Percy et al v. D & D Metal Work Inc et al
Plaintiff: Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives, Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation
Defendant: D & F Development Group, D & D Metal Work Inc, Delta, Eng-Wong, Taub & Associates, Elli NY Design Corp / Metropolitan Realty LLC, Ensome Builders Inc, Downtown Medical Assoc, Eckenfelder Engineering Dba Brown And Caldwell, Duke On 42nd Street Theatre, Dealogic LLC, Elysabeth Kleinhans Theatrical, East Woods Discovery Camp, Dexterity Inc, Eastone 26 Ave LLC, Edi Construction Inc, Exterminare Pest Control, Eldor Electric LLC, E Cook Industries, Elizabeth Seton Children's Ctr, Esoftware Associates Inc, Energy Fencing Inc., Execusearch Group, Dh Property Holdings LLC, D'onofrio General Contractors Corp., D.R.E. Drywall Corp, Ebrandz Inc, Damato Lynch, Danny And Nicole, Day Elevator & Lift, Emirates, Dasilva Architects P C, Double U Real Estate, Eastern Plumbing & Mechanical Contracting Inc, Earth Smart Environmental, Eisenberg & Baum Llp, Deboe Construction Corp., Executive Snow Control, Diagnostic Holter Monitoring, Ent And Allergy Associates, Dietwatch, Daniel Gale Real Estate Inc, Express Contracting Of Neck, Expert Service, Douglas Elliman Captl Impvment Corp., Exane, Inc., Dave Heiner Associates, Dorion Norton Electrical, D'annunzio & Sons Inc, Dsl Commercial Construction Inc., Emc Corp, Ewingcole Architects, Dataforms, Executive Health Program, Deno's Wonder Wheel, European Craft Inc, Eldorado Coffee Distributors, Electrical Contracting Sltns, Epic Ediscoverty Solutions, Empire State Development Corp, Edward J Minskoff Equities, Derek T Smith Law Group Pc, Dentons Us Llp, Eia Electric Inc., Empire Hotel, Department of Environmental Protection, Excel At Woodbury For Rehab, Eiges & Orgel PLLC, Damian Family Care Ctr, E-Merge Systems, Inc., Defender Security Svc Inc, Eurotech Construction Corp, Danbro Distributors, Digiscribe, Damcosoft Inc, Draper Associates Inc, Double D Contractors, Dlandstudio, Dy Consultants Inc, Ent-Ear Nose & Throat Journal, Dimensional Stone-Tile Designs, Delphi Plumbing & Heating Inc, Elkus Manfredi Architects Ltd, Elecnor Hawkeye, Downtown Express, Eisner & Assoc, Delta Enterprise Corp, Eastern Landscape Contractors, E Marketer Inc, Dependable Transport-Messenger, Dcbe Inc, Excelsior Hotel Manhattan Nyc, Enigma Diagnostic Corp, Dmd Contracting, Ddk & Co, Della Femina, Data Art, Dla Piper Llp (Us), Emblazent Inc, Directors Chair, Delta Sheet Metal Corp, E & A Supply Corporation, Dotdash, Entergy, Delta Signs & Flags Corp, Ej Electric Installation, Everest Advisors Car Accident, Digitas, Inc., Eastman Cooke Assoc LLC, Dynamic Sports Construction, Explorers Tech, Evans & Paul Unlimited Corp,, Doctor's Immediate Care Ctr, Exchange, Dia General Construction Inc, Equinox 63rd Street Inc., Doyle Baldante Inc, Door Automation Corp, Epoch Times Assoc Inc, David H Koch Theater, Dmar.Remodeling.LLC Sashmasters Nyc, Doctors Clinics, Elite Cosmetics, Doghouse, Express Trade Capital, Emerging Health Info Tech LLC, Darger Errante Yavitz-Blau Llp, Drury Design Dynamics, Dal-Tile Corporation, Empire Medical Group Of NY Pc, Deheng Chen, Ettinger Engineering Associates, Extell Development Co, Entertainment Tonite Music Inc, Elev8 Centers, Eastern General Contractors, Energize Electrical Contracting, Eihab Human Svc, Epec LLC, Endeavor, Enago, Digestive Disease-Nutri Ctr, Esplanade, Echostar Construction Inc, Davis Brody Bond Llp, Documentary Group, East Harlem Council For Human Serv. Inc., Duc Duc, Donjon Recycling, Design Expressions, Early Intervention Ctr & Pre, Eastern Mechanical Contracting, Denal Construction Corp, Ee Cruz Co Inc, Democracy Builders, Dragon Search, Epic Long Island, Dr Pichardo Pediatric Ctr, Emergency Dept James J Peters, East West Marketing Group, Esteem Patrol Inc, Davis Polk And Wardwell Llp, Easy2comply, Dr Aaron David & Dr Larissa, Elmhurst Care Ctr, Dechert Llp, Eshel Partners, Design Strategy Corp, Digizuite Usa, Deltek, Epilepsy Foundation Of Long Island Inc, Elliot Schwartz Mdpc, E & A Restoration, East Meadow School District, Eic Associates Inc, Department Head & Neck Surgery, El Barrio's Operation Fightback, Eger Healthcare, Empire Control Abatement Inc, Dentsu America, Inc., Dyna Tabs LLC, Doe Fund Inc, Dominican College, Dialysis, E W Howell Co Inc, Dramatists Play Svc Inc, Do Rite Mechanical Corp., Energy Intelligence Group, Dow Petroleum, David L Ferstendig Law Offices, Deborah Bradley Construction & Management Service, Dom & Tom, Departure Films, Douglaston Development, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Department Of Family Medicine, Emergency Dept Queens Hosp Ctr, Dbi Construction Consultants, Dynamic Services Intl, Davie's Ward Phillips Vineberg, Extended Care Facility, Delmar Of NY, Exponents Inc, Elmhurst Pediatrics, Decristofaro Law, Docs Physicians, Dtm Elevator Consulting Inc, Dewberry & Goodkind Inc, D & W Central Station, Dannell Maguire, David Abram Law Offices, Entourage Flooring Inc, Everlast Worldwide Inc., Diamond Personnel, Delta Testing Inc, Doubleclick Inc., Epithany Construction Svc, Edp World Inc, Electric Lighting Agencies Inc, Expedite Construction, E S Renovations & Construction, Dr Robinson M. D., Elmer W. Davis, Inc, Ehit, D H Griffin Construction Co, Ezras Choilim Health Center, Ellenberg & Partners, D A Collins Construction Co, Donovan Hatem Llp, Danadams, Dgital Media, Exair Inc, Dobrish Michaels Gross Llp, Eme Group Consulting Engineers, Derive Technologies LLC, Difazio Industries Inc, Empire City Iron Works, Edison Liquidating LLC, Designs Vatche, Entech Engineering, E Daskal Corp, Deg Construction, Dell & Dean PLLC, Dragados, Drchrono.Com Inc, Esi Cases & Accessories, Empire Music, Doar Rieck Kaley & Mack, Duggal Corp Headquarters, Ednet, Ernst And Young Llp, D'arcambal Ousley-Cuyler Burk, Eastern States Optical Inc, Dollar Airport Parking, Empire Entertainment Inc, David V Farrell Co, Dallas County Comm Clg / Eastfield Clg, Dattner Architects D.P.C., Du Art Film Laboratory Inc, Ecological Laboratories, El Regreso, Inc., Edson Construction Corp, Euro Castle Construction Corp., Dooley Electric, Electrosonic Limited, Eis Laassois Child Devmnt Svc, Data Industries Ltd, Drive In Hotel Corp, Esperanzaenterprises, Inc., Endai Worldwide, Eurostruct, Dfta, Elvo, David Geller Assoc, Department Of Gastroenterology, Diversified Heat Transfer Inc, Ess & Vee Acoustical Contrs, Ecuadorian Civic Committee Inc, Dave Restoration, Deluxe Post Production, Exclusive Door Co Inc, E & J Electric Installation Co, Dnp Builders LLC, D And D Elevator Maintenance, Inc., Dexter House, Edgeworx Studios LLC, Empl, Eon Mechanical Inc., De Simone Consulting, Diageo, Dr Howard Goldin, Dragonetti Brothers Landscaping, Enterprise Community Investments, Inc., Elite Renovation & Builders Corp., Davis & Gilbert, Empire Medical Svc, Exquisite Builders, LLC, Dreamland Construction, Eastco Shotcrete, Environmental Laboratories Inc, Er Dox Pedia-Nytp, Engineers Country Club Inc, Door 3, Empire Asset Mgmt Corp Ltd, Elit Green Builders Corp, D S Wolf Group, Die-Matic Products Inc, Droit Financial Tech LLC, Digital Force Ltd, Edge Auto Rental, Digital Ocean, Inc., David Kucera Inc, E A I Inc, Don Joe Auto Body, Dependable Windows Co Inc, Ecohealth Company Ltd, Ebo Nexus Inc, Environmental Defense Fund, Incorporated, Durst Organization, Endeavor Global, Dolphin Construction Corp, Esm Construction Corp, Dermatologic Associates Of NY, Euromed Inc., East Harlem Employment Svc Inc, Disney, E-Z-Em Inc, Ear Nose Throat Allergy Assoc, Dalton Greiner Hartman Maher And Co LLC, D Reis Furniture Mfg Corp, Drexel Hamilton Infrastructure, Everwest Real Estate Investors, Diana Naturals, Dow Jones And Company, Inc., Domovoy LLC, Everyday Health, Episcopal Divinity School, Donjon Marine Co Inc, Eeg Enterprises Inc, Doshi Diagnostic Imaging, Domain Companies, El Samam Meat Market, Egg Electric Inc, Esila D. Obiang, E P Engineering, Ent & Allergy Assoc LLC, Eac, D Glimmers D, Durkin & Durkin, Empirehd, Inc, Echo Park Pool Complex, Draftfcb, End Point Corp, D & S Restoration Inc, Dialyze Direct Ct LLC, Dominican Sisters Of Hope, Delta Contractors Inc, Episcopal Social Services, Davellino Cons. Inc., El Sol Contracting, Diehl And Sons Inc, Etg International LLC, Episcopal Relief And Development, D Rosen Co Inc, Emanon Electric Inc, Eastside Medical Assoc, Duggal Visual Solutions, Elq Industries Inc, Ebm Publications, E Electrial