Alberto v. Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto
Defendant: ABC Corp., Juan F. Puntiel, John Doe #1-10 and Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04762
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Luis Alberto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lee, C.K.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #28 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Luis Alberto. (Lee, C.K.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action by Luis Alberto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lee, C.K.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby adopted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/11/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 11, 2018 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/11/2018. Counsel for both sides present. Plaintiff will file his motion for conditional certification of a collective action by 10/15/2018; any opposition by defendants due 10/29/2018. The adopted case management plan will be docketed separately. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABC Corp., Juan F. Puntiel, Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp. (Duarte, Lorena)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #25 . The Court will address plaintiff's conditional certification motion at the Initial Status Conference scheduled on 10/11/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/5/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 25 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Plaintiff's Conditional Certification Motion by Luis Alberto. (Lee, C.K.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ABC Corp., Juan F. Puntiel, Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp.. (Duarte, Lorena)
October 1, 2018 Filing 23 Letter (Joint Initial Conference Statement) by Luis Alberto (Brown, William)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 10/11/2018 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #11 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 21, 2018 Filing 22 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Luis Alberto. (Brown, William)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO ANSWER is hereby extended through October 5, 2018. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' time to answer by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorena P. Duarte on behalf of ABC Corp., John Doe #1-10, Juan F. Puntiel, Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Duarte, Lorena)
September 10, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Alberto. ABC Corp. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Lee, C.K.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Alberto. Juan F. Puntiel served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Lee, C.K.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Alberto. Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Lee, C.K.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Luis Alberto (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 10/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/23/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Brown on behalf of Luis Alberto (aty to be noticed) (Brown, William)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ABC Corp., John Doe #1-10, Juan F. Puntiel, Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Luis Alberto (Lee, C.K.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Luis Alberto against ABC Corp., John Doe #1-10, Juan F. Puntiel, Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10676321, filed by Luis Alberto. (Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alberto v. Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Represented By: Lorena P. Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan F. Puntiel
Represented By: Lorena P. Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-10
Represented By: Lorena P. Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rico Pollo #2 Restaurant Corp.
Represented By: Lorena P. Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Represented By: William M. Brown
Represented By: Anne Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?