Fair Housing Justice Center et al v. ZP Realty Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kent Jackman, Michael James, John-Martin Green, Justin Carter, Samuel Ray Gates and Fair Housing Justice Center
Defendant: Zev Pollak, Eldina Balic, ZP Realty Capital LLC and 1411 Apt. LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04125
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Blander, Stuart)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 13, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/15/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Blander on behalf of 1411 Apt. LLC, Eldina Balic, Zev Pollak, ZP Realty Capital LLC (aty to be noticed) (Blander, Stuart)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis by 1411 Apt. LLC, Eldina Balic, Zev Pollak, ZP Realty Capital LLC (Blander, Stuart) Modified on 8/15/2019 (Guy, Alicia).
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Carter, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, Michael James. ZP Realty Capital LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Houk, Diane)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Carter, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, Michael James. Zev Pollak served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Houk, Diane)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Carter, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, Michael James. Eldina Balic served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Houk, Diane)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Carter, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, Michael James. 1411 Apt. LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Justin Carter, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Michael James (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Carter, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Michael James (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Carter, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Michael James (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Carter, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Michael James (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Carter, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Michael James (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Carter, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Michael James (Houk, Diane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1411 Apt. LLC, Eldina Balic, Zev Pollak, ZP Realty Capital LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11671125 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Justin Carter, John-Martin Green, Kent Jackman, Fair Housing Justice Center, Samuel Ray Gates, Michael James. (Houk, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Housing Justice Center et al v. ZP Realty Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zev Pollak
Represented By: Stuart A. Blander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldina Balic
Represented By: Stuart A. Blander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZP Realty Capital LLC
Represented By: Stuart A. Blander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1411 Apt. LLC
Represented By: Stuart A. Blander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Jackman
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John-Martin Green
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Carter
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Ray Gates
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Justice Center
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?