Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Nostalgias Del Ayer, Inc. and Rosario Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2019cv02611
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Hong, Loan)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Considering the Notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal by the Parties and based on the settlement between the Parties, it is hereby ORDERED that based on the settlement, the Clerk's Office is authorized to close this case due to the settlement. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/26/2019. (Fernandez, Erica)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the notice of the settlement #13 , the initial conference scheduled for 8/16/2019 is hereby adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/26/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lonstein, Julie)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 8/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/16/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/10/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Rosario Gonzalez served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Nostalgias Del Ayer, Inc. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Rosario Gonzalez, Nostalgias Del Ayer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons- Nostalgias del Ayer, Inc.) (Fernandez, Erica)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re Notice (Other), by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re Notice (Other), by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE:The Proposed summons is rejected;Attorney Used Incorrect Case Number and Judge assigned. The Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Julie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rosario Gonzalez, Nostalgias Del Ayer, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11446514 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons as to Deft. Rosario Gonazalez, #3 Supplement Summons as to Deft. Nostalgias Del Ayer Inc.) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nostalgias Del Ayer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?