African Services Committee, College Confident, Empire Justice Center, Immigrant Justice Corps, MinKwon Center for Community Action, Northern Manhattan Improvement Corporation, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, Safe Horizon, Sosa Law, South Bronx United, TODEC Legal Center, The Door, The Immigrant and Non-Citizen Rights Clinic at the CUNY School of Law, The Legal Aid Society, UnLocal, Volunteers of Legal Service (aty to be noticed) (Kolodner, Jonathan)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #152 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is denied without prejudice to the movant's right to seek reconsideration in conformity with this court's local rules, which require that an application for admission pro hac vice include a properly sworn and notarized affidavit stating (a) whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony, (b) whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court, (c) whether there are any disciplinary proceedings presently against the applicant, and (d) the facts and circumstances surrounding any affirmative responses to (a) through (c). See Loc. Civ. R. 1.3(c). If the applicant seeks reconsideration, she must do so no later than January 9, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #151 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is denied without prejudice to the movant's right to seek reconsideration in conformity with this court's local rules, which require that an application for admission pro hac vice include a properly sworn and notarized affidavit stating (a) whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony, (b) whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court, (c) whether there are any disciplinary proceedings presently against the applicant, and (d) the facts and circumstances surrounding any affirmative responses to (a) through (c). See Loc. Civ. R. 1.3(c). If the applicant seeks reconsideration, she must do so no later than January 9, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #141 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is denied without prejudice to the movant's right to seek reconsideration in conformity with this court's local rules, which require that an application for admission pro hac vice include a properly sworn and notarized affidavit stating (a) whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony, (b) whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court, (c) whether there are any disciplinary proceedings presently against the applicant, and (d) the facts and circumstances surrounding any affirmative responses to (a) through (c). See Loc. Civ. R. 1.3(c). If the applicant seeks reconsideration, he must do so no later than January 9, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #140 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Martin Saad, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 2, 2018, Mr. Saad shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Saad shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Saad shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #139 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney William Coston, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 2, 2018, Mr. Coston shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Coston shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Coston shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #134 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Leon Fresco, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 2, 2018, Mr. Fresco shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Fresco shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Fresco shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #131 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Melissa DiGrande, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By January 2, 2018, Ms. DiGrande shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. DiGrande shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. DiGrande shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/26/2017. (Salvador, Anjali)
December 22, 2017 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by the Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Anti-Defamation League, And Other Civil Rights And Social Justice Organizations As Amici Curiae filed by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (McLaughlin, Matthew)
December 22, 2017 Filing 173 EXHIBIT APPENDIX A to Brief of Amici by Asian Law Alliance, Brooklyn Defender Services, Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), Just Neighbors, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), Legal Services for Children (LSC), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC). Related document: #162 Memorandum in Support,,,, filed by Canal Alliance, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), Centro Legal de la Raza, Brooklyn Defender Services, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC), Just Neighbors, Dolores Street Community Services, Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Legal Services for Children (LSC), OneJustice, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Asian Law Alliance, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), National Justice for Our Neighbors, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts. (Wilson, Kara)
December 22, 2017 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in Support Brief Amici Curiae filed by City of Los Angeles, 27 Additional Cities and Counties, National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors (USCM). (Dundas, Michael)
December 22, 2017 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM in Support Brief Amici Curiae filed by African Services Committee, Immigrant Justice Corps, MinKwon Center for Community Action, South Bronx United, The Door, The Legal Aid Society, UnLocal, College Confident, Empire Justice Center, The Immigrant and Non-Citizen Rights Clinic at the CUNY School of Law, Northern Manhattan Improvement Corporation, Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, Safe Horizon, Sosa Law, TODEC Legal Center, Volunteers of Legal Service. (Kolodner, Jonathan)
December 22, 2017 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM in Support - Memorandum of Law Filed on Behalf of 87 Religious Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunctions filed by Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Zalesin, Steven)
December 22, 2017 Filing 169 Letter MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief by Amherst College, Barnard College, Boston University, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western University, Northeastern University, Colby College, Colgate University, Emerson College, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, University of Maryland-College Park, Middlebury College, Mount Holyoke College, Pace University, Rice University, San Mateo Community College District, Tufts University, Vassar College, Washington University in St. Louis, Wellesley College, Williams College. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae of Institutions of Higher Education in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Jestin, Katya)
December 22, 2017 Filing 168 TRIAL BRIEF of the Government of The United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction, by Government of the United Mexican States (Sokol, Howard)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: the unopposed Applications to File Amicus Briefs, filed by Service Employees International Union et al. (Dkt. 186 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 156 in 17-CV-5228); and 87 Religious Organizations (Dkt. 196 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 165 in 17-CV-5228): The Applications are GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/22/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 22, 2017 Filing 167 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief) (Harrell, J. Wells)
December 22, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Adeel Abdullah Mangi on behalf of Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al (aty to be noticed) (Mangi, Adeel)
December 22, 2017 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae in Support of plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunctions United States District Court Eastern District of New York by Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Steven Zalesin, #3 Exhibit A, Proposed Memorandum of Law) (Zalesin, Steven)
December 22, 2017 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction As Amicus Curiae In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For A Preliminary Injunction filed by New York University. (Obus, Steven)
December 22, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Alan Zalesin on behalf of Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al (aty to be noticed) (Zalesin, Steven)
December 22, 2017 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on behalf of Amici Curiae filed by Asian Law Alliance, Brooklyn Defender Services, Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), Just Neighbors, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), Legal Services for Children (LSC), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC). (Wilson, Kara)
December 22, 2017 Filing 161 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asian Law Alliance, Brooklyn Defender Services, Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), Just Neighbors, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), Legal Services for Children (LSC), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC) (Wilson, Kara)
December 22, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kara Corinne Wilson (Wilson, Kara)
December 22, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Corinne Wilson on behalf of Asian Law Alliance, Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), Just Neighbors, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), Legal Services for Children (LSC), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC), Brooklyn Defender Services (aty to be noticed) (Wilson, Kara)
