New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc. et al v. The City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti and James Schmitt
Defendant: The City of New York, Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi and Roberta Reardon
Case Number: 1:2022cv00752
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 5, 2022, before Judge Scanlon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Abba Reporting. Email address: abbareporting@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2022. (Hong, Loan)
April 5, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2022. Jonathan R. Nelson, Barry Black, and Sarah Child appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Bilal Haider and Lora Minicucci appeared on behalf of Defendants The City of New York, Eric Adams, and Dave Chokshi. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #9:49-10:16.) (Quinlan, Krista)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 4/5/2022 conference, Plaintiffs will issue document requests and interrogatories by COB on 4/6/2022. Defendants will respond on a rolling basis. On or before 4/11/2022, counsel will confer for at least 45 minutes about discovery. On 4/13/2022 at 2:15 pm, the Court will conduct a status conference to discuss the progress on discovery, anticipated dates for the conclusion of document discovery, and whether depositions will be permitted, and if so, by what date. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Defendants are not seeking discovery from Plaintiffs in connection with the preliminary injunction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/5/2022. (Quinlan, Krista)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/5/2022 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon to discuss discovery. The Court has allotted 45 minutes for this conference; counsel should be prepared to succinctly state their respective positions as to the limited discovery permitted. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/4/2022. (Quinlan, Krista)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER -- In connection with Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, and as discussed at the conference held on March 25, 2022, Plaintiffs have requested discovery. The Court grants the request in part, limited to discovery as to the Citywide Panel process as it relates to the individual plaintiffs in this action. The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for discovery management. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 3/29/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
March 25, 2022 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gujarati: Telephone Conference held on March 25, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Sujata Sidhu Gibson, Barry Black, and Sarah Child appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Bilal Haider and Lora Minicucci appeared on behalf of Defendants The City of New York, Eric Adams, and Dave Chokshi. Case called. Discussion held. (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk) (Almonte, Kelly)
March 25, 2022 Filing 60 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF SUJATA GIBSON, ESQ. IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Status Pages, #2 Exhibit 2 - Emergency Executive Order 62, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mayor Adams Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 - News Articles, #5 Exhibit 5 - News Articles, #6 Exhibit 6 - News Articles) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 59 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF JAMES SCHMITT IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 58 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF FRANK SCHIMENTI IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 57 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF LAURA SATIRA IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 56 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF MATTHEW RIVERA IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 55 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF DENNIS PILLET IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 54 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF DEAN PAOLILLO IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 53 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF KRISTA O'DEA IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 52 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF SABINA KOLENOVIC IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 51 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF BRENDAN FOGARTY IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 50 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF JANINE DEMARTINI IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 49 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF LIZ DELGADO IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 48 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order OF CURTIS CUTLER IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Black, Barry)
March 25, 2022 Filing 47 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Black, Barry)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER -- In connection with the Court's consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, the Court will hold a teleconference at 10:30 a.m. on March 25, 2022. Plaintiffs should be prepared to discuss the employment status and status of religious exemption appeals, if any, for each of the thirteen individual plaintiffs and should be prepared to provide citations to the record as to these issues. In addition, in light of Plaintiffs' request for an evidentiary hearing, see Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction at 2, ECF No. 40; Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction at 8-10, ECF No. 46, Plaintiffs should be prepared to specify the factual issues as to which a hearing is requested and the specific testimony and other evidence that Plaintiffs would seek to offer at an evidentiary hearing, should the request for such a hearing be granted. Finally, in light of Plaintiffs' reference to a "motion for expedited discovery," see Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction at 24, Plaintiffs should be prepared to discuss whether they are, in fact, seeking discovery at this time and, if so, should be prepared to specify the discovery they are seeking. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 2643682. Counsel should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 3/22/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
March 8, 2022 Filing 46 REPLY in Support re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barry Black, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Black, Barry)
March 3, 2022 Filing 45 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 Memorandum in Support,,, by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt. (Black, Barry)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #45 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time -- The motion is granted. Plaintiffs shall file a reply brief, if any, by March 8, 2022. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 3/3/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
February 28, 2022 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Supplemental) filed by Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, The City of New York. (Haider, Bilal)
February 22, 2022 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, Roberta Reardon, The City of New York (Herrera, Isaiah)
