New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. The Town of Huntington et al
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Defendant: The Town of Huntington Planning Board, The Town of Huntington, Building Permit Coordinator of the Town of Huntington, The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals and Steve Kiewra
Case Number: 2:2019cv03564
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Wilbur on behalf of New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Wilbur, Kenneth)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court is aware that this is the second extension of time to respond to the Complaint and that the Plaintiff objects to the extension. In light of the fact that the municipality has only recently hired outside counsel to handle this matter, the Court is granting the request notwithstanding plaintiff's objection. The extension will not interfere with the Initial Conference which is cheduled for September 6, 2019. Counsel are directed to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference timely and to file their discovery plan so that the Court's Rule 16 conference on September 6 may run smoothly. Counsel are on notice that the August 26, 2019 deadline will not be further extended. Ordered by Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/2/19. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/2/2019. (Tomlinson, A.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Steve Kiewra, The Town of Huntington, The Town of Huntington Planning Board, The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Steve Kiewra, The Town of Huntington, The Town of Huntington Planning Board, The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals. (Napolitano, Donna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Napolitano on behalf of Steve Kiewra, The Town of Huntington, The Town of Huntington Planning Board, The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals (aty to be noticed) (Napolitano, Donna)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting DE #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/26/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth Wilbur Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11700218. by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth Wilbur, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kenneth Wilbur, #3 Proposed Order) (Wilbur, Kenneth)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for September 6, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/15/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. Steve Kiewra served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; The Town of Huntington served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; The Town of Huntington Planning Board served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Joseph, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' time to respond is extended to August 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/11/2019. (Tomlinson, A.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steve Kiewra, The Town of Huntington, The Town of Huntington Planning Board, The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals. (Ciappetta, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Ciappetta on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ciappetta, Nicholas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11583134, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 to Complaint) (Joseph, Andrew) Modified on 6/19/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Joseph, Andrew) Modified on 6/19/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. The Town of Huntington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Andrew B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth J. Wilbur
Represented By: Andrew B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Huntington Planning Board
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ciappetta
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Huntington
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ciappetta
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Permit Coordinator of the Town of Huntington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Huntington Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ciappetta
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kiewra
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ciappetta
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?