Contracting LLC, Deutsch Family Wine And Spirits, Epic Security Corp, Defoe Corporation, Exude Fitness, Dreamville Remodeling, Ecosecurities Limited, Duane Morris Llp, Edelman & Edelman Pc, Dweck Law Firm, Dig Ennaro Communications, Digital Currency Group, Deer Head Chemical Industries, Ellenoff Grossman & Schole Llp, Ec Metalizing, Inc, David Monn LLC, Downing & Peck Pc, Excelsior Automotive, Eclaro International, Inc., Dekalb Senior Residence, Delric Construction Co Inc, Downtown Design Partnership, Dometic, David Shuldiner Inc, Dxa Studio, Dds Mechanical Corp., Ecommerce Partners, Datalot Inc, Epic Sports Inc, Emergency Dept Staten Is Univ, Easco Boiler Corp, Dap, Do Something Inc, Diabetes & Endocrine Ctr, Earthworm Equipment Co, Elmhurst Electric Corp., Dialoguedirect Inc, Equinox Fitness, Deutsche Bank, Earth Construction Corp, Dougherty Ryan Giuffra Zambito, East Tremont Medical Ctr, Elk Investors, Engine Factory, Deborah Berke & Partners, Dr Penny Dodson, Epstein Drangel Bazerman James, Edocny, D-Mark Construction Corp, Dencityworks Architecture, Daughters Of Jacob, Deep Clean Maid Svc, El Museo Del Barrio, Eiseman Levine Lehrhaupt, Driver Media, Euro Rscg Direct Response LLC, Eastern Feather & Down Corp, Emm Group, Downtown Women, Dca Construction Ltd, Ezra Medical Center, Election Services Corp, El Puente De Williamsburg, Inc., Downstate Medical Center, Emover Software, Ddb Worldwide Partners Inc, Eckhaus & Olson Atty, Enterprise Electrical Contrs, Diamond Properties, Drexel Estimating, Eddytex Inc, El Dorado Renovations Inc, Dominion Products Inc, Empire Office, Egon Zehnder International Inc., Documentary Reprodctn Svc, East 34th St Heliport-6n5, Divatex Home Fashions Inc, Delux Transportation Services, Dylan Hotel, E And B Giftware LLC, David Werner Real Estate Investment, Epiq Systems Inc, Donald Marck Mcgeachy Inc, Daybreak Independent Services, D R Management Svc Inc, Evergreene Architectural Arts, Diamond Schmitt Architecture, Emerald Peek, Ecs Global, Deloitte Llp, Diversified Processors Inc, Dms & Assoc, Donnelly Mechanical Corp, Demicco Bros Inc., Empire State Fuel Co, Ennead Architects Llp, Dobco Inc, David York Agency Ltd, Devries Public Relations, Ltd., European Reinsurance Corporati, Efficient Combustion-Cooling, Eden Ii, Ecology Soap LLC, Encompass Develop Design & Construct LLC, Development Counselors Intl, Empire City Casino At Yonkers, Eres, Einstein Radiology, Dti, Expert Institute, Excel Media Systems, Eci Building Corp, Eldor Contracting Corp., Dore Partnership, Essex, Dai & Assoc, David Webb, En-Power Group, D Exposito & Partners, Dynamic Mechanical Contractors Inc, Dry Harbor Nursing Home, Deborah A. Nilson And Assoc PLLC, Edelsteins Faegenburg-Brown, Dhi Group, Inc., Di Giovanna Family Care Ctr, Eda Contractors, Epq Ediscovery Solutions Inc, Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Duval & Stachenfeld Llp, Dorfey & Whitney, EmblemHealth, Inc., Evergreen Environments LLC., Demar Plumbing Corp, Dtcc, Doctors Without Borders, Digital Pulp Inc, Edison Price Lighting, Direct Agents, Durafford Construction, Electronic Data & Rates, Emco Plumbing & Heating Co, D & J Concrete Corp., De Nardis Engineering, Davidson Dawson & Clark Llp, Dun-Rite Aplnc Repr Inc, Dhs Ice, Dayton Industries Inc, Empire State Equities, Executive Physicians Systems, Dri Mark Products Inc, Eisneramper Llp, Dy, Dan Endara, Dick Young Productions Ltd, Ew Howell Company Inc, Docs, Design & Urbanism Architectura, Elmax Builders Supply Co, Ecosystem Energy Services, Epm Communications Inc, Doremus And Company, Ex Air, Inc. D/B/A Ddc Air Conditioning, Eye Care Assoc, Deco Associates, Darcon Construction Corp, Downtown United Soccer Club, Elmo Realty, Elite 29 Construction LLC, Enterprise Pals, Inc., Eastern Steel Corp, Difama Concrete Inc, Evans Heintges Architects PLLC, Evojets LLC, East Meadow Family Practice, Empire Stat Group LLC, En-Tech Corp, Drug Policy Alliance, Eastsport Inc., Dannon Company, Dvl Consulting Engineers, Inc., Eastside Endoscopy, Einbinder & Dunn Llp, Eastern America Trio Prod Inc, Ej Murray Memorial Skating Ctr, Dotworks, Excel Interior Construction, Elmont Un Ion Free School Dist, Exec Comm LLC, Epner Technology, Dreamgo Liu Xue Zhong Jie Mei, Dds, Dunwell Elevator Maint, Electric Fixx Inc, Dgcc, Drsa Technology Inc?, Evins Communications Ltd, Doh & Mental Hygiene Gotham Center, Eidosmedia Inc, Diaz Electric Of New York Inc., Empire State Piping Co., Inc., Dionics Inc, Ecco Iii Enterprises Inc, Eikos Partners LLC, Dagher Engineering, Ddc Ac/Ex Air, Englehard Corp, Dufour Pastry Kitchens, Dewitt Stern Group, Inc., Discover General Contracting, Daikin Applied, Dr Betty Shabazz Health, Dwell Magazine, Excelsiorhome Health Care, Dotmailer, Empire Coffee Co, Donald W Brown Home Imprvmt, Devere Usa Inc., Dunn Development Corp, Davis Wright Tremaine, Eastern Sprinkler Supply, Esquire Legal Staffing, Envision Architects, Dorian Drake Intl Inc, Deerfield Management, Downtown Music Publishing, Excav Services Inc, Eileen Fisher Inc, Edg, Ej&S Contracting Corp, Dan Klores Assoc Inc, Elmo Usa Corp, Empac Contracting Corp., Ellanef Mgf Corp, David Chipperfield Architects, Design Construction Division Inc, Education Through Music, Department Of Educatiion, Edge Property Group LLC, Drillco National Group, Epic Pharma LLC, Eltech Elevator Industries, East End Gr., Europa Construction Corp, Dr Briones Med Weight Loss Ctr, Dynamo Electrical Corp, Desman Associates, Dematteis Construction Corp, East Coast Interiors, Daedalus Technology Group Inc, Event Journal Inc, Delivery.Com, Dnk, Episcopal Health Services Inc., Department Of Occupational Res, Entertainment Software Assn, Edward T Minor Co, E & T Plastic Mfg Co Inc, Eclerx LLC, Euro Castle Construction, Enterprise Engineering Inc, East River Medical Imaging, Epoch Investment Partners Inc, Dls Inc, Dewey Pegno & Kramarsky Llp, Eastern Excavations Inc, Dkms Americas, Deangelo Brothers, Inc., Excelon Associates, Dealertrack Holdings, Inc., Execu-Sys, Ltd., Devito Verdi, Dierks Heating Incorporated, Excel Security Corp, Dolce Arrowwood, Ehrenkranz & Ehrenkranz Llp, Eidosearch, Dqp Digital Quick Print, Engel Burman Group, Digital First Media, Everything, Dyna-Empire Inc, Digital Matrix Corporation, Doddi Information Tech Inc, David Kleinberg Design Assoc, Doma Inc, Excellent Asphalt Paving, Department Of Veterans Affairs, Elsol Contracting & Constr Inc, Dunnington Bartholow-Miller, Davidson Kempner Capital Management Lp, Dejana Industries, Debevoise And Plimpton Llp, E 135 And 3rd Ave Owner, LLC, David Rosen Bakery Supply, Evista Group, Eljin Construction, Delmar International, Ethosphere Press, Educational Alliance Inc, Dab-O-Matic Corp., Ez Facility Inc, Drain Kleen Sewer Svc Inc, Davidson Pipe Company Inc., Delaney Associates Lp, Eagle Instruments Inc, Elite Promotional Marketing, Dana Farber Cancer Institute, Emerging Leaders, Dept-Pub Safety County Police, Duffy & Duffy PLLC, Diaspora Community, Dantona Industries, Denville Line Pating, Inc, Diller & Scofidio, Eac Inc, Dodger Properties, Don Buchwald & Assoc Inc, Entlaw Inc, Denihan Construction Co LLC, David I Pankin Pc, Dean Energy Solutions Cor, Emergency Dept NY-Presbyterian, Electronic Devices Inc, East New York Svc Corp, Eagle 1 Mechanical, East West Systems Inc, Empire State Medical, Domino A LLC/Domino B LLC, Environet Systems LLC, Empire Physical Medicine-Pain, Desimone Consulting Engineers, Delaney Books Inc, Enertex Marketing Inc, Enrique Norten Architecture, Delbello Donnellan-Weingarten, Ee International, Durr Mechanical Construction, Eby Electro Inc, Dimaio Millwork Corp, Dsm Design Group, Esposito Builders, Dynamic Construction Company, Endeavor Streaming, Dj's Unlimited Productions, Emergency Dept Newyork, Di Salvo Contracting Co Inc, Dgj Contracting, Edwin Discount Doors & Windows, Estee Lauder Intl, E G Food Inc, Datacom Technology Group Inc., Dell-Tech Enterprise Inc, Dataiku Inc, Delcopainting Corp, Empire State Construction Co, Design Etc Inc, Earnst & Young, E Willw Epc, E J Electric Installation Company, Dagny Enterprises LLC, Ets Contracting Inc, Elmore Magazine, Eti, Emo Trans, Digitask Consultants Inc and Drive Medical Design and Manufacturing
Amicus Curiae: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv02182
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #37 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean)
June 25, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600486. (Kernan, James)