February 22, 2022 Filing 42 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, Roberta Reardon, The City of New York, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Herrera, Isaiah)
February 18, 2022 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sujata S. Gibson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24) (Gibson, Sujata)
February 16, 2022 Filing 39 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Black, Barry)
February 16, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Herrera, Isaiah)
February 14, 2022 Filing 38 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Black, Barry)
February 14, 2022 Filing 37 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Black, Barry)
February 14, 2022 Filing 36 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Black, Barry)
February 14, 2022 Filing 35 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Black, Barry)
February 11, 2022 Filing 34 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gujarati: Conference on Plaintiffs' #7 motion held on February 11, 2022 at 5:30 p.m. Sujata Sidhu Gibson, Jonathan Nelson, and Sarah Child appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Bilal Haider and Lora Minicucci appeared on behalf of Defendants The City of New York, Eric Adams, and Dave Chokshi. Shi-Shi Wang and James Cooney of the Office of the New York State Attorney General also present. The parties were heard on Plaintiffs' motion. As set forth on the record, Plaintiffs' #7 motion for a temporary restraining order was denied. The following schedule was set for supplemental briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction: Plaintiffs shall file their supplemental brief by February 18, 2022; Defendants shall file any opposition brief by February 28, 2022; and Plaintiffs shall file a reply brief, if any, by March 4, 2022. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese) (Almonte, Kelly)
February 11, 2022 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, The City of New York. (Haider, Bilal)
February 11, 2022 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Haider, Bilal)
February 11, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Roberta Reardon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Plaintiffs' Counsel 2.11.22) (Wang, Shi-Shi)
February 11, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Lora Minicucci on behalf of Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Minicucci, Lora)
February 11, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Bilal Husain Haider on behalf of Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Haider, Bilal)
February 11, 2022 Filing 28 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 11, 2022 Filing 27 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause -- Defendants are ordered to file a response to #7 by February 11, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 2/11/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
February 11, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re: #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause -- The Court will hold a conference on Plaintiffs' Motion on February 11, 2022 at 5:30 p.m. via teleconference. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 2643682. Counsel should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 2/11/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
February 11, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The CLERK OF COURT name needs to be updated., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 10, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujata Sidhu Gibson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gibson, Sujata)
February 10, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Child on behalf of Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (aty to be noticed) (Child, Sarah)
February 10, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Black on behalf of Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (aty to be noticed) (Black, Barry)
February 10, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order WILLIAM TOTH by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order JOHN GARLAND by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order JAMES SCHMITT by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order FRANK SCHIMENTI by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order LAURA SATIRA by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order MATTHEW RIVERA by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order DENNIS PILLET by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order DEAN PAOLILLO by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order KRISTA ODEA by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order SABINA KOLENOVIC by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order BRENDAN FOGARTY by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order JANINE DEMARTINI by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order LIZ DELGADO by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order CURTIS CUTLER by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Gennaro Agovino by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order of Jonathan Robert Nelson, Esq. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Gennaro Agovino, Curtis Cutler, Liz Delgado, Janine Demartini, Brendan Fogarty, Sabina Kolenovic, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Krista Odea, Dean Paolillo, Dennis Pillet, Matthew Rivera, Laura Satira, Frank Schimenti, James Schmitt (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Adams, Dave Chokshi, Roberta Reardon, The City of New York filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15279931 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Matthew Rivera, Sabina Kolenovic, Gennaro Agovino, New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc., Frank Schimenti, Brendan Fogarty, Curtis Cutler, Dean Paolillo, Laura Satira, James Schmitt, Krista Odea, Liz Delgado, Dennis Pillet, Janine Demartini. (Nelson, Jonathan)
February 10, 2022 NOTICE: Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc. et al v. The City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Yorkers For Religious Liberty, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gennaro Agovino
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Cutler
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Delgado
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Demartini
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Fogarty
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabina Kolenovic
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Odea
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Paolillo
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Pillet
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rivera
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Satira
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Schimenti
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Schmitt
Represented By: Jonathan R. Nelson
Represented By: Barry Black
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Lora Minicucci
Represented By: Bilal Husain Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Adams
Represented By: Lora Minicucci
Represented By: Bilal Husain Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Chokshi
Represented By: Lora Minicucci
Represented By: Bilal Husain Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?