Sylla et al v. Amazon Labor Union et al
Plaintiff: Brima Sylla, Connor Spence, David-Desyre Sherwood, Kathleen Cole, Sultana Hossain, Tristian Martinez, Justine Medina, Brett Daniels, Ruel Mohan, Rob McDonald, Pasquale Cioffi, Sam Bowman, Joe Lucchese, Robert Pecoraro, Yackisha Nebot-Lopez, Aide Estudillo, Briana Anderson, Naquasia Rowland, Tamia Campbell, Jennifer Schofield, Michael Rivera, Christian Mohansingh, James Bardo, Abdula Diallo, Ibrahim Balde, Felicia Reese, Igor Mabika, Michael Lopez, Abdullah Sesay, Nicholas Ferrugiaro, Kareem Lindsay, Lillian Lopez, Tremayne Youngblood, Ali Gigni, Manny Thompson, Rjeen Rodriguez, Simone Sue, Latifah X., Comrad Brown, Jordan Silveira, Richard Cotto, Deyaniris Mote, Jessica Edmonds, Kimberly Merise, Bianca Butler, Michael Antonio, Mark Johnson, Craig Ayala, John Philip, LaSalle Della Roca, Chris Koko, Christina Jimmy, Charles Johnson, Chris Philip, Ahmed Bobacar, Caty Ridrego, Durvis Saint Luis, Kevin Bertman, Aaliya Diamond, Mohamed Awes, Ali Dawud, Fred Fibio, Ismael Mendoza, Briana Pacheco, Jayshawn Bazemore, Amani Claudia, Christopher Whright, Ezekieo Benson, Ethan Coper, Joseph DeJesus, Isola Okunu, Ariana Johnson, Mostep Step, Abayomi "Bayou&quo Abimbola, Gabriel Webbs, Aliyyan Aziz, Emmanuel Jean, Antoinette Gray, Don Elijah, Eric Harris, Rondu John, Nicole Flores, Merldon Gustave, Mohamed Gack, Joe Johnson and Adrian John
Defendant: Amazon Labor Union and Chris Smalls
Case Number: 1:2023cv05261
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Taryn A Merkl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Complaint by filing a Second Amended Complaint Prior to Renewing and Rebriefing the Motion for A Preliminary Injunction., #27 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Carlos Mendoza (Docket No. 25) and motion to file under seal filed by Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls. (Bernstein, Jonathan)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Carlos Mendoza (Docket No. 25) by Abayomi "Bayou&quo Abimbola, Briana Anderson, Michael Antonio, Mohamed Awes, Craig Ayala, Aliyyan Aziz, Ibrahim Balde, James Bardo, Jayshawn Bazemore, Ezekieo Benson, Kevin Bertman, Ahmed Bobacar, Sam Bowman, Comrad Brown, Bianca Butler, Tamia Campbell, Pasquale Cioffi, Amani Claudia, Kathleen Cole, Ethan Coper, Richard Cotto, Brett Daniels, Ali Dawud, Joseph DeJesus, Abdula Diallo, Aaliya Diamond, Jessica Edmonds, Don Elijah, Aide Estudillo, Nicholas Ferrugiaro, Fred Fibio, Nicole Flores, Mohamed Gack, Ali Gigni, Antoinette Gray, Merldon Gustave, Eric Harris, Sultana Hossain, Emmanuel Jean, Christina Jimmy, Adrian John, Rondu John, Ariana Johnson, Charles Johnson, Joe Johnson, Mark Johnson, Chris Koko, Kareem Lindsay, Lillian Lopez, Michael Lopez, Joe Lucchese, Durvis Saint Luis, Igor Mabika, Tristian Martinez, Rob McDonald, Justine Medina, Ismael Mendoza, Kimberly Merise, Ruel Mohan, Christian Mohansingh, Deyaniris Mote, Yackisha Nebot-Lopez, Isola Okunu, Briana Pacheco, Robert Pecoraro, Chris Philip, John Philip, Felicia Reese, Caty Ridrego, Michael Rivera, LaSalle Della Roca, Rjeen Rodriguez, Naquasia Rowland, Jennifer Schofield, Abdullah Sesay, David-Desyre Sherwood, Jordan Silveira, Connor Spence, Mostep Step, Simone Sue, Brima Sylla, Manny Thompson, Gabriel Webbs, Christopher Whright, Latifah X., Tremayne Youngblood. (Schwartz, Arthur)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Complaint by filing a Second Amended Complaint Prior to Renewing and Rebriefing the Motion for A Preliminary Injunction. by Abayomi "Bayou&quo Abimbola, Briana Anderson, Michael Antonio, Mohamed Awes, Craig Ayala, Aliyyan Aziz, Ibrahim Balde, James Bardo, Jayshawn Bazemore, Ezekieo Benson, Kevin Bertman, Ahmed Bobacar, Sam Bowman, Comrad Brown, Bianca Butler, Tamia Campbell, Pasquale Cioffi, Amani Claudia, Kathleen Cole, Ethan Coper, Richard Cotto, Brett Daniels, Ali Dawud, Joseph DeJesus, Abdula Diallo, Aaliya Diamond, Jessica Edmonds, Don Elijah, Aide Estudillo, Nicholas Ferrugiaro, Fred Fibio, Nicole Flores, Mohamed Gack, Ali Gigni, Antoinette Gray, Merldon Gustave, Eric Harris, Sultana Hossain, Emmanuel Jean, Christina Jimmy, Adrian John, Rondu John, Ariana Johnson, Charles Johnson, Joe Johnson, Mark Johnson, Chris Koko, Kareem Lindsay, Lillian Lopez, Michael Lopez, Joe Lucchese, Durvis Saint Luis, Igor Mabika, Tristian Martinez, Rob McDonald, Justine Medina, Ismael Mendoza, Kimberly Merise, Ruel Mohan, Christian Mohansingh, Deyaniris Mote, Yackisha Nebot-Lopez, Isola Okunu, Briana Pacheco, Robert Pecoraro, Chris Philip, John Philip, Felicia Reese, Caty Ridrego, Michael Rivera, LaSalle Della Roca, Rjeen Rodriguez, Naquasia Rowland, Jennifer Schofield, Abdullah Sesay, David-Desyre Sherwood, Jordan Silveira, Connor Spence, Mostep Step, Simone Sue, Brima Sylla, Manny Thompson, Gabriel Webbs, Christopher Whright, Latifah X., Tremayne Youngblood. (Schwartz, Arthur)