June 21, 2021 Filing 36 DECLARATION re #28 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James)
June 21, 2021 Filing 35 DECLARATION re #28 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James)
June 21, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene)
June 21, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Attorney Kernan's request to extend the deadline to show cause by thirty days is DENIED. A limited extension to June 21 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2021. (Baron, Laura)
June 11, 2021 Filing 32 DECLARATION re #31 Letter of Kami Z. Barker, dated June 11, 2021 by City of New York (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - May 27, 2020 letter, #2 EXHIBIT B - purported state court complaints, #3 EXHIBIT C - 1977 dismissal of Percy v. Brennan, #4 EXHIBIT D - SDNY February 20, 2018 decision, #5 EXHIBIT E - Percy affidavit, #6 EXHIBIT F- SDNY February 23, 2018 decision, #7 EXHIBIT G - Public Records Search Results, #8 EXHIBIT H - Kernan's Disciplinary Decision, #9 EXHIBIT I - Kernan's Discipline in KY, WV, and PA, #10 EXHIBIT J - City's cease-and-desist letter, dated July 24, 2020, #11 EXHIBIT K - Purported Notice of Settlement, #12 EXHIBIT L - OIG referral of Percy Jobs & Careers to the NY State AG) (Barker, Kami)
June 11, 2021 Filing 31 Letter supporting the referral of plaintiff's counsel, James Kernan, to the disciplinary committee by City of New York (Barker, Kami)
June 9, 2021 Filing 30 Letter by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation (Attachments: #1 attachment) (Kernan, James)
May 28, 2021 Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 25, 2021 Filing 27 Dnk added. (Kernan, James)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara (as related to 20-cv-6291)for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/18/2021. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to D & D Metal Work Inc, D & F Development Group, D & J Concrete Corp., D & S Restoration Inc, D & W Central Station, D A Collins Construction Co, D And D Elevator Maintenance, Inc., D Exposito & Partners, D Glimmers D, D H Griffin Construction Co, D R Management Svc Inc, D Reis Furniture Mfg Corp, D Rosen Co Inc, D S Wolf Group, D'annunzio & Sons Inc, D'arcambal Ousley-Cuyler Burk, D'onofrio General Contractors Corp., D-Mark Construction Corp, D.R.E. Drywall Corp, Dab-O-Matic Corp., Daedalus Technology Group Inc, Dagher Engineering, Dagny Enterprises LLC, Dai & Assoc, Daikin Applied, Dal-Tile Corporation, Dallas County Comm Clg / Eastfield Clg, Dalton Greiner Hartman Maher And Co LLC, Damato Lynch, Damcosoft Inc, Damian Family Care Ctr, Dan Endara, Dan Klores Assoc Inc, Dana Farber Cancer Institute, Danadams, Danbro Distributors, Daniel Gale Real Estate Inc, Dannell Maguire, Dannon Company, Danny And Nicole, Dantona Industries, Dap, Darcon Construction Corp, Darger Errante Yavitz-Blau Llp, Dasilva Architects P C, Data Art, Data Industries Ltd, Datacom Technology Group Inc., Dataforms, Dataiku Inc, Datalot Inc, Dattner Architects D.P.C., Daughters Of Jacob, Dave Heiner Associates, Dave Restoration, Davellino Cons. Inc., David Abram Law Offices, David Chipperfield Architects, David Geller Assoc, David H Koch Theater, David I Pankin Pc, David Kleinberg Design Assoc, David Kucera Inc, David L Ferstendig Law Offices, David Monn LLC, David Rosen Bakery Supply, David Shuldiner Inc, David V Farrell Co, David Webb, David Werner Real Estate Investment, David York Agency Ltd, Davidson Dawson & Clark Llp, Davidson Kempner Capital Management Lp, Davidson Pipe Company Inc., Davie's Ward Phillips Vineberg, Davis & Gilbert, Davis Brody Bond Llp, Davis Polk And Wardwell Llp, Davis Wright Tremaine, Day Elevator & Lift, Daybreak Independent Services, Dayton Industries Inc, Dbi Construction Consultants, Dca Construction Ltd, Dcbe Inc, Ddb Worldwide Partners Inc, Ddc Ac/Ex Air, Ddk & Co, Dds, Dds Mechanical Corp., De Nardis Engineering, De Simone Consulting, Dealertrack Holdings, Inc., Dealogic LLC, Dean Energy Solutions Cor, Deangelo Brothers, Inc., Debevoise And Plimpton Llp, Deboe Construction Corp., Deborah A. Nilson And Assoc PLLC, Deborah Berke & Partners, Deborah Bradley Construction & Management Service, Dechert Llp, Deco Associates, Decristofaro Law, Deep Clean Maid Svc, Deer Head Chemical Industries, Deerfield Management, Defender Security Svc Inc, Defoe Corporation, Deg Construction, Deheng Chen, Dejana Industries, Dekalb Senior Residence, Delaney Associates Lp, Delaney Books Inc, Delbello Donnellan-Weingarten, Delcopainting Corp, Delivery.Com, Dell & Dean PLLC, Dell-Tech Enterprise Inc, Della Femina, Delmar International, Delmar Of NY, Deloitte Llp, Delphi Plumbing & Heating Inc, Delric Construction Co Inc, Delta, Delta Contractors Inc, Delta Enterprise Corp, Delta Sheet Metal Corp, Delta Signs & Flags Corp, Delta Testing Inc, Deltek, Delux Transportation Services, Deluxe Post Production, Demar Plumbing Corp, Dematteis Construction Corp, Demicco Bros Inc., Democracy Builders, Denal Construction Corp, Dencityworks Architecture, Denihan Construction Co LLC, Deno's Wonder Wheel, Dentons Us Llp, Dentsu America, Inc., Denville Line Pating, Inc, Department Head & Neck Surgery, Department Of Educatiion, Department Of Family Medicine, Department Of Gastroenterology, Department Of Occupational Res, Department Of Veterans Affairs, Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Department of Environmental Protection, Departure Films, Dependable Transport-Messenger, Dependable Windows Co Inc, Dept-Pub Safety County Police, Derek T Smith Law Group Pc, Derive Technologies LLC, Dermatologic Associates Of NY, Design & Urbanism Architectura, Design Construction Division Inc, Design Etc Inc, Design Expressions, Design Strategy Corp, Designs Vatche, Desimone Consulting Engineers, Desman Associates, Deutsch Family Wine And Spirits, Deutsche Bank, Development Counselors Intl, Devere Usa Inc., Devito Verdi, Devries Public Relations, Ltd., Dewberry & Goodkind Inc, Dewey Pegno & Kramarsky Llp, Dewitt Stern Group, Inc., Dexter House, Dexterity Inc, Dfta, Dgcc, Dgital Media, Dgj Contracting, Dh Property Holdings LLC, Dhi Group, Inc., Dhs Ice, Di Giovanna Family Care Ctr, Di Salvo Contracting Co Inc, Dia General Construction Inc, Diabetes & Endocrine Ctr, Diageo, Diagnostic Holter Monitoring, Dialoguedirect Inc, Dialysis, Dialyze Direct Ct LLC, Diamond Personnel, Diamond Properties, Diamond Schmitt Architecture, Diana Naturals, Diaspora Community, Diaz Electric Of New York Inc., Dick Young Productions Ltd, Die-Matic Products Inc, Diehl And Sons Inc, Dierks Heating Incorporated, Dietwatch, Difama Concrete Inc, Difama Concrete Inc, Difazio Industries Inc, Dig Ennaro Communications, Digestive Disease-Nutri Ctr, Digiscribe, Digital Currency Group, Digital First Media, Digital Force Ltd, Digital Matrix Corporation, Digital Ocean, Inc., Digital Pulp Inc, Digitas, Inc., Digitask Consultants Inc, Digizuite Usa, Diller & Scofidio, Dimaio Millwork Corp, Dimensional Stone-Tile Designs, Dionics Inc, Direct Agents, Directors Chair, Discover General Contracting, Disney, Divatex Home Fashions Inc, Diversified Heat Transfer Inc, Diversified Processors Inc, Dj's Unlimited Productions, Dkms Americas, Dla Piper Llp (Us), Dlandstudio, Dls Inc, Dmar.Remodeling.LLC Sashmasters Nyc, Dmd Contracting, Dms & Assoc, Dnp Builders LLC, Do Rite Mechanical Corp., Do Something Inc, Doar Rieck Kaley & Mack, Dobco Inc, Dobrish Michaels Gross Llp, Docs, Docs Physicians, Doctor's Immediate Care Ctr, Doctors Clinics, Doctors Without Borders, Documentary Group, Documentary Reprodctn Svc, Doddi Information Tech Inc, Dodger Properties, Doe Fund Inc, Doghouse, Doh & Mental Hygiene Gotham Center, Dolce Arrowwood, Dollar Airport Parking, Dolphin Construction Corp, Dom & Tom, Doma Inc, Domain Companies, Dometic, Dominican College, Dominican Sisters Of Hope, Dominion Products Inc, Domino A LLC/Domino B LLC, Domovoy LLC, Don Buchwald & Assoc Inc, Don Joe Auto Body, Donald Marck Mcgeachy Inc, Donald W Brown Home Imprvmt, Donjon Marine Co Inc, Donjon Recycling, Donnelly Mechanical Corp, Donovan Hatem Llp, Dooley Electric, Door 3, Door Automation Corp, Dore Partnership, Doremus And Company, Dorfey & Whitney, Dorian Drake Intl Inc, Dorion Norton Electrical, Doshi Diagnostic Imaging, Dotdash, Dotmailer, Dotworks, Double D Contractors, Double U Real Estate, Doubleclick Inc., Dougherty Ryan Giuffra Zambito, Douglas Elliman Captl Impvment Corp., Douglaston