December 22, 2017 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM in Support Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs filed by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Communications Workers of America, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Service Employees International Union, United Farm Workers of America. (Gupta, Deepak)
December 22, 2017 Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10073374. by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Communications Workers of America, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Service Employees International Union, United Farm Workers of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gupta, Deepak)
December 22, 2017 Filing 156 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Service Employees International Union, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Communications Workers of America, United Farm Workers of America, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades. (Gupta, Deepak)
December 22, 2017 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM in Support Brief Amici Curiae filed by Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders. (Lederer, Caryn)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: the unopposed Applications to File Amicus Briefs, filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF et al. (Dkt. 174 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 145 in 17-CV-5228); the Legal Aid Society et al. (Dkt. 176 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 147 in 17-CV-5228); Brown University et al. (Dkt. 184 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 153 in 17-CV-5228); and New York University (Dkt. 185 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 154 in 17-CV-5228): The Applications are GRANTED. The unopposed Application of Advocates for Youth et al. (Dkt. 178 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 148 in 17-CV-5228) to Join in the Amicus Brief of the Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/22/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 22, 2017 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Brief on Behalf of New York University As Amicus Curiae by New York University. (Attachments: #1 Brief of New York University as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion For A Preliminary Injunction) (Obus, Steven)
December 22, 2017 Filing 153 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae) (Sarnoff, Stuart)
December 22, 2017 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10072334. by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Sokoler, Jennifer)
December 22, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10072307. by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Gray, Danielle)
December 22, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Sarnoff on behalf of Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (aty to be noticed) (Sarnoff, Stuart)
December 21, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE by Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality of Filing of Amicus Curiae Brief pursuant to Dec 20 Order Granting Application to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Chang, Robert)
December 21, 2017 Filing 148 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Consent Motion to Add Amici to Forthcoming Amicus Curiae Brief by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Silverstein, Thomas)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: the unopposed Applications to File Amicus Briefs, filed by the New York State United Teachers et al. (Dkt. 139 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 113 in 17-CV-5228); Asian Law Alliance et al. (Dkt. 148 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 121 in 17-CV-5228); and the City of Los Angeles et al. (Dkt. 164 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 137 in 17-CV-5228): The applications are GRANTED. The Application of the Anti-Defamation League (Dkt. 166 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 138 in 17-CV-5228) to join in the amicus brief to be filed by the Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (the "Lawyers' Committee") is GRANTED, provided that the Lawyers Committee does not object to the application by December 22, 2017, at 5:00 P.M. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/21/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 21, 2017 Filing 147 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by The Legal Aid Society, African Services Committee, Immigrant Justice Corps, MinKwon Center for Community Action, South Bronx United, UnLocal, The Door. (Kolodner, Jonathan)
December 21, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr on behalf of ASPIRA, Alianza Americas, Arab American Institute, Asian American Bar Association of New York, Asian Americans Advancing Justice, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, CUNY DREAMers, Council on American-Islamic Relations, Dream Action Coalition, Hispanic Federation, Inc., LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., League of United Latin American Citizens, New York State Youth Leadership Council, Presente.org, RU Dreamers, The Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, The Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, The Hispanic National Bar Association, UnidosUS (notification declined or already on case) (Bohorquez, Fernando)
December 21, 2017 Filing 145 Letter MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc., Alianza Americas, Arab American Institute, The Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Asian American Bar Association of New York, Asian Americans Advancing Justice, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, ASPIRA, Council on American-Islamic Relations, CUNY DREAMers, Dream Action Coalition, The Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, The Hispanic National Bar Association, Hispanic Federation, Inc., League of United Latin American Citizens, New York State Youth Leadership Council, Presente.org, RU Dreamers, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-List of Amicus Curiae) (Bohorquez, Fernando)
December 21, 2017 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Shiloh Rainwater on behalf of New York University (notification declined or already on case) (Rainwater, Shiloh)
December 21, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth D. Fiur on behalf of New York University (notification declined or already on case) (Fiur, Seth)
December 21, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley C. Ferguson on behalf of New York University (notification declined or already on case) (Ferguson, Ashley)
December 21, 2017 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10070107. by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sameer P. Sheikh in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia)) (Sheikh, Sameer)
December 21, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10070092. by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Martin L. Saad in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia)) (Saad, Martin)
December 21, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10070070. by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William D. Coston in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia)) (Coston, William)
December 21, 2017 Filing 138 Letter MOTION for Leave to File join an amicus brief to be filed by the Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law by the Anti-Defamation League. (Harris, John)
December 21, 2017 Filing 137 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by City of Los Angeles. (Dundas, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by John Barney Harris on behalf of the Anti-Defamation League (aty to be noticed) (Harris, John)
December 21, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dundas on behalf of City of Los Angeles (notification declined or already on case) (Dundas, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leon Fresco Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10069438. by Government of the United Mexican States. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Fresco, Leon)
December 21, 2017 Filing 133 TRIAL BRIEF of Amici in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DelawareCAN: The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now, HawaiiKidsCAN, NewMexicoKidsCAN, Partnership for Educational Justice, Virginia Excels (Schwartz, William)
December 21, 2017 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Support AMICUS BRIEF OF 114 COMPANIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by 114 U.S. - Based Companies. (Pincus, Andrew)
December 21, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10068844. by New York University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa DiGrande in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (DiGrande, Melissa)
December 21, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Woo on behalf of New York University (aty to be noticed) (Woo, Tiffany)
December 21, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Schneider on behalf of 114 U.S. - Based Companies (notification declined or already on case) (Schneider, Rory)
December 21, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Lin on behalf of 114 U.S. - Based Companies (notification declined or already on case) (Lin, Karen)
December 21, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pincus on behalf of 114 U.S. - Based Companies (notification declined or already on case) (Pincus, Andrew)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #126 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Ashley Ferguson, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Ms. Ferguson shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Ferguson shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Ferguson shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw) Modified on 12/21/2017 (Guy, Alicia).
