Gonzalez v. America et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Defendant: NYU Lutheran Medical Center, Maria F. Roberto, D.O. and United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00474
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/22/2019 @ 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/21/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NYU Lutheran Medical Center. (Papa, Laura)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M. Papa on behalf of NYU Lutheran Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Papa, Laura)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Of America, NYU Lutheran Medical Center, Maria F. Roberto, D.O., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Gabriel Gonzalez (Newman, Kyle)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Gabriel Gonzalez (Newman, Kyle)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:19-cv-00474 against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11132397 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Gabriel Gonzalez. (Newman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Lutheran Medical Center
Represented By: Laura M. Papa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria F. Roberto, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Represented By: Kyle Gordon Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?