Development, Dow Jones And Company, Inc., Dow Petroleum, Downing & Peck Pc, Downstate Medical Center, Downtown Design Partnership, Downtown Express, Downtown Medical Assoc, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown United Soccer Club, Downtown Women, Doyle Baldante Inc, Dqp Digital Quick Print, Dr Aaron David & Dr Larissa, Dr Betty Shabazz Health, Dr Briones Med Weight Loss Ctr, Dr Howard Goldin, Dr Penny Dodson, Dr Pichardo Pediatric Ctr, Dr Robinson M. D., Draftfcb, Dragados, Dragon Search, Dragonetti Brothers Landscaping, Drain Kleen Sewer Svc Inc, Dramatists Play Svc Inc, Draper Associates Inc, Drchrono.Com Inc, Dreamgo Liu Xue Zhong Jie Mei, Dreamland Construction, Dreamville Remodeling, Drexel Estimating, Drexel Hamilton Infrastructure, Dri Mark Products Inc, Drillco National Group, Drive In Hotel Corp, Drive Medical Design and Manufacturing, Driver Media, Droit Financial Tech LLC, Drsa Technology Inc, Drug Policy Alliance, Drury Design Dynamics, Dry Harbor Nursing Home, Dsl Commercial Construction Inc., Dsm Design Group, Dtcc, Dti, Dtm Elevator Consulting Inc, Du Art Film Laboratory Inc, Duane Morris Llp, Duc Duc, Duffy & Duffy PLLC, Dufour Pastry Kitchens, Duggal Corp Headquarters, Duggal Visual Solutions, Duke On 42nd Street Theatre, Dun-Rite Aplnc Repr Inc, Dunn Development Corp, Dunnington Bartholow-Miller, Dunwell Elevator Maint, Durafford Construction, Durkin & Durkin, Durr Mechanical Construction, Durst Organization, Duval & Stachenfeld Llp, Dvl Consulting Engineers, Inc., Dweck Law Firm, Dwell Magazine, Dxa Studio, Dy, Dy Consultants Inc, Dylan Hotel, Dyna Tabs LLC, Dyna-Empire Inc, Dynamic Construction Company, Dynamic Mechanical Contractors Inc, Dynamic Services Intl, Dynamic Sports Construction, Dynamo Electrical Corp, E & A Restoration, E & A Supply Corporation, E & J Electric Installation Co, E & T Plastic Mfg Co Inc, E 135 And 3rd Ave Owner, LLC, E A I Inc, E And B Giftware LLC, E Cook Industries, E Daskal Corp, E Electrial Contracting LLC, E G Food Inc, E J Electric Installation Company, E Marketer Inc, E P Engineering, E S Renovations & Construction, E W Howell Co Inc, E Willw Epc, E-Merge Systems, Inc., E-Z-Em Inc, Eac, Eac Inc, Eagle 1 Mechanical, Eagle Instruments Inc, Ear Nose Throat Allergy Assoc, Early Intervention Ctr & Pre, Earnst & Young, Earth Construction Corp, Earth Smart Environmental, Earthworm Equipment Co, Easco Boiler Corp, East 34th St Heliport-6n5, East Coast Interiors, East End Gr., East Harlem Council For Human Serv. Inc., East Harlem Employment Svc Inc, East Meadow Family Practice, East Meadow School District, East New York Svc Corp, East River Medical Imaging, East Tremont Medical Ctr, East West Marketing Group, East West Systems Inc, East Woods Discovery Camp, Eastco Shotcrete, Eastern America Trio Prod Inc, Eastern Excavations Inc, Eastern Feather & Down Corp, Eastern General Contractors, Eastern Landscape Contractors, Eastern Mechanical Contracting, Eastern Plumbing & Mechanical Contracting Inc, Eastern Sprinkler Supply, Eastern States Optical Inc, Eastern Steel Corp, Eastman Cooke Assoc LLC, Eastone 26 Ave LLC, Eastside Endoscopy, Eastside Medical Assoc, Eastsport Inc., Easy2comply, Ebm Publications, Ebo Nexus Inc, Ebrandz Inc, Eby Electro Inc, Ec Metalizing, Inc, Ecco Iii Enterprises Inc, Echo Park Pool Complex, Echostar Construction Inc, Eci Building Corp, Eckenfelder Engineering Dba Brown And Caldwell, Eckhaus & Olson Atty, Eclaro International, Inc., Eclerx LLC, Ecohealth Company Ltd, Ecological Laboratories, Ecology Soap LLC, Ecommerce Partners, Ecosecurities Limited, Ecosystem Energy Services, Ecs Global, Ecuado
May 14, 2021 Filing 25 Proposed Summons. by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives (Kernan, James)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rachel P. Kovner recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano for all further proceedings Type of Recusal PARTYOrdered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 5/6/2021. (Marziliano, August) Modified on 5/6/2021 (Marziliano, August).
April 29, 2021 Filing 24 D And D Elevator Maintenance, Inc., D Exposito & Partners, D Glimmers D, D H Griffin Construction Co, D R Management Svc Inc, D Reis Furniture Mfg Corp, D Rosen Co Inc, D S Wolf Group, D.R.E. Drywall Corp, Dab-O-Matic Corp. and Daedalus Technology Group Inc added. (Kernan, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 23 Express Contracting Of Neck, Express Trade Capital, Exquisite Builders, LLC, Extell Development Co, Extended Care Facility, Exterminare Pest Control, Exude Fitness, Eye Care Assoc, Ez Facility Inc, E-Z-Em Inc, Ezra Medical Center and Ezras Choilim Health Center added. (Kernan, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 22 Euro Castle Construction Corp., Euro Rscg Direct Response LLC, Euromed Inc., Europa Construction Corp, European Craft Inc, European Reinsurance Corporati, Eurostruct, Eurotech Construction Corp, Evans & Paul Unlimited Corp,, Evans Heintges Architects PLLC, Event Journal Inc, Everest Advisors Car Accident, Evergreen Environments LLC., Evergreene Architectural Arts, Everlast Worldwide Inc., Everwest Real Estate Investors, Everyday Health, Everything, Evins Communications Ltd, Evista Group, Evojets LLC, Ew Howell Company Inc, Ewingcole Architects, Ex Air, Inc. D/B/A Ddc Air Conditioning, Exair Inc, Exane, Inc., Excav Services Inc, Excel At Woodbury For Rehab, Excel Interior Construction, Excel Media Systems, Excel Security Corp, Excellent Asphalt Paving, Excelon Associates, Excelsior Automotive, Excelsior Hotel Manhattan Nyc, Excelsiorhome Health Care, Exchange, Exclusive Door Co Inc, Exec Comm LLC, Execusearch Group, Execu-Sys, Ltd., Executive Health Program, Executive Physicians Systems, Executive Snow Control, Expedite Construction, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Expert Institute, Expert Service, Explorers Tech and Exponents Inc added. (Kernan, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 Entlaw Inc, Entourage Flooring Inc, Environet Systems LLC, Environmental Defense Fund, Incorporated, Environmental Laboratories Inc, Envision Architects, Eon Mechanical Inc., Epec LLC, Epic Ediscoverty Solutions, Epic Long Island, Epic Pharma LLC, Epic Security Corp, Epic Sports Inc, Epilepsy Foundation Of Long Island Inc, Epiq Systems Inc, Episcopal Divinity School, Episcopal Health Services Inc., Episcopal Relief And Development, Episcopal Social Services, Epithany Construction Svc, Epm Communications Inc, Epner Technology, Epoch Investment Partners Inc, Epoch Times Assoc Inc, Epq Ediscovery Solutions Inc, Epstein Drangel Bazerman James, Equinox 63rd Street Inc., Equinox Fitness, Er Dox Pedia-Nytp, Eres, Ernst And Young Llp, Eshel Partners, Esi Cases & Accessories, Esila D. Obiang, Esm Construction Corp, Esoftware Associates Inc, Esperanzaenterprises, Inc., Esplanade, Esposito Builders, Esquire Legal Staffing, Ess & Vee Acoustical Contrs, Essex, Estee Lauder Intl, Esteem Patrol Inc, Etg International LLC, Ethosphere Press, Eti, Ets Contracting Inc, Ettinger Engineering Associates and Euro Castle Construction added. (Kernan, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 Empire Control Abatement Inc, Empire Entertainment Inc, Empire Hotel, Empire Medical Group Of NY Pc, Empire Medical Svc, Empire Music, Empire Office, Empire Physical Medicine-Pain, Empire Stat Group LLC, Empire State Construction Co, Empire State Development Corp, Empire State Equities, Empire State Fuel Co, Empire State Medical, Empire State Piping Co., Inc., Empirehd, Inc, Empl, Enago, Encompass Develop Design & Construct LLC, End Point Corp, Endai Worldwide, Endeavor Streaming, Endeavor, Endeavor Global, Energize Electrical Contracting, Energy Fencing Inc., Energy Intelligence Group, Enertex Marketing Inc, Engel Burman Group, Engine Factory, Engineers Country Club Inc, Englehard Corp, Eng-Wong, Taub & Associates, Enigma Diagnostic Corp, Ennead Architects Llp, En-Power Group, Enrique Norten Architecture, Ensome Builders Inc, Ent & Allergy Assoc LLC, Ent And Allergy Associates, Ent-Ear Nose & Throat Journal, En-Tech Corp, Entech Engineering, Entergy, Enterprise Community Investments, Inc., Enterprise Electrical Contrs, Enterprise Engineering Inc, Enterprise Pals, Inc., Entertainment Software Assn and Entertainment Tonite Music Inc added. (Kernan, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 19 Elite Cosmetics, Elite Promotional Marketing, Elite Renovation & Builders