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Michael Dundas, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Mr. Dundas shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Dundas shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Dundas shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 21, 2017 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley Ferguson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10068384. by New York University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ashley Ferguson in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ferguson, Ashley)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #119 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Shiloh Rainwater, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Mr. Rainwater shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Rainwater shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Rainwater shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Seth Fiur, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Mr. Fiur shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Fiur shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Fiur shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #118 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Rory K. Schneider, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Mr. Schneider shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Schneider shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Schneider shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 21, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Obus on behalf of New York University (aty to be noticed) (Obus, Steven)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Karen Lin, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Ms. Lin shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Lin shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Lin shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #115 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Andrew Pincus, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 28, 2017, Mr. Pincus shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Pincus shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Pincus shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/21/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 21, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitland McCann Kennelly on behalf of DelawareCAN, HawaiiKidsCAN, NewMexicoKidsCAN, Partnership for Educational Justice, The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now, Virginia Excels (aty to be noticed) (Kennelly, Kaitland)
December 21, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Schwartz on behalf of DelawareCAN, HawaiiKidsCAN, NewMexicoKidsCAN, Partnership for Educational Justice, The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now, Virginia Excels (notification declined or already on case) (Schwartz, William)
December 20, 2017 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10067221. by City of Los Angeles. (Dundas, Michael)
December 20, 2017 Filing 121 Letter MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief on or before December 22, 2017 by Asian Law Alliance, Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM), Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Just Neighbors, Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC), The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC), Legal Services for Children (LSC), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG), Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN), Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN). (Wilson, Kara)
December 20, 2017 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Support re Order,,, re Application for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by United We Dream. (Karanjia, Peter)
December 20, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shiloh Rainwater Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10067078. by New York University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shiloh Rainwater in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Rainwater, Shiloh)
December 20, 2017 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10067079. by 114 U.S. - Based Companies. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Schneider, Rory)
December 20, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Sokol on behalf of Government of the United Mexican States (notification declined or already on case) (Sokol, Howard)
December 20, 2017 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10066946. by 114 U.S. - Based Companies. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit of Karen Lin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lin, Karen)
December 20, 2017 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10066939. by 114 U.S. - Based Companies. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Pincus, Andrew)
December 20, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10066863. by New York University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Fiur, Seth)
December 20, 2017 Filing 113 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus by Wendy M Star. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief) (Star, Wendy)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: the unopposed Applications for Leave to File Amicus Briefs, filed by United We Dream (Dkt. 132 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 106 in 17-CV-5228); the Government of the United Mexican States (Dkt. 135 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 109 in 17-CV-5228); Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders (Dkt. 136 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 110 in 17-CV-5228); Partnership for Educational Justice, DelawareCAN: The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now, HawaiiKidsCAN, NewMexicoKidsCAN, and Virginia Excels (Dkt. 137 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 112 in 17-CV-5228); and 114 U.S.-Based Companies (Dkt. 138 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 111 in 17-CV-5228): the Applications are GRANTED. The anticipated amicus briefs shall be filed by no later than December 22, 2017. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/20/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 20, 2017 Filing 112 Letter MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief on or before December 22, 2017 by Partnership for Educational Justice, DelawareCAN, The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now, HawaiiKidsCAN, NewMexicoKidsCAN, Virginia Excels. (Schwartz, William)
December 20, 2017 Filing 111 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by 114 U.S. - Based Companies. (Pincus, Andrew)
December 20, 2017 Filing 110 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders. (Lederer, Caryn)
December 20, 2017 Filing 109 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Government of the United Mexican States. (Sokol, Howard)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting (127) Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by The Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law in case 1:16-cv-04756-NGG-JO; granting (99) Motion for Leave to File in case Brief as Amicus Curiae by The Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law in case 1:17-cv-05228-NGG-JO. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/19/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 20, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Karanjia on behalf of United We Dream (notification declined or already on case) (Karanjia, Peter)
December 20, 2017 Filing 106 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by United We Dream. (Karanjia, Peter)
December 20, 2017 Filing 105 DECLARATION re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #97 Exhibit,,,,,, Exhibit List,,,,, Supplemental Document to Brannon Declaration (Ex. 96) by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Khan, Sania)
December 20, 2017 Filing 104 DECLARATION re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #97 Exhibit,,,,,, Exhibit List,,,,, Supplemental Document to Wong Declaration (Ex. 10) by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Khan, Sania)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: the unopposed Application for Leave to File an Amicus Brief, filed by the Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (Dkt. 127 in 16-CV-4756; Dkt. 99 in 17-CV-5228); and the unopposed Applications for Leave to File an Amicus Brief, filed by the Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality (Dkts. 129 and 131 in 16-CV-4756; Dkts. 101 and 103 in 17-CV-5228): The applications are GRANTED. The anticipated amicus briefs shall be filed by no later than December 22, 2017. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/20/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 20, 2017 Filing 103 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #101 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Chang, Robert)
December 19, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Guerra on behalf of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (aty to be noticed) (Guerra, Michael)
December 19, 2017 Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Chang, Robert)
December 19, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Chang on behalf of Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality (notification declined or already on case) (Chang, Robert)
December 18, 2017 Filing 99 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by The Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (McLaughlin, Matthew)
December 16, 2017 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #97 Exhibit,,,,,, Exhibit List,,,,, (Khan, Sania)