August 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION re #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, #3 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #21 Reply in Support,, IN OPPOSITION BY CASSIO MENDOZA by Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls (Singla, Retu)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Dismissal of Complaint filed by Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls. (Bernstein, Jonathan)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Dismissal of Complaint suggesting schedule adjusted for anticipated filing of Amended Complaint, and the schedule already created by the court for litigation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Arthur)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Dismissal of Complaint by Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls. (Bernstein, Jonathan)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received the defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference on their anticipated motion to dismiss. The plaintiffs are directed to file a response, not to exceed 3 pages, by August 8, 2023. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 8/1/2023. (KA)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann M. Donnelly: Hearing on a Temporary Restraining Order held on July 13, 2023. Arthur Schwartz appeared for the plaintiffs. Jeanne Mirer, Jonathan Bernstein, and Retu Singla appeared for the defendants. Case called. Discussion held. The motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is denied, because the plaintiffs make only vague [and] conclusory allegations, Evans v. Murphy, No. 12-CV-365, 2014 WL 4437771, at *2 (W.D.N.Y. Mar. 13, 2014), and do not establish an injury that is neither remote nor speculative, but actual and imminent and that cannot be remedied by an award of monetary damages, New York ex rel. Schneiderman v. Actavis PLC, 787 F.3d 638, 660 (2d Cir. 2015). The plaintiffs are directed to move for a preliminary injunction by August 14, 2023; the defendants must respond by September 13, 2023; the plaintiffs must file a reply, if any, by September 28, 2023. (Court Reporter Leeann Musolf.) (DG)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY in Support re #20 Affidavit, #2 Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause (2nd Declaration of Connor Spence Responding to Singla Declaration Opposing Preliminary Injunction filed by Brima Sylla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. L - Texts with ALU VP Maldanado, #2 Exhibit Ex. M - June 20 Texts with ALU Legal Team, #3 Exhibit Ex. N - Texts with Legal Team, #4 Exhibit Ex. O - Text With Nicole Druda, #5 Exhibit Ex. P - Bill Fletcher Memo to ALU Board) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Retu Singla in Opp. to OSC TRO PI by Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls (Singla, Retu)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Letter in Response to Order by Amazon Labor Union (Singla, Retu)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION re #2 Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause in Opposition by Michelle Nieves by Amazon Labor Union (Mirer, Jeanne)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Ellen Mirer on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Mirer, Jeanne)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Retu Singla on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Singla, Retu)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Court Order of July 12, 2023 (Corrected) served on Jeanne Mirer, Esq and Retu Singla, Esq. on July 12, 2023, 4:30PM, filed by Brima Sylla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Letter to R Singla, Esq, and J. Mirer, Esq, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Copy of Court Order of July 12, 2023, attached to the letter) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Bernstein on behalf of Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls (aty to be noticed) (Bernstein, Jonathan)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Court Order of July 12, 2023 with cover letter served on Jeanne Mirer, Esq and Retu Singla, Esq. on July 12, 2023, 4:30PM, filed by Brima Sylla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ax. A - Letter dated 7-12-23 to J Mirer, Esq and R. Singla, Esq, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Copy of Court Order of July 12, 2023, attached to the letter) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Johnson, Aide Estudillo, Jennifer Schofield, Eric Harris, Jessica Edmonds, Ali Gigni, Mostep Step, Michael Antonio, Sam Bowman, Briana Pacheco, Joe Lucchese, Lillian Lopez, Yackisha Nebot-Lopez, Jayshawn Bazemore, Comrad Brown, Rjeen Rodriguez, Mohamed Gack, Abdullah Sesay, Aaliya Diamond, Isola Okunu, Richard Cotto, Antoinette Gray, Nicholas Ferrugiaro, Christopher Whright, Latifah X., Michael Lopez, Kareem Lindsay, James Bardo, Fred Fibio, LaSalle Della Roca, Briana Anderson, Bianca Butler, Kevin Bertman, Nicole Flores, Joe Johnson, Kathleen Cole, Tremayne Youngblood, Merldon Gustave, Sultana Hossain, Mohamed Awes, Christina Jimmy, Ibrahim Balde, Joseph DeJesus, Manny Thompson, Michael Rivera, Justine Medina, Naquasia Rowland, Amani Claudia, Charles Johnson, Craig Ayala, Connor Spence, Brima Sylla, Chris Philip, Durvis Saint Luis, Felicia Reese, Christian Mohansingh, Chris Koko, Robert Pecoraro, Tamia Campbell, Don Elijah, Caty Ridrego, Ruel Mohan, Ariana Johnson, Emmanuel Jean, John Philip, Ali Dawud, Pasquale Cioffi, Abayomi "Bayou&quo Abimbola, Abdula Diallo, Ahmed Bobacar, Kimberly Merise, Adrian John, Simone Sue, Ismael Mendoza, Igor Mabika, David-Desyre Sherwood, Aliyyan Aziz, Gabriel Webbs, Jordan Silveira, Rob McDonald, Brett Daniels, Ezekieo Benson, Tristian Martinez, Deyaniris Mote, Ethan Coper, Rondu John. All Defendants. (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter by Abayomi "Bayou&quo Abimbola, Briana Anderson, Michael Antonio, Mohamed Awes, Craig Ayala, Aliyyan Aziz, Ibrahim