Corp., Elizabeth Seton Children's Ctr, Eljin Construction, Elk Investors, Elkus Manfredi Architects Ltd, Ellanef Mgf Corp, Ellenberg & Partners, Ellenoff Grossman & Schole Llp, Elli NY Design Corp / Metropolitan Realty LLC, Elliot Schwartz Mdpc, Elmax Builders Supply Co, Elmer W. Davis, Inc, Elmhurst Care Ctr, Elmhurst Electric Corp., Elmhurst Pediatrics, Elmo Realty, Elmo Usa Corp, Elmont Un Ion Free School Dist, Elmore Magazine, Elq Industries Inc, Elsol Contracting & Constr Inc, Eltech Elevator Industries, Elvo, Elysabeth Kleinhans Theatrical, Emanon Electric Inc, Emblazent Inc, EmblemHealth, Inc., Emc Corp, Emco Plumbing & Heating Co, Eme Group Consulting Engineers, Emerald Peek, E-Merge Systems, Inc., Emergency Dept James J Peters, Emergency Dept Newyork, Emergency Dept NY-Presbyterian, Emergency Dept Queens Hosp Ctr, Emergency Dept Staten Is Univ, Emerging Health Info Tech LLC, Emerging Leaders, Emirates, Emm Group, Emo Trans, Emover Software, Empac Contracting Corp., Empire Asset Mgmt Corp Ltd, Empire City Casino At Yonkers, Empire City Iron Works and Empire Coffee Co added. (Kernan, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 Edward T Minor Co, Edwin Discount Doors & Windows, Ee Cruz Co Inc, Ee International, Eeg Enterprises Inc, Efficient Combustion-Cooling, Eger Healthcare, Egg Electric Inc, Egon Zehnder International Inc., Ehit, Ehrenkranz & Ehrenkranz Llp, Eia Electric Inc., Eic Associates Inc, Eidosearch, Eidosmedia Inc, Eiges & Orgel PLLC, Eihab Human Svc, Eikos Partners LLC, Eileen Fisher Inc, Einbinder & Dunn Llp, Einstein Radiology, Eis Laassois Child Devmnt Svc, Eiseman Levine Lehrhaupt, Eisenberg & Baum Llp, Eisner & Assoc, Eisneramper Llp, Ej Electric Installation, Ej Murray Memorial Skating Ctr, Ej&S Contracting Corp, El Barrio's Operation Fightback, El Dorado Renovations Inc, El Museo Del Barrio, El Puente De Williamsburg, Inc., El Regreso, Inc., El Samam Meat Market, El Sol Contracting, Eldor Contracting Corp., Eldor Electric LLC, Eldorado Coffee Distributors, Elecnor Hawkeye, Election Services Corp, Electric Fixx Inc, Electric Lighting Agencies Inc, Electrical Contracting Sltns, Electronic Data & Rates, Electronic Devices Inc, Electrosonic Limited, Elev8 Centers, Elit Green Builders Corp and Elite 29 Construction LLC added. (Kernan, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 Eastern Plumbing & Mechanical Contracting Inc, Eastern Sprinkler Supply, Eastern States Optical Inc, Eastern Steel Corp, Eastman Cooke Assoc LLC, Eastone 26 Ave LLC, Eastside Endoscopy, Eastside Medical Assoc, Eastsport Inc., Easy2comply, Ebm Publications, Ebo Nexus Inc, Eby Electro Inc, Ebrandz Inc, Ec Metalizing, Inc, Ecco Iii Enterprises Inc, Echo Park Pool Complex, Echostar Construction Inc, Eci Building Corp, Eckenfelder Engineering Dba Brown And Caldwell, Eckhaus & Olson Atty, Eclaro International, Inc., Eclerx LLC, Ecohealth Company Ltd, Ecological Laboratories, Ecology Soap LLC, Ecommerce Partners, Ecosecurities Limited, Ecosystem Energy Services, Ecs Global, Ecuadorian Civic Committee Inc, Eda Contractors, Eddytex Inc, Edelman & Edelman Pc, Edelsteins Faegenburg-Brown, Eden Ii, Edg, Edge Auto Rental, Edge Property Group LLC, Edgeworx Studios LLC, Edi Construction Inc, Edison Liquidating LLC, Edison Price Lighting, Ednet, Edocny, Edp World Inc, Edson Construction Corp, Education Through Music, Educational Alliance Inc and Edward J Minskoff Equities added. (Kernan, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 16 Dynamic Sports Construction, Dynamo Electrical Corp, E & A Restoration, E & A Supply Corporation, E & J Electric Installation Co, E & T Plastic Mfg Co Inc, E 135 And 3rd Ave Owner, LLC, E A I Inc, E And B Giftware LLC, E Cook Industries, E Daskal Corp, E Electrial Contracting LLC, E G Food Inc, E J Electric Installation Company, E Marketer Inc, E P Engineering, E S Renovations & Construction, E W Howell Co Inc, E Willw Epc, Eac, Eac Inc, Eagle 1 Mechanical, Eagle Instruments Inc, Ear Nose Throat Allergy Assoc, Early Intervention Ctr & Pre, Earnst & Young, Earth Construction Corp, Earth Smart Environmental, Earthworm Equipment Co, Easco Boiler Corp, East 34th St Heliport-6n5, East Coast Interiors, East End Gr., East Harlem Council For Human Serv. Inc., East Harlem Employment Svc Inc, East Meadow Family Practice, East Meadow School District, East New York Svc Corp, East River Medical Imaging, East Tremont Medical Ctr, East West Marketing Group, East West Systems Inc, East Woods Discovery Camp, Eastco Shotcrete, Eastern America Trio Prod Inc, Eastern Excavations Inc, Eastern Feather & Down Corp, Eastern General Contractors, Eastern Landscape Contractors and Eastern Mechanical Contracting added. (Kernan, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 Drchrono.Com Inc, Dreamgo Liu Xue Zhong Jie Mei, Dreamland Construction, Dreamville Remodeling, Drexel Estimating, Drexel Hamilton Infrastructure, Dri Mark Products Inc, Drillco National Group, Drive In Hotel Corp, Drive Medical Design and Manufacturing, Driver Media, Droit Financial Tech LLC, Drsa Technology Inc?, Drug Policy Alliance, Drury Design Dynamics, Dry Harbor Nursing Home, Dsl Commercial Construction Inc., Dsm Design Group, Dtcc, Dti, Dtm Elevator Consulting Inc, Du Art Film Laboratory Inc, Duane Morris Llp, Duc Duc, Duffy & Duffy PLLC, Dufour Pastry Kitchens, Duggal Corp Headquarters, Duggal Visual Solutions, Duke On 42nd Street Theatre, Dunn Development Corp, Dunnington Bartholow-Miller, Dun-Rite Aplnc Repr Inc, Dunwell Elevator Maint, Durafford Construction, Durkin & Durkin, Durr Mechanical Construction, Durst Organization, Duval & Stachenfeld Llp, Dvl Consulting Engineers, Inc., Dweck Law Firm, Dwell Magazine, Dxa Studio, Dy, Dy Consultants Inc, Dylan Hotel, Dyna Tabs LLC, Dyna-Empire Inc, Dynamic Construction Company, Dynamic Mechanical Contractors Inc and Dynamic Services Intl added. (Kernan, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 Doremus And Company, Dorfey & Whitney, Dorian Drake Intl Inc, Dorion Norton Electrical, Doshi Diagnostic Imaging, Dotdash, Dotmailer, Dotworks, Double D Contractors, Double U Real Estate, Doubleclick Inc., Dougherty Ryan Giuffra Zambito, Douglas Elliman Captl Impvment Corp., Douglaston Development, Dow Jones And Company, Inc., Dow Petroleum, Downing & Peck Pc, Downstate Medical Center, Downtown Design Partnership, Downtown Express, Downtown Medical Assoc, Downtown Music Publishing, Downtown United Soccer Club, Downtown Women, Doyle Baldante Inc, Dqp Digital Quick Print, Dr Aaron David & Dr Larissa, Dr Betty Shabazz Health, Dr Briones Med Weight Loss Ctr, Dr Howard Goldin, Dr Penny Dodson, Dr Pichardo Pediatric Ctr, Dr Robinson M. D., Draftfcb, Dragados, Dragon Search, Dragonetti Brothers Landscaping, Drain Kleen Sewer Svc Inc, Dramatists Play Svc Inc and Draper Associates Inc added. (Kernan, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 Dlandstudio, Dls Inc, Dmar.Remodeling.LLC Sashmasters Nyc, D-Mark Construction Corp, Dmd Contracting, Dms & Assoc, Dnp Builders LLC, Do Rite Mechanical Corp., Do Something Inc, Doar Rieck Kaley & Mack, Dobco Inc, Dobrish Michaels Gross Llp, Docs, Docs Physicians, Doctors Clinics, Doctor's Immediate Care Ctr, Doctors Without Borders, Documentary Group, Documentary Reprodctn Svc, Doddi Information Tech Inc, Dodger Properties, Doe Fund Inc, Doghouse, Doh & Mental Hygiene Gotham Center, Dolce Arrowwood, Dollar Airport Parking, Dolphin Construction Corp, Dom & Tom, Doma Inc, Domain Companies, Dometic, Dominican College, Dominican Sisters Of Hope, Dominion Products Inc, Domino A LLC/Domino B LLC, Domovoy LLC, Don Buchwald & Assoc Inc, Don Joe Auto Body, Donald Marck Mcgeachy Inc, Donald W Brown Home Imprvmt, Donjon Marine Co Inc, Donjon Recycling, Donnelly Mechanical Corp, D'onofrio General Contractors Corp., Donovan Hatem Llp, Dooley Electric, Door 3, Door Automation Corp and Dore Partnership added. (Kernan, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 Dietwatch, Difama Concrete Inc, Difama Concrete Inc, Difazio Industries Inc, Dig Ennaro Communications, Digestive Disease-Nutri Ctr, Digiscribe, Digital Currency Group, Digital First Media, Digital Force Ltd, Digital Matrix Corporation, Digital Ocean, Inc., Digital Pulp Inc, Digitas, Inc., Digitask Consultants Inc, Digizuite Usa, Diller & Scofidio, Dimaio Millwork Corp, Dimensional Stone-Tile Designs, Dionics Inc, Direct Agents, Directors Chair, Discover General Contracting, Disney, Divatex Home Fashions