Doyle et al v. Cumulus Media Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin McCabe and Robert Doyle
Defendant: Radio License Holdings LLC, Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc. and Cumulus Media Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04667
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on November 6, 2018 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Chambers Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer the complaint by October 30, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/2/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cumulus Media Inc., Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc., Radio License Holdings LLC identifying Other Affiliate Eaton Vance Corp. for Cumulus Media Inc.. (Matthews, John)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cumulus Media Inc., Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc., Radio License Holdings LLC. (Matthews, John)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Matthews on behalf of Cumulus Media Inc., Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc., Radio License Holdings LLC (aty to be noticed) (Matthews, John)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Magistrate Judge Gold is directed to treat this case under Local Rule 72.2. Respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge for expedition of discovery and settlement. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 8/23/2018. (Barrett, C)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cumulus Media Inc., Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc., Radio License Holdings LLC. (Williams, Erica)
August 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Robert Doyle, Kevin McCabe (Bank, Todd)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Robert Doyle, Kevin McCabe (Bank, Todd)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10664801 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -n,, filed by Robert Doyle, Kevin McCabe. (Bank, Todd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/20/2018) (Williams, Erica).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle et al v. Cumulus Media Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McCabe
Represented By: Todd C. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Doyle
Represented By: Todd C. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio License Holdings LLC
Represented By: John Charles Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumulus Media Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?