Balde, James Bardo, Jayshawn Bazemore, Ezekieo Benson, Kevin Bertman, Ahmed Bobacar, Sam Bowman, Comrad Brown, Bianca Butler, Tamia Campbell, Pasquale Cioffi, Amani Claudia, Kathleen Cole, Ethan Coper, Richard Cotto, Brett Daniels, Ali Dawud, Joseph DeJesus, Abdula Diallo, Aaliya Diamond, Jessica Edmonds, Don Elijah, Aide Estudillo, Nicholas Ferrugiaro, Fred Fibio, Nicole Flores, Mohamed Gack, Ali Gigni, Antoinette Gray, Merldon Gustave, Eric Harris, Sultana Hossain, Emmanuel Jean, Christina Jimmy, Adrian John, Rondu John, Ariana Johnson, Charles Johnson, Joe Johnson, Mark Johnson, Chris Koko, Kareem Lindsay, Lillian Lopez, Michael Lopez, Joe Lucchese, Durvis Saint Luis, Igor Mabika, Tristian Martinez, Rob McDonald, Justine Medina, Ismael Mendoza, Kimberly Merise, Ruel Mohan, Christian Mohansingh, Deyaniris Mote, Yackisha Nebot-Lopez, Isola Okunu, Briana Pacheco, Robert Pecoraro, Chris Philip, John Philip, Felicia Reese, Caty Ridrego, Michael Rivera, LaSalle Della Roca, Rjeen Rodriguez, Naquasia Rowland, Jennifer Schofield, Abdullah Sesay, David-Desyre Sherwood, Jordan Silveira, Connor Spence, Mostep Step, Simone Sue, Brima Sylla, Manny Thompson, Gabriel Webbs, Christopher Whright, Latifah X., Tremayne Youngblood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Letter of 7/11/2023) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER The Court has received the parties' letters (ECF Nos. 10, 11) regarding the defendants' representation and a motion for sanctions. Attorneys from the firm Julien, Mirer, Singla & Goldstein are directed to file an appearance on the docket by end of day today, July 12, 2023, and to attend the temporary restraining order hearing scheduled for July 13, 2023. The Julien attorneys have contacted the Court several times by phone and by filing a letter on ECF, clearly acting as if they are representing the defendants. They may not do so without filing an appearance. If the defendants decide to secure a different attorney in the future, counsel can move to withdraw representation. The parties are also directed to review my Individual Rules before the hearing on July 13, 2023. Among other things, parties may not "call chambers unless otherwise allowed by these rules." Finally, there is no motion for sanctions pending on the docket, so there is nothing to strike. All other questions will be resolved at the hearing on July 13, 2023. The plaintiffs are directed to serve the defendants with a copy of this order and file proof of service today, July 12, 2023. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/12/2023. (KA)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter re Defendants' Notice of Motion under FRCP 11 by David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence, Brima Sylla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence with Defendants, Defendants' Notice of Motion) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls, filed by Brima Sylla, David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 2021 ALU Constitution, #2 Exhibit B - June 2022 ALU Constitution, #3 Exhibit C - December 2022 ALU Constitution, #4 Exhibit D - Petition, #5 Exhibit E - WhatsApp Threats) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Chris Smalls) (SR)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The defendants are directed to appear and show cause before this Court on July 13, 2023, at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4G North as to why an order should not be entered granting the plaintiffs the temporary restraining order requested in #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause. The plaintiffs are directed to serve the defendants with a copy of this order and file proof of service by July 12, 2023. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/11/2023. (JJ)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Taryn A. Merkl. (SR)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence, Brima Sylla. (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #2 Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence, Brima Sylla. (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #2 Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence, Brima Sylla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - UAW Order, #2 Exhibit G - Caucus Letter to Executive Board, #3 Exhibit H - Boone Response to Caucus, #4 Exhibit I - Response to Caucus, #5 Exhibit J - Letter to R Singla and J Mirer 7/7/23, #6 Exhibit K - Letter, J Mirer to A Schwartz 7/9/23) (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause by David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence, Brima Sylla. (Schwartz, Arthur)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Labor Union, Chris Smalls filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16875464 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Brima Sylla, David-Desyre Sherwood, Connor Spence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Amazon Labor Union, #3 Proposed Summons Chris Smalls, #4 Exhibit A - April 2021 ALU Constitution, #5 Exhibit B - June 2022 ALU Constitution, #6 Exhibit C - December 2022 ALU Constitution, #7 Exhibit D - Petition, #8 Exhibit E - WhatsApp Threats) (Schwartz, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylla et al v. Amazon Labor Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brima Sylla
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Spence
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David-Desyre Sherwood