December 15, 2017 Filing 97 EXHIBIT List to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington., Exhibit List by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. Related document: #96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Hawaii, State of Virginia, State of Rhode Island, State Of New York, State of Iowa, State of Vermont, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of Colorado, State of Washington, State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-35, #2 Exhibit 36-50, #3 Exhibit 51-100, #4 Exhibit 101-112) (Khan, Sania)
December 15, 2017 Filing 96 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix Exhibit List, #3 Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction) (Khan, Sania)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Robert S. Chang, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 22, 2017, Mr. Chang shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Chang shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Chang shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/15/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Plaintiffs' #94 Application for Leave to File Excess Pages: The application is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' memorandum of law should not exceed 40 pages in length. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/14/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
December 14, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert S. Chang Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10052321. by Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert S. Chang in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Chang, Robert)
December 11, 2017 Filing 94 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff States' Brief by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Khan, Sania)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #93 Motion to Continue -- The motion is granted on consent; The status conference previously scheduled for December 13, 2017, is cancelled. I respectfully direct the Clerk of Court to substitute Elaine C. Duke with Kirstjen M. Nielsen, in her official capacity as the Secretary of Homeland Security. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/11/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 11, 2017 Filing 93 Second MOTION to Continue Dec. 13, 2017 Status Conference (Unopposed) by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Julio A. Thompson, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By December 15, 2017, Mr. Thompson shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Thompson shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Thompson shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/8/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
December 7, 2017 Filing 92 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice State of Vermont Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10032487. by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit) (Thompson, Julio)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The conference previously scheduled for November 30, 2017, is cancelled. The motion to adjourn the conference scheduled for December 13, 2017, is denied as premature without prejudice to renewal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/28/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
November 27, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Unopposed) by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Sarah Weston, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By November 27, 2017, Ms. Weston shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Weston shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Weston shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/20/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Scott Kaplan, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By November 27, 2017, Mr. Kaplan shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Kaplan shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Kaplan shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/20/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER, Defendants' application to accelerate the briefing schedule is therefore DENIED without prejudice to refiling after the Second Circuit has resolved Defendants' petition for a writ of mandamus. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/17/2017. (re: (79 in 1:17-cv-05228-NGG-JO) Letter filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Donald Trump, United States of America, (100 in 1:16-cv-04756-NGG-JO) Letter filed by Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Donald J. Trump ) (Lee, Tiffeny)
November 17, 2017 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sarah Weston) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9989843. by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Cert of Goodstanding (OR)) (Weston, Sarah)
November 17, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Scott Kaplan) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9989771. by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Cert of Goodstanding (OR), #3 Exhibit Cert of Goodstanding (WA), #4 Exhibit Cert of Goodstanding (CA) [inactive]) (Kaplan, Scott)
November 15, 2017 Filing 87 APPLICATION #86 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 11/15/2017. (Marziliano, August)
November 14, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by State of Iowa. (Blake, Nathanael)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated above. Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction (Dkt. #95 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The following claims are dismissed: Batalla Vidal v. Duke, No. 16-CV-4756: Fourth claim for relief (Due Process Clause--Notice); New York v. Trump, No. 17-CV-5228: Second claim for relief (Due Process Clause--Information-Use Policy); Third claim for relief (Equitable Estoppel--Information-Use Policy); Seventh claim for relief (Due Process Clause--Notice). Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction is denied with respect to all other claims. The court RESERVES RULING on Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/9/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #84 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The conference previously scheduled for November 8, 2017, is adjourned pending the resumption of discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/6/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
November 6, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for Nov. 8, 2017 by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
November 1, 2017 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re #82 Memorandum in Opposition CORRECTED (Khan, Sania)
November 1, 2017 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED filed by All Plaintiffs. (Khan, Sania)
November 1, 2017 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Dismiss Re: FRCP12(b)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Khan, Sania)
October 31, 2017 Filing 80 Letter Response Opposing Defendants Proposed Schedule by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Khan, Sania)
October 30, 2017 Filing 79 Letter Motion to Set Briefing Schedule by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 30, 2017 Filing 78 USCA ORDER - The stay entered on Friday, October 20, 2017 pending this hearing today by a three-judge panel is hereby extended until determination of the mandamus petition filed Monday, October 23, 2017. Resolution of the mandamus petition is deferred until such time as the District Court has considered and decided expeditiously issues of jurisdiction and justiciability. Response briefs on the mandamus petition may be filed promptly. The filing of any other or further briefs is deferred until further notice. Certified Copy Issued: 10/24/17. USCA #17-3345. See also 16-cv-4756 (McGee, Mary Ann)
October 30, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine M. Cohen on behalf of State of Delaware (notification declined or already on case) (Cohen, Aleine)
October 30, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron R. Goldstein on behalf of State of Delaware (notification declined or already on case) (Goldstein, Aaron)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Aleine Cohen, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By November 6, 2017, Ms. Cohen shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Cohen shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Cohen shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/30/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Aaron R. Goldstein, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By November 6, 2017, Mr. Goldstein shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Goldstein shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Goldstein shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/30/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' (96) Motion for Clarification or for Leave to File Excess Pages in No. 16-CV-4756. Plaintiffs in Batalla Vidal v. Duke, No. 16-CV-4756, and New York v. Trump, No. 17-CV-5228, need not address Defendants' arguments, other than those pertaining to issues of jurisdiction and justiciability, in their supplemental briefs due November 1, 2017. See the attached order. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/27/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
October 27, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America re #71 MOTION to Dismiss - Errata to Memorandum of Law in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Marutollo, Joseph)
October 27, 2017 Filing 73 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Aleine Cohen Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9937809. by State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Cohen, Aleine)
October 27, 2017 Filing 72 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Aaron R. Goldstein Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9937731. by State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Goldstein, Aaron)
October 27, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. Responses due by 11/1/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Pezzi, Stephen).
