Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Goicochea et al

Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp. and Joe W. Goicochea
Case Number: 2:2019cv02652
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 REQUEST for Certificate of Default #8 is denied at this time as to defendant Joe W. Goicochea. According to the summons returned executed #7 filed by the plaintiff, defendant Joe W. Goicocheas response to the complaint is due 6/14/19. Therefore, the request for a clerk's certificate of default as to defendant Joe W. Goicochea filed on 6/5/14 is premature. (Toritto, Jim)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default, #3 Certificate of Service) (Loughlin, Joseph)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Joe W. Goicochea served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Loughlin, Joseph)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Loughlin, Joseph)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joe W. Goicochea. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 7, 2019 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Loughlin, Joseph)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe W. Goicochea, Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11450636 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Goicochea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Delicias De Mi Tierra Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe W. Goicochea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?