Inc, Diversified Heat Transfer Inc, Diversified Processors Inc, Dj's Unlimited Productions, Dkms Americas and Dla Piper Llp (Us) added. (Kernan, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 Di Salvo Contracting Co Inc, Dia General Construction Inc, Diabetes & Endocrine Ctr, Diageo, Diagnostic Holter Monitoring, Dialoguedirect Inc, Dialysis, Dialyze Direct Ct LLC, Diamond Personnel, Diamond Properties, Diamond Schmitt Architecture, Diana Naturals, Diaspora Community, Diaz Electric Of New York Inc., Dick Young Productions Ltd, Diehl And Sons Inc, Die-Matic Products Inc and Dierks Heating Incorporated added. (Kernan, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 Dependable Windows Co Inc, Dept-Pub Safety County Police, Derek T Smith Law Group Pc, Derive Technologies LLC, Dermatologic Associates Of NY, Design & Urbanism Architectura, Design Construction Division Inc, Design Etc Inc, Design Expressions, Design Strategy Corp, Designs Vatche, Desimone Consulting Engineers, Desman Associates, Deutsch Family Wine And Spirits, Deutsche Bank, Development Counselors Intl, Devere Usa Inc., Devito Verdi, Devries Public Relations, Ltd., Dewberry & Goodkind Inc, Dewey Pegno & Kramarsky Llp, Dewitt Stern Group, Inc., Dexter House, Dexterity Inc, Dfta, Dgcc, Dgital Media, Dgj Contracting, Dh Property Holdings LLC, Dhi Group, Inc., Dhs Ice and Di Giovanna Family Care Ctr added. (Kernan, James)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 Deerfield Management, Defender Security Svc Inc, Defoe Corporation, Deg Construction, Deheng Chen, Dejana Industries, Dekalb Senior Residence, Delaney Associates Lp, Delaney Books Inc, Delbello Donnellan-Weingarten, Delcopainting Corp, Delivery.Com, Dell & Dean PLLC, Della Femina, Dell-Tech Enterprise Inc, Delmar International, Delmar Of NY, Deloitte Llp, Delphi Plumbing & Heating Inc, Delric Construction Co Inc, Delta, Delta Contractors Inc, Delta Enterprise Corp, Delta Sheet Metal Corp, Delta Signs & Flags Corp, Delta Testing Inc, Deltek, Delux Transportation Services, Deluxe Post Production, Demar Plumbing Corp, Dematteis Construction Corp, Demicco Bros Inc., Democracy Builders, Denal Construction Corp, Dencityworks Architecture, Denihan Construction Co LLC, Deno's Wonder Wheel, Dentons Us Llp, Dentsu America, Inc., Denville Line Pating, Inc, Department Head & Neck Surgery, Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Department Of Educatiion, Department of Environmental Protection, Department Of Family Medicine, Department Of Gastroenterology, Department Of Occupational Res, Department Of Veterans Affairs, Departure Films and Dependable Transport-Messenger added. (Kernan, James)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 David Abram Law Offices, David Chipperfield Architects, David Geller Assoc, David H Koch Theater, David I Pankin Pc, David Kleinberg Design Assoc, David Kucera Inc, David L Ferstendig Law Offices, David Monn LLC, David Rosen Bakery Supply, David Shuldiner Inc, David V Farrell Co, David Webb, David Werner Real Estate Investment, David York Agency Ltd, Davidson Dawson & Clark Llp, Davidson Kempner Capital Management Lp, Davidson Pipe Company Inc., Davie's Ward Phillips Vineberg, Davis & Gilbert, Davis Brody Bond Llp, Davis Polk And Wardwell Llp, Davis Wright Tremaine, Day Elevator & Lift, Daybreak Independent Services, Dayton Industries Inc, Dbi Construction Consultants, Dca Construction Ltd, Dcbe Inc, Ddb Worldwide Partners Inc, Ddc Ac/Ex Air, Ddk & Co, Dds, Dds Mechanical Corp., De Nardis Engineering, De Simone Consulting, Dealertrack Holdings, Inc., Dealogic LLC, Dean Energy Solutions Cor, Deangelo Brothers, Inc., Debevoise And Plimpton Llp, Deboe Construction Corp., Deborah A. Nilson And Assoc PLLC, Deborah Berke & Partners, Deborah Bradley Construction & Management Service, Dechert Llp, Deco Associates, Decristofaro Law, Deep Clean Maid Svc and Deer Head Chemical Industries added. (Kernan, James)
April 22, 2021 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Danbro Distributors, Daniel Gale Real Estate Inc, Dannell Maguire, Dannon Company, D'annunzio & Sons Inc, Danny And Nicole, Dantona Industries, Dap, D'arcambal Ousley-Cuyler Burk, Darcon Construction Corp, Darger Errante Yavitz-Blau Llp, Dasilva Architects P C, Data Art, Data Industries Ltd, Datacom Technology Group Inc., Dataforms, Dataiku Inc, Datalot Inc, Dattner Architects D.P.C., Daughters Of Jacob, Dave Heiner Associates, Dave Restoration and Davellino Cons. Inc. added. (Kernan, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Daedalus Technology Group Inc, Dagher Engineering, Dagny Enterprises LLC, Dai & Assoc, Daikin Applied, Dallas County Comm Clg / Eastfield Clg, Dal-Tile Corporation, Dalton Greiner Hartman Maher And Co LLC, Damato Lynch, Damcosoft Inc, Damian Family Care Ctr, Dan Endara, Dan Klores Assoc Inc, Dana Farber Cancer Institute and Danadams added. (Kernan, James)
April 21, 2021 NOTICE TO ADD PARTIES - It is the responsibility of Counsel to add all Parties to their docket sheet. Parties can be added using the event Utility Events Add Parties (under Other Documents) (Davis, Kimberly)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 D & W Central Station and D A Collins Construction Co added. (Kernan, James)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 D & J Concrete Corp. and D & S Restoration Inc added. (Kernan, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D & D Metal Work Inc, D & F Development Group filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14393234 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Related Case Statement) (Kernan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Percy et al v. D & D Metal Work Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & F Development Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & D Metal Work Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eng-Wong, Taub & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elli NY Design Corp / Metropolitan Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensome Builders Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Medical Assoc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckenfelder Engineering Dba Brown And Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke On 42nd Street Theatre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealogic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elysabeth Kleinhans Theatrical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Woods Discovery Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexterity Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastone 26 Ave LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edi Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterminare Pest Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldor Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Cook Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Seton Children's Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esoftware Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Fencing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Execusearch Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dh Property Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'onofrio General Contractors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R.E. Drywall Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebrandz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damato Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny And Nicole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day Elevator & Lift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dasilva Architects P C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double U Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Plumbing & Mechanical Contracting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earth Smart Environmental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisenberg & Baum Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deboe Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Snow Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diagnostic Holter Monitoring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ent And Allergy Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dietwatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gale Real Estate Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Contracting Of Neck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expert Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Elliman Captl Impvment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Heiner Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorion Norton Electrical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'annunzio & Sons Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dsl Commercial Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emc Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ewingcole Architects