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendants' (94) Application for Leave to File Excess Pages in Case No. 16-CV-04756 and (70) Application for Leave to File Excess Pages in Case No. 17-CV-05228: The applications are granted. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/26/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
October 25, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Brief (Unopposed) by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Marutollo, Joseph)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the order issued by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in In re Duke, No. 17-3345, on October 24, 2017 (Dkt. 42), Defendants are DIRECTED to submit, by no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, October 27, 2017, a supplemental brief explaining why the court lacks jurisdiction to consider the claims raised in Batalla Vidal v. Duke, No. 16-4756, and New York v. Trump, No. 17-CV-5228, or why such claims are otherwise non-justiciable. Plaintiffs in each of these cases are DIRECTED to submit supplemental briefs in opposition by no later than 12:00 noon on Wednesday, November 1, 2017. The parties should include all arguments in support of their positions in their briefs; the court will not consider arguments incorporated by reference to other filings in these or any other cases. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/24/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the stay issued on October 20, 2017, by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, the parties' deadline for filing supplemental letter briefs discussing whether the privilege-log requirement should extend to materials considered by second-tier subordinates (Oct. 19, 2017, Order (No. 16-CV-4756, Dkt. 90) at 11) is ADJOURNED, pending further notice. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/23/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #69 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted on consent. The conference previously set for October 25, 2017, will be rescheduled immediately upon any resumption of discovery in this case. All other previously scheduled court appearance remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/23/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
October 23, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Unopposed) by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 20, 2017 Filing 68 USCA ORDER - The Government's emergency motion for a stay of discovery and record supplementation in the proceedings before the District Court is GRANTED pending its consideration by a regular three-judge panel of the Court, it being understood that during the pendency of this emergency motion and the stay hereby granted no rights or claims of rights of any of the parties shall have been waived or forfeited. The stay is contingent upon the Government filing the "full petition for a writ of mandamus", as described in its papers, on October 23, 2017 by 3:00 p.m. EST. It is so ordered. Certified Copy Issued: 10/20/17. USCA #17-3345. See also 16-cv-4756. (McGee, Mary Ann)
October 20, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Alexander De Haan on behalf of State of Oregon (aty to be noticed) (De Haan, Brian)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re: Motion to Stay in Case No. 1:16-cv-04756 (Dkt. 87) and Motion to Stay in Case No. 1:17-cv-05228 (Dkt. 64): The motion is denied for the reasons stated in the attached order. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/19/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting (84) Motion to Produce in case 1:16-cv-04756-NGG-JO. For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I grant the motion to compel and respectfully direct the defendants to complete production of the administrative record by 3:00 p.m., Eastern Daylight Time, on October 27, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/19/2017. (Orenstein, James)
October 18, 2017 Filing 64 Letter MOTION to Stay by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declarations) (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, The Court GRANTS in part, DENIES in part and RESERVES RULING in part on Defendants' motion to vacate the Order (Dkt. 69). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/17/2017. (Re: (69) Motion to Vacate in case 1:16-cv-04756-NGG-JO; and, (48) Motion to Vacate in case 1:17-cv-05228-NGG-JO) (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Jonathan S. Goldman, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 20, 2017, Mr. Goldman shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Goldman shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Goldman shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/13/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
October 12, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Scott Goldman Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9899444. by State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Goldman, Jonathan)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SCHEDULING ORDER: At a conference on October 11, 2017, I made certain discovery rulings as to which the parties may seek review. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a). Because the exigencies of this case make it impractical to allow the parties the full 14 days to file objections that would normally be available, I direct any party seeking review of this or any other ruling I make in this case to file objections no later than two business days after the ruling at issue unless otherwise ordered. See, e.g., Hispanic Counseling Ctr., Inc. v. Inc. Vill. of Hempstead, 237 F. Supp. 2d 284, 290 (E.D.N.Y. 2002). Responses to such objections shall be due two business days after the objections are filed unless otherwise ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/11/2017. (Orenstein, James)
October 11, 2017 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 10/11/2017, ( Status Conference set for 11/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein.) SCHEDULING: (1) The next status conference will be held on October 25, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. (2) A further status conference will be held on November 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. (3) A further status conference will be held on November 30, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. (4) A further status conference will be held on December 13, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. SUMMARY: (1) The conference previously scheduled for November 29, 2017, was adjourned to November 30, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. (2) I provided information to the parties about former colleagues and friends of mine who are involved in the litigation. I see no need to disqualify myself sua sponte, but any party seeking my disqualification on the basis of that information may file a motion by October 18, 2017. (3) As set forth on the record, I overruled the defendants' objections to the depositions of Donald Neufeld and Gene Hamilton. Other discovery disputes were not ripe for resolution today. The plaintiffs shall file a letter motion to compel the defendants to complete their production of the administrative record by October 13, 2017, and the defendants shall respond by October 16, 2017. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Orenstein, James)
October 10, 2017 Filing 59 REPLY in Support re #48 Letter MOTION to Vacate in part Sept. 27, 2017 Case-Management and Scheduling Order filed by All Defendants. (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 10, 2017 Filing 58 Letter in Response to Defendants' Objections to Discovery by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Lucas, Diane)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re docket entry #78 in CV 16-4756 and docket entry #57 in CV 17-5228 STATUS REPORT (Joint) -- The plaintiffs may file a response to the defendants' objections to discovery by 2:00 p.m. on October 10, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/9/2017. (Guy, Alicia)
October 6, 2017 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Bailey, Kate)
October 6, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America of Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Administrative Record) (Pezzi, Stephen)
October 4, 2017 Filing 55 Exhibit List to Plaintiff States' First Amended Complaint (ECF 54) by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit Exhibit 108, #109 Exhibit Exhibit 109, #110 Exhibit Exhibit 110, #111 Exhibit Exhibit 111, #112 Exhibit Exhibit 112, #113 Exhibit Exhibit 113, #114 Exhibit Exhibit 114, #115 Exhibit Exhibit 115, #116 Exhibit Exhibit 116, #117 Exhibit Exhibit 117, #118 Exhibit Exhibit 118, #119 Exhibit Exhibit 119, #120 Exhibit Exhibit 120, #121 Exhibit Exhibit 121, #122 Exhibit Exhibit 122, #123 Exhibit Exhibit 123, #124 Exhibit Exhibit 124, #125 Exhibit Exhibit 125, #126 Exhibit Exhibit 126, #127 Exhibit Exhibit 127, #128 Exhibit Exhibit 128, #129 Exhibit Exhibit 129, #130 Exhibit Exhibit 130, #131 Exhibit Exhibit 131, #132 Exhibit Exhibit 132, #133 Exhibit Exhibit 133, #134 Exhibit Exhibit 134, #135 Exhibit Exhibit 135, #136 Exhibit Exhibit 136, #137 Exhibit Exhibit 137, #138 Exhibit Exhibit 138, #139 Exhibit Exhibit 139, #140 Exhibit Exhibit 140, #141 Exhibit Exhibit 141, #142 Exhibit Exhibit 142, #143 Exhibit Exhibit 143, #144 Exhibit Exhibit 144, #145 Exhibit Exhibit 145, #146 Exhibit Exhibit 146, #147 Exhibit Exhibit 147, #148 Exhibit Exhibit 148, #149 Exhibit Exhibit 149, #150 Exhibit Exhibit 150, #151 Exhibit Exhibit 151, #152 Exhibit Exhibit 152, #153 Exhibit Exhibit 153, #154 Exhibit Exhibit 154, #155 Exhibit Exhibit 155, #156 Exhibit Exhibit 156, #157 Exhibit Exhibit 157, #158 Exhibit Exhibit 158, #159 Exhibit Exhibit 159, #160 Exhibit Exhibit 160, #161 Exhibit Exhibit 161, #162 Exhibit Exhibit 162, #163 Exhibit Exhibit 163, #164 Exhibit Exhibit 164, #165 Exhibit Exhibit 165, #166 Exhibit Exhibit 166, #167 Exhibit Exhibit 167, #168 Exhibit Exhibit 168, #169 Exhibit Exhibit 169, #170 Exhibit Exhibit 170, #171 Exhibit Exhibit 171, #172 Exhibit Exhibit 172, #173 Exhibit Exhibit 173, #174 Exhibit Exhibit 174, #175 Exhibit Exhibit 175, #176 Exhibit Exhibit 176, #177 Exhibit Exhibit 177, #178 Exhibit Exhibit 178, #179 Exhibit Exhibit 179) (Saini, Ajay)
October 4, 2017 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT from Plaintiff States against All Defendants, filed by State of North Carolina, State of Hawaii, State of Massachusetts, State Of New York, State of Virginia, State of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of Washington, State of Iowa, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Delaware, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List) (Khan, Sania)
