Dechirico et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Palmer, Dan Dechirico and Angel Guzman
Defendant: Square Inc., Robinhood Markets Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Trading 212 Ltd., Freetrade Ltd., E*Trade Securities LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Webull Financial LLC, Ally Financial Inc., Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Interactive Brokers LLC, Citadel Enterprise Americas LLC, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, M1 Finance LLC, E*Trade Financial Holdings, LLC, Etoro USA Securities Inc., Robinhood Securities LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth LLC, Tastyworks Inc., Citadel Securities LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, IG Group Holdings PLC, Open to the Public Investing Inc., TD Ameritrade Inc., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc. and E*Trade Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00677
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/6/2021. (LK)
April 5, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed Order] Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 16, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr on behalf of Cash App Investing LLC, Square Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Pfeiffer, Alfred)
March 16, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda S Lee on behalf of Cash App Investing LLC, Square Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Lee, Belinda)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting [DE #59-4] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/15/2021. (LK)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting [58-3] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/15/2021. (LK)
March 15, 2021 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cash App Investing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Square, Inc., Corporate Parent Third Party Technologies Inc. for Cash App Investing LLC. (Lee, Belinda)
March 15, 2021 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Square Inc. (Lee, Belinda)
March 15, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Square, Inc. and Cash App Investing LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14278382. by Cash App Investing LLC, Square Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alfred C. Pfeiffer, Jr. in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - North Carolina State Court Order, #4 Proposed Order) (Pfeiffer, Alfred)
March 15, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Square, Inc. and Cash App Investing LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14278250. by Cash App Investing LLC, Square Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Lee, Belinda)
March 15, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilia B. Vazova on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC (notification declined or already on case) (Vazova, Lilia)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/15/2021. (LK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14274766. by The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (IL)) (Boyle, Gregory)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/12/2021. (LK)
March 11, 2021 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Open to the Public Investing Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Public Holdings, Inc. for Open to the Public Investing Inc.. (Bank, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Bank on behalf of Open to the Public Investing Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bank, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, ("Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint") by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets Inc., Robinhood Securities LLC. (Ryan, Antony)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/11/2021. (LK)
March 10, 2021 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sequoia Capital Operations LLC (Olivar, Harry)
March 10, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr on behalf of Sequoia Capital Operations LLC (aty to be noticed) (Olivar, Harry)
March 10, 2021 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Bank PLC identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. (Owens, Richard)
March 10, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14267059. by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lilia B. Vazova in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Vazova, Lilia)
March 10, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Edward Buterman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC (aty to be noticed) (Buterman, Lawrence)
March 10, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Owens on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC (aty to be noticed) (Owens, Richard)
March 8, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Sequoia Capital Operations LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 8, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Burke, Heather)
March 5, 2021 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apex Clearing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Apex Clearing Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent PEAK6 Investments LLC for Apex Clearing Corporation. (Pace, Jack)
March 5, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Gant on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Gant, Bryan)
March 5, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Gidley on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Gidley, John)
March 5, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Pace on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Pace, Jack)
March 5, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Square Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 5, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Cash App Investing LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 4, 2021 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC. for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Weinstein, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC. (Weinstein, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330, Other Affiliate ETCM Holdings, LLC for. (Weinstein, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Jones-Duffey on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (aty to be noticed) (Jones-Duffey, Janet)
March 4, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Cora on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (aty to be noticed) (Cora, Gina)
March 4, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Stryker Weinstein on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (aty to be noticed) (Weinstein, Brian)
March 3, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 3, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 3, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. ETrade Securities LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
March 3, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Jones-Duffey on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Jones-Duffey, Janet)
March 1, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Cora on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Cora, Gina)
February 26, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate E*Trade Financial Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial, LLC, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for. (Weinstein, Brian)
February 26, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Stryker Weinstein on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Weinstein, Brian)
February 26, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. ETrade Financial Corporation waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
February 26, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 24, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. The Charles Schwab Corporation waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. TD Ameritrade Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Charles Schwab & Co. Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Linnett Nunn on behalf of Stash Financial, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Nunn, Robin)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stash Financial, Inc. (Nunn, Robin)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Linnett Nunn on behalf of Ally Financial Inc. (aty to be noticed). (Nunn, Robin). NOTE: Attorney's Assistant C. Calvaruso called on 2/24/21 and notified Deputy Clerk M. Layne that the atty. Robin Nunn was associated in error as to deft. Ally Financial Inc.. Association updated, see DE #20 . (Layne, Monique).
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer as to Defendant Etoro USA Securities, Inc. (Hettler, Kathryn)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Tastyworks Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Schirripa, Frank)
February 22, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Melvin Capital Management LP waiver sent on 2/22/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Open to the Public Investing Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Apex Clearing Corporation waiver sent on 2/16/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Citadel Enterprise Americas LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Citadel Securities LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Related Action filed with the JPML (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Zaydfudim on behalf of Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer (aty to be noticed) (Zaydfudim, Eugene)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Robinhood Securities LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Robinhood Markets Inc. waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Hettler, Kathryn)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A Hettler on behalf of Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer (aty to be noticed) (Hettler, Kathryn)
February 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Etoro USA Securities Inc., FF Trade Republic Growth LLC, Freetrade Ltd., Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Open to the Public Investing Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets Inc., Robinhood Securities LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Square Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade Inc., Tastyworks Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Webull Financial LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14114202 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Guzman, Dan Dechirico, Joshua Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Schirripa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dechirico et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets Inc.
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpaca Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freetrade Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Represented By: Brian Stryker Weinstein
Represented By: Gina Marie Cora
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stash Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Linnett Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fumi Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webull Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Capital Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Brian Stryker Weinstein
Represented By: Gina Marie Cora
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash App Investing LLC
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Gregory M Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Brokers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Enterprise Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Buterman
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Financial Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian Stryker Weinstein
Represented By: Gina Marie Cora
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etoro USA Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities LLC
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital Operations LLC
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FF Trade Republic Growth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tastyworks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Jack E. Pace
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Represented By: Bryan Gant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IG Group Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open to the Public Investing Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 UK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Financial Corporation
Represented By: Brian Stryker Weinstein
Represented By: Gina Marie Cora
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Palmer
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A Hettler
Represented By: Eugene Zaydfudim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Dechirico
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A Hettler
Represented By: Eugene Zaydfudim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Guzman
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A Hettler
Represented By: Eugene Zaydfudim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?