J.S.M. et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: J.S.M., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., T.F. and P.R.W., B.M., C.G., Q.T., L.G., P.W., E.M., A.N., A.S., E.N., K.M.E., S.F., W.W., D.C., A.F., S.J., T.T., T.N. and S.S.
Defendant: New York State Education Department, Richard A. Carranza, New York City Department of Education and Shannon Tahoe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00705
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply -- On consent, the motion is granted and the proposed schedule is so ordered. Defendants must answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 4, 2020. Plaintiffs' response (if necessary) shall be served on or before June 3, 2020; and Defendants' reply (if necessary) shall be served on or before June 18, 2020. Defendants' response or opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to certify class shall be served on or before April 17, 2020; and Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be served on or before May 1, 2020. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 4/3/2020. (Guy, Alicia)
April 1, 2020 Filing 23 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Motion, or Response to Amended Complaint, Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Class Certification by New York State Education Department, Shannon Tahoe. (Matthews, Elyce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Certify Class by A.F., A.N., A.S., B.M., C.G., D.C., E.M., E.N., J.S.M., K.M.E., L.G., M.C. and L.M., P.W., Q.T., S.F., S.J., S.S., T.F. and P.R.W., T.N., T.T., W.J.T. and W.H.T., W.W.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Danielle F. Tarantolo, #3 Declaration of Michael L. Akavan, #4 Exhibit 1 - External Review of NYCDOE, #5 Exhibit 2 - Update on the NYC Impartial Hearing System, #6 Exhibit 3 - Wilkins Memorandum (January 2020), #7 Exhibit 4 - Compliance Assurance Plan, #8 Exhibit 5 - NYC Special Education Cases - Chalkbeat, #9 Exhibit 6 - 1,713 Cases, One Hearing Officer - Chalkbeat, #10 Exhibit 7 - Goldmark Letter, #11 Exhibit 8 - Wilkins Memorandum (February 2020)) (Akavan, Michael)
March 20, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by P.W., E.M., J.S.M., L.G., B.M., Q.T., T.F. and P.R.W., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., C.G., T.T., S.S., K.M.E., S.J., E.N., A.S., W.W., D.C., A.N., A.F., T.N., S.F.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Update on the NYC Impartial Hearing System, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wilkins Memorandum (February 2020), #3 Exhibit 3 - Wilkins Memorandum (January 2020)) (Akavan, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William Brian Monahan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Monahan, William)
March 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice L. Birnbaum on behalf of Richard A. Carranza, New York City Department of Education (aty to be noticed) (Birnbaum, Janice)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/25/2020. (LK)
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Motion, or Response to Complaint on behalf of all Defendants by New York State Education Department, Shannon Tahoe. (Matthews, Elyce)
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Elyce Noel Matthews on behalf of New York State Education Department, Shannon Tahoe (notification declined or already on case) (Matthews, Elyce)
February 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Lea Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Robinson, Sandra)
February 12, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.G., B.M., P.W., Q.T., E.M., T.F. and P.R.W., J.S.M., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., C.G.. Richard A. Carranza served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Akenhead, Catherine)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.G., B.M., P.W., Q.T., E.M., T.F. and P.R.W., J.S.M., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., C.G.. New York City Department of Education served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Akenhead, Catherine)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.G., B.M., P.W., Q.T., E.M., T.F. and P.R.W., J.S.M., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., C.G.. Shannon Tahoe served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Akenhead, Catherine)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.G., B.M., P.W., Q.T., E.M., T.F. and P.R.W., J.S.M., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., C.G.. New York State Education Department served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Akenhead, Catherine)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Davis, Laura)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tasha Nicolette Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Thompson, Tasha)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Akenhead on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Akenhead, Catherine)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M. Klein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Jessica)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lampert Akavan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Akavan, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Greengold Stevens on behalf of B.M., C.G., E.M., J.S.M., L.G., M.C. and L.M., P.W., Q.T., T.F. and P.R.W., W.J.T. and W.H.T. (aty to be noticed) (Stevens, Jane)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 9, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 9, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by B.M., C.G., E.M., J.S.M., L.G., M.C. and L.M., P.W., Q.T., T.F. and P.R.W., W.J.T. and W.H.T. (Tarantolo, Danielle)
February 9, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed (2 PAGE FORM)Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2nd Page(Not Instructions) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12361058 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -N/A,, filed by L.G., B.M., P.W., Q.T., E.M., T.F. and P.R.W., J.S.M., M.C. and L.M., W.J.T. and W.H.T., C.G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Richard A. Carranza, as Chancellor of NYC Department of Education, #3 Proposed Summons for NYC Department of Education, #4 Proposed Summons for NYS Education Department, #5 Proposed Summons for Shannon Tahoe, as NYS Interim Commissioner of Education, #6 Exhibit 1 Update on the NYC Impartial Hearing System, #7 Exhibit 2 Memorandum from Kimberly Wilkins, NYSED) (Tarantolo, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.S.M. et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Education Department
Represented By: Elyce Noel Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Carranza
Represented By: Janice L. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Janice L. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Tahoe
Represented By: Elyce Noel Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.M.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C. and L.M.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.J.T. and W.H.T.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.F. and P.R.W.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.G.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q.T.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.W.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Represented By: William Brian Monahan
Represented By: Laura Davis
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Tasha Nicolette Thompson
Represented By: Jane Greengold Stevens
Represented By: Sandra Lea Robinson
Represented By: Jessica M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.N.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.N.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.E.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.F.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.W.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.J.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.T.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.N.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S.
Represented By: Michael Lampert Akavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?