October 4, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Bailey on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Bailey, Kate)
October 4, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fischer on behalf of State of Pennsylvania (notification declined or already on case) (Fischer, Michael)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Michael Fischer, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 11, 2017, Mr. Fischer shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Fischer shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Fischer shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/4/2017. (Drake, Shaw)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re Defendants' Motion to Vacate in Part Magistrate Judge James Orenstein's Case Management and Scheduling Order: The Motion is GRANTED in part, as stated in the attached order. Defendants' time to submit a privilege log is extended to October 20, 2017. The court will address Defendants' remaining objections by separate order. Defendants are invited to file a reply, not to exceed five pages, to Plaintiffs' oppositions no later than October 10, 2017. Re (69) Motion to Vacate in Case 16-CV-4756-NGG-JO and (48) Motion to Vacate in Case 17-CV-5228-NGG-JO. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/3/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
October 3, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Fischer Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9875850. by State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Fischer, Michael)
October 3, 2017 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 Letter MOTION to Vacate in part Sept. 27, 2017 Case-Management and Scheduling Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lucas, Diane)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: I respectfully direct the parties to appear before me for a status conference on each of the following dates, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 11D South: October 11, October 25, November 8, November 29, and December 13, 2017. I further respectfully direct the parties to submit a joint status report by October 6, 2017, in advance of the first conference scheduled above, and to submit a joint status report no later than one week before each subsequent conference. I will cancel any conference on the parties' unanimous request. Any counsel of record who wishes to listen to a conference by telephone may make arrangements to do so, but any counsel who wishes to be heard at a conference must appear in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/2/2017. (Orenstein, James)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendants' #48 Motion to Vacate in Part Magistrate Judge James Orenstein's #46 Case Management and Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to respond to Defendants' motion by no later than Tuesday, October 3, 2017, at 12 p.m. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/30/2017. (Scott, Conrad)
September 29, 2017 Filing 48 Letter MOTION to Vacate in part Sept. 27, 2017 Case-Management and Scheduling Order by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 28, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Partington on behalf of State of Rhode Island (aty to be noticed) (Partington, Rebecca)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint proposal for schedule of bi-weekly status conferences to address outstanding discovery disputes due by: September 29, 2017. Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: October 4, 2017. Deadline for defendants' production of administrative record and privilege log: October 6, 2017. Objections to discovery requests due by: 1 week after service of requests. Responses to discovery requests due by: 2 weeks after service of requests. Deposition errata due by: 1 week after deposition. Joint status report due by: 1 week before each status conference. All expert disclosures due by: November 15, 2017. All discovery to be completed by: December 15, 2017. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/27/2017. (Orenstein, James)
September 27, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Field on behalf of State of Rhode Island (aty to be noticed) (Field, Michael)
September 26, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Roach on behalf of State of Rhode Island (notification declined or already on case) (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Rebecca Partington, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 2, 2017, Ms. Partington shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Partington shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Partington shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/25/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam Roach, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 2, 2017, Mr. Roach shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Roach shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Roach shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/25/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Michael Field, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 2, 2017, Mr. Field shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Field shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Field shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/25/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 22, 2017 Filing 43 Letter in Response to Sept. 15, 2017 Order Regarding Defendants' Position on Discovery by Donald Trump, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 22, 2017 Filing 42 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rebecca Partington Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9849359. by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 PHV Affidavit - Partington, #2 PHV Good Standing - Partington) (Roach, Adam)
September 22, 2017 Filing 41 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Roach Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9849337. by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 PHV Affidavit - Roach, Adam, #2 PHV Good Standing - Roach) (Roach, Adam)
September 22, 2017 Filing 40 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Field Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9849298. by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Field, Michael, #2 Good Standing - Field, Michael) (Roach, Adam)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Nathanael Blake, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 28, 2017, Mr. Blake shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Blake shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Blake shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/21/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 20, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 19, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9840378. by State of Iowa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate in Good Standing) (Blake, Nathanael)
September 19, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Taylor on behalf of State of Massachusetts (notification declined or already on case) (Taylor, Abigail)
September 19, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna P. Crane on behalf of State of Illinois (notification declined or already on case) (Crane, Anna)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Abigail Taylor, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 26, 2017, Ms. Taylor shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Taylor shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Taylor shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/19/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 18, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9835930. by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Abigail)
September 18, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve C. Nadeau on behalf of State of Massachusetts (notification declined or already on case) (Nadeau, Genevieve)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Anna Crane, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 25, 2017, Ms. Crane shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Crane shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Crane shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/18/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Mark Kohler, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By Septemeber 25, 2017, Mr. Kohler shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Kohler shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Kohler shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/18/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 18, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. McGuire on behalf of State of Virginia (notification declined or already on case) (McGuire, Matthew)
September 15, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Marutollo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Marutollo, Joseph)
September 15, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Rosenberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Rosenberg, Brad)
September 15, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anna Crane Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9833040. by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Crane in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - IL) (Crane, Anna)