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Cole
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sultana Hossain
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristian Martinez
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Medina
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Daniels
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruel Mohan
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob McDonald
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasquale Cioffi
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Bowman
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Lucchese
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pecoraro
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yackisha Nebot-Lopez
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aide Estudillo
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Anderson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naquasia Rowland
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamia Campbell
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Schofield
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rivera
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Mohansingh
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bardo
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdula Diallo
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Balde
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Reese
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Mabika
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lopez
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullah Sesay
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ferrugiaro
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Lindsay
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Lopez
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremayne Youngblood
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Gigni
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manny Thompson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rjeen Rodriguez
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Sue
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latifah X.
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comrad Brown
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Silveira
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cotto
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deyaniris Mote
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Edmonds
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Merise
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Butler
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Antonio
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Ayala
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Philip
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaSalle Della Roca
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Koko
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Jimmy
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Philip
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Bobacar
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caty Ridrego
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durvis Saint Luis
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bertman
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaliya Diamond
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Awes
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Dawud
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Fibio
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Mendoza
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Pacheco
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayshawn Bazemore
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amani Claudia
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Whright
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezekieo Benson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Coper
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph DeJesus
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isola Okunu
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Johnson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mostep Step
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abayomi "Bayou&quo Abimbola
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Webbs
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliyyan Aziz
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Jean
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Gray
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Elijah
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Harris
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondu John
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Flores
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merldon Gustave
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Gack
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Johnson
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian John
Represented By: Arthur Z. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Labor Union
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: Retu Singla
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Smalls
Represented By: Retu Singla
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bernstein
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?