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dataforms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Health Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deno's Wonder Wheel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: European Craft Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Coffee Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrical Contracting Sltns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Ediscoverty Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire State Development Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J Minskoff Equities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek T Smith Law Group Pc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dentons Us Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eia Electric Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel At Woodbury For Rehab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eiges & Orgel PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Family Care Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Merge Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defender Security Svc Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurotech Construction Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danbro Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digiscribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damcosoft Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draper Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double D Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dlandstudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dy Consultants Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ent-Ear Nose & Throat Journal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimensional Stone-Tile Designs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delphi Plumbing & Heating Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elkus Manfredi Architects Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elecnor Hawkeye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisner & Assoc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Enterprise Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Landscape Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Marketer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dependable Transport-Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dcbe Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelsior Hotel Manhattan Nyc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enigma Diagnostic Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dmd Contracting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ddk & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della Femina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dla Piper Llp (Us)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emblazent Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Chair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Sheet Metal Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & A Supply Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dotdash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Signs & Flags Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ej Electric Installation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Advisors Car Accident
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digitas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Cooke Assoc LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Sports Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Explorers Tech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans & Paul Unlimited Corp,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor's Immediate Care Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dia General Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinox 63rd Street Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Baldante Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Door Automation Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epoch Times Assoc Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Koch Theater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dmar.Remodeling.LLC Sashmasters Nyc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors Clinics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Cosmetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Trade Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerging Health Info Tech LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darger Errante Yavitz-Blau Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drury Design Dynamics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dal-Tile Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Medical Group Of NY Pc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deheng Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ettinger Engineering Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extell Development Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment Tonite Music Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elev8 Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern General Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energize Electrical Contracting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eihab Human Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digestive Disease-Nutri Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esplanade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echostar Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Brody Bond Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Documentary Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Harlem Council For Human Serv. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duc Duc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donjon Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Expressions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Early Intervention Ctr & Pre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Mechanical Contracting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denal Construction Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ee Cruz Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democracy Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Search
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Long Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pichardo Pediatric Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Dept James J Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East West Marketing Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esteem Patrol Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Polk And Wardwell Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy2comply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Aaron David & Dr Larissa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmhurst Care Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dechert Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eshel Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Strategy Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digizuite Usa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deltek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epilepsy Foundation Of Long Island Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Schwartz Mdpc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & A Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Meadow School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eic Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Head & Neck Surgery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Barrio's Operation Fightback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eger Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Control Abatement Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dentsu America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyna Tabs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Fund Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominican College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dialysis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E W Howell Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dramatists Play Svc Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Do Rite Mechanical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Intelligence Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Petroleum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Ferstendig Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Bradley Construction & Management Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dom & Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departure Films