September 15, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9832264. by State of Connecticut. (Kohler, Mark)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: As discussed on the record at the conference in the Batalla Vidal action on September 14, 2017, I respectfully direct the parties to meet and confer about discovery. No later than September 22, 2017, the parties shall report their respective positions on the threshold question of whether discovery should proceed now or await the resolution of the defendants' anticipated motion for dismissal. By the same date, the parties shall submit their respective scheduling proposals in the event discovery is not stayed, as well as a proposed schedule for litigating any specific discovery disputes that the parties have identified as likely to arise. I will expect the parties to be prepared to discuss all matters relating to discovery at the next conference on September 26, 2017. In light of the fact that the parties to the Batalla Vidal action have agreed to the filing of a second amended complaint that will include claims that overlap with those already asserted in State of New York action, I encourage the plaintiffs' counsel in the latter case to participate in the meet-and-confer process in the former. Although issue has not yet been joined in the State of New York action, the participation of counsel from that case in the discovery planning process in the Batalla Vidal action will help to avoid needless burdens on the parties in each case. I therefore invite counsel for the parties in the State of New York action to appear at the conference in the Batalla Vidal action on September 26, 2017, and to participate in the discussion of issues relating to the discovery process. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/15/2017. (Orenstein, James)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Genevieve Nadeau, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 21, 2017, Ms. Nadeau shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Nadeau shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Nadeau shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/15/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 14, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Tania Maestas on behalf of State of New Mexico (notification declined or already on case) (Maestas, Tania)
September 14, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna H. Kalama on behalf of State of Hawaii (notification declined or already on case) (Kalama, Donna)
September 14, 2017 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Of New York. All Defendants. (Lucas, Diane)
September 14, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Genevieve Nadeau Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9829035. by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Nadeau, Genevieve)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Donna Kalama, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 21, 2017, Ms. Kalama shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Kalama shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Kalama shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Tania Maestas, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 21, 2017, Ms. Maestas shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Maestas shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Maestas shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Matthew McGuire, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 21, 2017, Mr. McGuire shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. McGuire shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. McGuire shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 13, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9827426. by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit of Donna H. Kalama) (Kalama, Donna)
September 13, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9827403. by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice - Tania Maestas, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Tania Maestas) (Maestas, Tania)
September 13, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew R. McGuire Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9825553. by State of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Commonwealth of Virginia) (McGuire, Matthew)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Marsha Chien, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 19, 2017, Ms. Chien shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Chien shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Chien shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/12/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 11, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Chien on behalf of State of Washington (notification declined or already on case) (Chien, Marsha)
September 11, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marsha J. Chien Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9820306. by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State of Washington, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State of California) (Chien, Marsha)
September 11, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Daniel Battles on behalf of State of Vermont (aty to be noticed) (Battles, Benjamin)
September 11, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Ferguson on behalf of State of Washington (aty to be noticed) (Ferguson, Robert)
September 8, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Biernoff on behalf of State of New Mexico (aty to be noticed) (Biernoff, Ari)
September 8, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sania Waheed Khan on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Khan, Sania)
September 8, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Omotayo Lucas on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Lucas, Diane)
September 8, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ajay Saini on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Saini, Ajay)
September 8, 2017 Filing 12 EXHIBIT List attaching exhibits 1-105, originally identified in ECF 1-2 by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by State of Hawaii, State of Virginia, State of Rhode Island, State Of New York, State of Iowa, State of Vermont, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of Washington, State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105) (Rosado, Lourdes)
September 8, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Melody on behalf of State of Washington (notification declined or already on case) (Melody, Colleen)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Robert Ferguson, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 15, 2017, Mr. Ferguson shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Ferguson shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Ferguson shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/8/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Colleen Melody, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 15, 2017, Ms. Melody shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Melody shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Melody shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/8/2017. (Miao, Tiffany)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross, Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/7/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 7, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION to Reassign Case requesting reassignment to the Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis, because it is related to Batalla Vidal et al. v. Baran et al., No. 1:16-cv-4756 by State Of New York, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachussetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 7, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Ferguson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9810331. by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing -WA) (Melody, Colleen)
September 7, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Colleen Melody Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9810258. by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - WA) (Melody, Colleen)
September 7, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Miller on behalf of State of Massachussetts (aty to be noticed) (Miller, Jonathan)
September 6, 2017 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2017 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT State of New York, et al. against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9807840 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by State of North Carolina, State of Hawaii, State of Massachussetts, State Of New York, State of Virginia, State of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of Washington, State of Iowa, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Summons Elaine C. Duke, #4 Proposed Summons DHS HQ, #5 Proposed Summons Donald Trump, #6 Proposed Summons ICE, #7 Proposed Summons USCIS HQ, #8 Proposed Summons USCIS NYC, #9 Proposed Summons USA (DOJ)) (Rosado, Lourdes)
September 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT State of New York, et al. against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9807840 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by State of North Carolina, State of Hawaii, State of Massachussetts, State Of New York, State of Virginia, State of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of Washington, State of Iowa, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Proposed Summons Elaine C. Duke, # 4 Proposed Summons DHS HQ, # 5 Proposed Summons Donald Trump, # 6 Proposed Summons ICE, # 7 Proposed Summons USCIS HQ, # 8 Proposed Summons USCIS NYC, # 9 Proposed Summons USA (DOJ)) (Rosado, Lourdes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Of New York et al v. Donald Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Marsha Chien
Represented By: Colleen Melody
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Battles
Represented By: Julio A. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sarah Weston
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Scott Kaplan
Represented By: Brian Alexander De Haan
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Jeffrey VanDam
Represented By: Anna P. Crane
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Nathanael Blake
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Virginia
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Michelle Kallen
Represented By: Matthew R. McGuire
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Massachussetts
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Konopka
Represented By: Valerie M. Nannery
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Michael Fischer
Represented By: Jonathan Goldman
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Represented By: Aimee D. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Rebecca Partington
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Michael Field
Represented By: Adam Roach
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Aleine M. Cohen
Represented By: Aaron R. Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Represented By: Christian Douglas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Mark F. Kohler
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of New York
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Diane Omotayo Lucas
Represented By: Ajay Saini
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Represented By: Joseph John Wardenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Donna H. Kalama
