Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Echavarria et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Hernan Echavarria and Raices Colombianas Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02620
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference in this case on July 19, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by July 12, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/18/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hernan Echavarria, Raices Colombianas Corp. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Hernan Echavarria served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Wengrovsky, Todd)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Raices Colombianas Corp. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Hernan Echavarria, Raices Colombianas Corp. (Attachments: #1 Hernan Echavarria Summons) (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re Notice (Other), by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re Notice (Other), by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE:The Proposed summons is rejected;Attorney Used Incorrect Case Number and Judge assigned. The Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet.NOTICE (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Julie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hernan Echavarria, Raices Colombianas Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11447046 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons as to Deft. Hernan Echavarria, #3 Supplement Summons as to Deft. Raices Colombianas Corp.) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Echavarria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Echavarria
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raices Colombianas Corp.
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?