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglaston Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Family Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Dept Queens Hosp Ctr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dbi Construction Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Services Intl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davie's Ward Phillips Vineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exponents Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmhurst Pediatrics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decristofaro Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docs Physicians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dtm Elevator Consulting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewberry & Goodkind Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & W Central Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannell Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Abram Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entourage Flooring Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everlast Worldwide Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Testing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doubleclick Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epithany Construction Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edp World Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Lighting Agencies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedite Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E S Renovations & Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Robinson M. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer W. Davis, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D H Griffin Construction Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezras Choilim Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellenberg & Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D A Collins Construction Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Hatem Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danadams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dgital Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exair Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dobrish Michaels Gross Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eme Group Consulting Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derive Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Difazio Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire City Iron Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Liquidating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designs Vatche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entech Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Daskal Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deg Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell & Dean PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drchrono.Com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esi Cases & Accessories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doar Rieck Kaley & Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duggal Corp Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ednet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst And Young Llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'arcambal Ousley-Cuyler Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern States Optical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Airport Parking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Entertainment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David V Farrell Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Comm Clg / Eastfield Clg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dattner Architects D.P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Du Art Film Laboratory Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecological Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Regreso, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edson Construction Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Castle Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dooley Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrosonic Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eis Laassois Child Devmnt Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive In Hotel Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esperanzaenterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endai Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurostruct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dfta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Geller Assoc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Gastroenterology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Heat Transfer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ess & Vee Acoustical Contrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecuadorian Civic Committee Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deluxe Post Production
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exclusive Door Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & J Electric Installation Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dnp Builders LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D And D Elevator Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgeworx Studios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eon Mechanical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Simone Consulting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diageo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Howard Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragonetti Brothers Landscaping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Community Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Renovation & Builders Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis & Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Medical Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exquisite Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamland Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastco Shotcrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Er Dox Pedia-Nytp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineers Country Club Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Door 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Asset Mgmt Corp Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elit Green Builders Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D S Wolf Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Die-Matic Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Droit Financial Tech LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Force Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edge Auto Rental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Ocean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kucera Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E A I Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Joe Auto Body
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dependable Windows Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecohealth Company Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebo Nexus Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Defense Fund, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durst Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Construction Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esm Construction Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermatologic Associates Of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web