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Robert T. Nakatsuji
Represented By: Deirdre Marie-Iha
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Massachusetts
Represented By: Lourdes Maria Rosado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Represented By: Genevieve Clair Nadeau
Represented By: Jonathan B. Miller
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Sania Waheed Khan
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Melmed
Represented By: Eric Olson
Represented By: Matthew B Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Represented By: Brad Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Galen Thorp
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Represented By: Brad Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Galen Thorp
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Represented By: Brad Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Galen Thorp
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Represented By: Brad Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Galen Thorp
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Represented By: Brad Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Galen Thorp
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine C. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Represented By: Brad Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Galen Thorp
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: African Services Committee
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vassar College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alianza Americas
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Barnard College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northern Manhattan Improvement Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Bar Association of New York
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United Farm Workers of America
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael Dundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colgate University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hispanic Federation, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harvard University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Government of the United Mexican States
Represented By: Howard Sokol
Represented By: Leon Fresco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Duke University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Albuquerque Insight Meditation Center et al
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Adeel Abdullah Mangi
Represented By: Steven Alan Zalesin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mount Holyoke College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cornell University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bucknell University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CUNY DREAMers
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Services for Children (LSC)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dolores Street Community Services
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Volunteers of Legal Service
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emerson College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: College Confident
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Hispanic National Bar Association
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Justice for Our Neighbors
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vanderbilt University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arab American Institute
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Door
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York University
Represented By: Steven E. Obus
Represented By: Shiloh Rainwater
Represented By: Melissa DiGrande
Represented By: Ashley C. Ferguson
Represented By: Seth D. Fiur
Represented By: Tiffany Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASPIRA
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Centro Legal de la Raza
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HawaiiKidsCAN
Represented By: Kaitland McCann Kennelly
Represented By: William J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Virginia Excels
Represented By: Kaitland McCann Kennelly
Represented By: William J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Communications Workers of America
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dream Action Coalition
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Children's Law Center of Massachusetts (CLCM)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bowdoin College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Case Western University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Georgetown University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amherst College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yale University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York State Youth Leadership Council
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: the Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: John Barney Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Canal Alliance
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pace University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brandeis University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Maryland-College Park
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Legal Aid Society
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Institute of Technology
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RU Dreamers
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Law Alliance
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Boston University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Just Neighbors
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council on American-Islamic Relations
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Michael Anthony Guerra
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Silverstein
Represented By: Sameer Parvez Sheikh
Represented By: William D. Coston
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Martin L. Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NewMexicoKidsCAN
Represented By: Kaitland McCann Kennelly
Represented By: William J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Mateo Community College District
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wendy M Star
Represented By: Wendy Michelle Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwestern University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials
Represented By: J. Wells Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stanford University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Angeles Community College District
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Presente.org
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington University in St. Louis
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tufts University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Chicago
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TODEC Legal Center
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Columbia University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emory University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dartmouth College
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National League of Cities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Justice Corps
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DelawareCAN: The Delaware Campaign for Achievement Now
Represented By: Kaitland McCann Kennelly
Represented By: William J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Bronx United
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 27 Additional Cities and Counties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OneJustice
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UnLocal
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George Washington University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 114 U.S. - Based Companies
Represented By: Rory Schneider
Represented By: Andrew J. Pincus
Represented By: Karen Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MinKwon Center for Community Action
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UnidosUS
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders
Represented By: Caryn Cecelia Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Partnership for Educational Justice
Represented By: Kaitland McCann Kennelly
Represented By: William J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network (RMIAN)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United We Dream
Represented By: Peter Karanjia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colby College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rice University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wellesley College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States Conference of Mayors (USCM)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sosa Law
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brooklyn Defender Services
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brown University
Represented By: Stuart M. Sarnoff
Represented By: Danielle Carim Gray
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Rios Community College District
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northeastern University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Immigrant and Non-Citizen Rights Clinic at the CUNY School of Law
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Safe Horizon
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Represented By: Robert Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Aid Justice Center (LAJC)
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Williams College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Middlebury College
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Empire Justice Center
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Kolodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Carnegie Mellon University
Represented By: Katya T Jestin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Morton Rosenberg
Represented By: Mark Davies
Represented By: Upnit K. Bhatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Constitutional Accountability Center
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Daniel Suvor
Represented By: Margaret Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?